Christine Forgues v. Select Portfolio Serv, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 16-3540

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 14, 2017 at 11:46 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006012814666 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None
**LOCKED** APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. John Herrera for Christine J. Forgues. Certificate of Service:08/05/2016. Argument Request: requested. ***COROPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT WAS OMITTED FROM BRIEF. CORRECTIONS LETTER SENT. COUNSEL TO REFILE AS A CORRECTED BRIEF.--[Edited 08/08/2016 by RMJ] (JH)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION filed: We AFFIRM the judgment of the district court, decision not for publication. Danny J. Boggs, Eugene E. Siler, Jr., and Karen Nelson Moore (authoring), Circuit Judges. (RMJ)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      CAUSE ARGUED by Mr. John Herrera for Appellant Christine J. Forgues and Mr. David Arthur Wallace for Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. before Boggs,Circuit Judge; Siler,Circuit Judge and Moore,Circuit Judge. (KSC)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. David Arthur Wallace for Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 12/12/2016. (DAW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. John Herrera for Appellant Christine J. Forgues. Certificate of Service: 12/09/2016. (JH)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED for 9:00 a.m. Tuesday, January 24, 2017. (DTS)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. John Herrera for Appellant Christine J. Forgues. Certificate of Service:10/14/2016. (JH)
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file reply brief [23] filed by Mr. John Herrera. Reply brief now due: 10/14/2016. (RMJ)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION filed by Mr. John Herrera for Christine J. Forgues to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 10/12/2016. (JH)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. David Arthur Wallace for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Certificate of Service:09/19/2016. Argument Request: requested. (DAW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None
                      BRIEFING LETTER SENT resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 09/19/2016. (RMJ)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None
                        RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file corrected brief [18] filed by Mr. John Herrera. (RMJ)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None
                          CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. John Herrera for Christine J. Forgues. Certificate of Service:08/16/2016. Argument Request: requested. (JH)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None
                            MOTION filed by Mr. John Herrera for Christine J. Forgues to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 08/16/2016. (JH)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None
                              BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. John Herrera for Christine J. Forgues because Corporate Disclosure Statement was omitted. Corrections due: 08/10/2016. (RMJ)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None
                                APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. John Herrera for Christine J. Forgues. Certificate of Service:08/05/2016. Argument Request: requested. (JH)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
                                  RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [14] filed by Mr. John Herrera, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/05/2016. appellee brief now due 09/07/2016. (RMJ)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
                                    MOTION filed by Mr. John Herrera for Christine J. Forgues to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 07/25/2016. (JH)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Herrera for Appellant Christine J. Forgues Certificate of Service: 07/13/2016. (JH)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
                                        CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. John Herrera for Appellant Christine J. Forgues. Certificate of Service:07/13/2016. (JH)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
                                          APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Christine J. Forgues by JOHN HERRERA, ESQ.. Certificate of Service: 07/13/2016. (JH)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David Arthur Wallace for Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Certificate of Service: 06/01/2016. (DAW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                                              APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. by DAVID A. WALLACE. Certificate of Service: 06/01/2016. (DAW)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/27/2016. appellee brief now due 08/30/2016. (MLB)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                  The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 07/13/2016 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                    A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 06/20/2016 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                      BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/05/2016; appellee brief due 08/08/2016. (RMJ)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                        Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Christine J. Forgues. Transcript needed: n. (RMJ)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 663 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?