Willard Till
Bankruptcy Case Alabama Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-33157
District Judge Dwight H. Williams Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 11:12 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bankruptcy Administrator, Bankruptcy Admin.
No Logo Curtis C. Reding, Trustee
No Logo Mary Dorris Till, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Shinbaum & Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Shinbaum +1 334 269 4440

Toggle Switch Represented by Shinbaum, McLeod & Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Brandon Sellers, III +1 334 269 4440
No Logo Willard Till, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Shinbaum & Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Shinbaum +1 334 269 4440

Toggle Switch Represented by Shinbaum, McLeod & Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Brandon Sellers, III +1 334 269 4440
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Non-Image Entry). (RK, ) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    Order Discharging Standing Trustee,Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case: It appearing to the Court that the trustee in this case has performed all of the duties required of him in the administration of this case; that he has made distribution by order of this Court, and has rendered a full and complete account thereof, and no adverse interest being represented; It is therefore ORDERED that the Ch 12/13 trustee be discharged and relieved of his trust, and that he and the sureties on this bond be released from further liability thereunder; It is further Ordered that this case be, and the same is hereby CLOSED. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry). (RK, ) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
      BNC Certificate of Service - Order of Discharge - (RE: related document(s)98 Discharging Both Debtors After Completion of Ch 13 Plan, ). No. of Notices: 56. Service Date 11/01/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
        Order Discharging Both Debtors After Completion of Ch 13 Plan. (Certificate of Service will be filed within 5 days) Entered On 10/30/2007 (RE: related document(s)96 Final Report and Final Account of Ch 13 Trustee (Payments to Creditors) and Motion to Discharge Debtor After Completion of Ch 13 Plan). (RK, ) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
          Trustee's Order Releasing Wages. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
            Final Report and Final Account of Ch 13 Trustee (Payments to Creditors) and Motion to Discharge Debtor After Completion of Ch 13 Plan. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/8/2007, Entered: None
              BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)92 Order). No. of Notices: 2. Service Date 04/08/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/08/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/8/2007, Entered: None
                BNC Certificate of Service - Order of Discharge - (RE: related document(s)93 Discharging Both Debtors After Completion of Ch 13 Plan, ). No. of Notices: 46. Service Date 04/08/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/08/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                  Order Discharging Both Debtors After Completion of Ch 13 Plan. (Certificate of Service will be filed within 5 days) Entered On 4/6/2007 (RE: related document(s)87 Motion filed by Debtor Willard Till, Joint Debtor Mary Dorris Till, 92 Order). (CS, ) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                    Order Granting Motion (Related Doc # 87) Entered On 4/6/2007. (CS, ) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                      BNC Certificate of Service - Hearing - (RE: related document(s)90 Hearing (Bk), Hearing (Bk)). No. of Notices: 2. Service Date 03/22/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Notice of Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)87 Motion for Entry of Discharge After Completiton of Chapter 13 Plan). Hearing scheduled for 4/2/2007 at 09:15 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Williams Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. (JC, ) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                          Administrative Error (Non-Image Entry) NOTED SUBMISSION ERROR - NO NEED TO BE SET FOR HEARING - (RE: related document(s)88 Hearing (Bk), Hearing (Bk)). (JC, ) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                            NOTED SUBMISSION ERROR - NO NEED TO BE SET FOR HEARING - Notice of Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)87 Motion for Entry of Discharge After Completiton of Chapter 13 Plan). Hearing scheduled for 4/2/2007 at 09:15 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Williams Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. (JC, ) Modified on 3/19/2007 (JC, ). (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                              Debtor's Motion for Entry of Discharge Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Mary Dorris Till, Willard Till. (McLeod, Vonda) Modified Untermed Motion Per Chambers - Hearing To Be Set - on 3/20/2007 (JC, ). (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                Adversary case 07-03001. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): Complaint against CitiCapital Commercial Corporation. -NO FEE DUE- Filed by Vonda S. McLeod, Willard Till, Mary Dorris Till on behalf of Willard Till, Mary Dorris Till. (McLeod, Vonda) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None
                                  BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)84 Order on Motion to Surrender/Turnover). No. of Notices: 3. Service Date 09/07/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                    Order Granting Motion for Surrender/Turnover (Related Doc # 81) Entered On 9/5/2006. (RK, ) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                      BNC Certificate of Service - Hearing - (RE: related document(s)82 Hearing (Bk)). No. of Notices: 5. Service Date 08/18/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/19/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Notice of Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)81 Motion to Surrender/Turnover, Funds Being Held by Citicapital). Hearing scheduled for 8/28/2006 at 09:15 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Williams Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. (JC, ) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                          Debtor's Motion to Surrender/Turnover Funds Being Held by Citicapital Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Mary Dorris Till, Willard Till (RE: related document(s)72 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Willard Till, Joint Debtor Mary Dorris Till, 73 Order on Objection to Claim). (McLeod, Vonda) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None
                                            BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)79 Order on Objection to Claim). No. of Notices: 3. Service Date 03/10/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/11/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None
                                              Order Sustaining Objection to Claim, Order Reducing Claim to Amount Paid (Claim #11 Reduced and Allowed Claim) Entered On 3/8/2006 (RE: related document(s)75 Objection to Claim). (RK, ) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                BNC Certificate of Service - Hearing - (RE: related document(s)77 Hearing (Bk)). No. of Notices: 3. Service Date 02/15/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Notice of Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)75 Objection to Claim, 76 Response). Hearing scheduled for 3/6/2006 at 09:15 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Williams Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. (JV, ) (Entered: 02/13/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                    Response to TRUSTEE'S OBJECTION TO SECURED PROOF OF CLAIM Filed by Daniel L. Feinstein on behalf of Wachovia Bank Of Delaware fka First Union National Bank of Delaware (RE: related document(s)75 Objection to Claim). (Feinstein, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                      Trustee's Objection to Claim(s). Responses due by 2/13/2006. (Reding, Curtis-SR) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                        BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)73 Order on Objection to Claim). No. of Notices: 4. Service Date 12/14/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                          Order Sustaining Objection to Claim of Citicapital Commercial Entered On 12/12/2005 (RE: related document(s)72 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Willard Till, Joint Debtor Mary Dorris Till). (JC, ) Modified on 12/12/2005 (JC, ). (Entered: 12/12/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                            Objection to Claim No. 4 of Citifinancial Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Mary Dorris Till, Willard Till. Responses due by 12/9/2005. (McLeod, Vonda) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                              BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)70 Order On Rule 9007-1 Motion). No. of Notices: 48. Service Date 01/06/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                Order Granting Rule 9007-1 Motion: Motion to Modify Plan Post-Confirmation. (Related Doc # 67) Entered On 1/4/2005. (JV, ) (Entered: 01/04/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)68 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). No. of Notices: 6. Service Date 12/18/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/19/2004)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    Order Dismissing Motion For Relief From Stay (The Peoples Bank and Trust Company) (Related Doc # 42) Entered On 12/16/2004. (YP, ) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      Rule 9007-1 Motion: Motion to Modify Plan Post-Confirmation Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Mary Dorris Till, Willard Till. Responses due by 1/3/2005. (McLeod, Vonda) (Entered: 12/10/2004)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)65 Order on Objection to Claim). No. of Notices: 6. Service Date 12/02/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          Order Sustaining Objection to Claim (Order Disallows Claim #12 of Sherman Acquistion) Entered On 11/30/2004 (RE: related document(s)61 Objection to Claim). (JC, ) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)63 Order on Objection). No. of Notices: 5. Service Date 11/18/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                              Order To Show Cause Why Proceeding Should Not Be Dismissed (The Peoples Bank and Trust Company) Entered On 11/16/2004. Hearing Set for 12/13/2004 at 9:15 a.m., Courtroom 4-C, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL (RE: related document(s)42 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Petitioning Creditor The Peoples Bank and Trust Company). (LO, ) Modified text to put in hrg. date on 11/22/2004 (RK, ). (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Submission Error Trustee's Objection to Claim. (Non-Image Entry) Filed by Curtis-AD Reding on behalf of Curtis C. Reding (RE: related document(s)59 Objection to Claim). (Reding, Curtis-AD) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  Trustee's Objection to Claim(s). Responses due by 11/29/2004. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice is hereby given that the first page of the referenced motion, notice or objection did not contain or feature prominently the notice legend required by the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the Middle District of Alabama. Failure to cure the deficiency within 7 days shall subject the motion, notice or objection to dismissal without further notice. (RE: related document(s)59 Objection to Claim). Incomplete Filings due by 11/3/2004. (RK, ) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                      Trustee's Objection to Claim(s). Responses due by 11/26/2004. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        Trustee's Claim Audit Action Request on Claim Number(s) 4 amends claim #3 not claim #1. (Non-Image Entry) Filed by Trustee Curtis C. Reding. (Reding, Curtis-AD) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)56 Order On Trustee's Motion to Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte)). No. of Notices: 46. Service Date 08/06/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/07/2004)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                            Conditional Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Case On Trustee's Motion To Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte) Entered On 8/4/2004 (RE: related document(s)50 Objection filed by Debtor Willard Till, Debtor Mary Dorris Till). (RK, ) (Entered: 08/04/2004)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                              Trustee's Income Withholding Order. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                Trustee's Order Releasing Wages. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Trustee's Income Withholding Order. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Service - Hearing - (RE: related document(s)51 Hearing (Bk), Hearing (Bk)). No. of Notices: 4. Service Date 07/23/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/24/2004)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)49 Trustee's Motion to Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte), 50 Objection to Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled for 8/2/2004 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 4C, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. (JV, ) (Entered: 07/21/2004)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Objection to Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Mary Dorris Till, Willard Till (RE: related document(s)49 Trustee's Motion to Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte)). (McLeod, Vonda) (Entered: 07/20/2004)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Trustee's Motion to Conditionally Dismiss Case (ExParte). Responses due by 07/23/2004. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 06/30/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s)47 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). No. of Notices: 2. Service Date 05/08/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/09/2004)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Order Withdrawing Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 10) Entered On 5/6/2004. (RK, ) Modified related document number on 5/7/2004 (RK, ). (Entered: 05/06/2004)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Service - Hearing - No. of Notices: 5. Service Date 04/08/2004. (Related Doc # 44) (Admin.) (Entered: 04/09/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Hearing Continued on matter filed by Barry L. Thompson of Silver, Voit & Thompson on behalf of CitiCapital Commercial Corporation (RE: related document(s) 34 Hearing (Bk) Cont, Hearing (Bk) Cont, 10 Motion for Relief From Stay). Hearing scheduled for 5/3/2004 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 4C, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. (GW, ) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)42 Motion for Relief From Stay). Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2004 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 4C, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. (GW, ) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(03-33157) [motion,mrlfst13] ( 150.00) filing fee. Receipt number 1127B870153, amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Motion for Relief from Stay. Fee Amount $150. Filed by Michael W. Slocumb on behalf of The Peoples Bank and Trust Company. Responses due by 4/28/2004. (Slocumb, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2004)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - No. of Notices: 45. Service Date 04/01/2004. (Related Doc # 40) (Admin.) (Entered: 04/02/2004)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Order Conditionally Granting Motion To Modify Plan (Related Doc # 35) Entered On 3/30/2004. Objections due by 4/30/2004. (RK, ) (Entered: 03/30/2004)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Notice of Electronic Submission Error (Non-Image Entry) (RE: related document(s)37 Amended Schedules (No Fee)). Amended Schedule D should be filed under a Different Event, Filer Notified (RK, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Trustee's Recommendation on Modified Plan/Schedules: Modified plan proposed is feasible. Request for negative notice. (Non-Image Entry). (Reding, Curtis-DP) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTED SUBMISSION ERROR - INCORRECT FILING EVENT USED FOR AMENDED SCHEDULE D, FILER NOTIFIED - Amended Schedules. B, C, D, J and Summary Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Mary Dorris Till, Willard Till (RE: related document(s)35 Modify Plan filed by Debtor Willard Till, Debtor Mary Dorris Till). (McLeod, Vonda) Modified text on 3/26/2004 (RK, ). (Entered: 03/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    First Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan Post-Confirmation Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Mary Dorris Till, Willard Till (RE: related document(s)16 Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan, filed by Debtor Willard Till, Debtor Mary Dorris Till, 35 Modify Plan filed by Debtor Willard Till, Debtor Mary Dorris Till). (McLeod, Vonda) (Entered: 03/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Debtor's Motion to Modify Plan Post-Confirmation Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Mary Dorris Till, Willard Till. (McLeod, Vonda) (Entered: 03/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Hearing Continued from 3/15/04 docket on matter filed by Barry L. Thompson of Silver, Voit & Thompson on behalf of CitiCapital Commercial Corporation (RE: related document(s) 31 Hearing (Bk) Cont, Hearing (Bk) Cont, 10 Motion for Relief From Stay). Hearing scheduled for 3/29/2004 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 4C, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. (JV, ) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - No. of Notices: 5. Service Date 02/20/2004. (Related Doc # 32) (Admin.) (Entered: 02/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 25) Entered On 2/17/2004. (RK, ) (Entered: 02/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Hearing Continued on matter filed by Barry L. Thompson of Silver, Voit & Thompson on behalf of CitiCapital Commercial Corporation (RE: related document(s)21 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay,, 10 Motion for Relief From Stay). Hearing scheduled for 3/15/2004 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 4C, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. (GW, ) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (B). (Lee, Thomas-KL) (Entered: 01/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit Re: MOTION Filed by Angela L. Randall on behalf of Wachovia Bank Of Delaware fka First Union National Bank of Delaware (RE: related document(s)25 Motion for Relief From Stay, filed by Creditor Wachovia Bank Of Delaware fka First Union National Bank of Delaware). (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Randall, Angela) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Service - Hearing - No. of Notices: 5. Service Date 01/15/2004. (Related Doc # 27) (Admin.) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)25 Motion for Relief From Stay, ). Hearing scheduled for 2/2/2004 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 4C, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. (GW, ) (Entered: 01/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Termination of Automatic Stay Pursuant to Order of December 12, 2003 Filed by Barry L. Thompson on behalf of CitiCapital Commercial Corporation. (Thompson, Barry) (Entered: 01/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Relief from Stay. Receipt Number cc 03-33157, Fee Amount $150. Filed by Angela L. Randall on behalf of Wachovia Bank Of Delaware fka First Union National Bank of Delaware. (Attachments: 1 Note) (Randall, Angela) Modified receipt on 1/13/2004 (JI, ). (Entered: 01/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Angela L. Randall on behalf of Wachovia Bank Of Delaware fka First Union National Bank of Delaware. (Randall, Angela) (Entered: 01/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Error-WRONG DOCKET EVENT USED-(Non-Image Entry) (RE: related document(s)21 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay, ). (DAW, ) (Entered: 12/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - No. of Notices: 4. Service Date 12/17/2003. (Related Doc # 21) (Admin.) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Order Conditionally Granting Motion For Relief From Stay And Order Continuing Hearing At The United States Bankruptcy Court, United States Annex, One Church St., Courtroom No. 4-C, Montgomery, ALabama On January 26, 2004 at 10:30 a.m.(Related Doc # 10)(12) Entered On 12/12/2003. (JT, ) (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Bowdy J. Brown on behalf of Federal Land Bank Association of South Alabama. (Brown, Bowdy) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Service - Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan - No. of Notices: 45. Service Date 12/05/2003. (Related Doc # 18) (Admin.) (Entered: 12/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Certificate of Service will be filed within 5 days) Entered On 12/3/2003 (RE: related document(s)17 Trustee's Summary of Confirmed Ch 13 Plan, 5 Mtg of Creditors Chapter 13 and Notice of Confirmation Hrg, ). (RK, ) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Trustee's Summary of Confirmed Ch 13 Plan and Request for Order Confirming Plan. (Reding, Curtis-EC) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Debtor's Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Vonda S. McLeod on behalf of Mary Dorris Till, Willard Till (RE: related document(s)3 Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Willard Till, Debtor Mary Dorris Till). (Attachments: 1 Amendment to Chapter 13 and Notification of Amended Plan)(McLeod, Vonda) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Gene R. Clark Filed by Gene R. Clark on behalf of HomEq Servicing Corporation. (Clark, Gene) (Entered: 11/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing Filed by Barry L. Thompson on behalf of CitiCapital Commercial Corporation (related document(s)10). Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2003 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 4C, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. (Thompson, Barry) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Proceeding Memo - Hearing Held (Non-Image Entry) Filed by Curtis C. Reding (related document(s) 5 ). (Reding, Curtis-MM) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing Set On Motion for Relief from Stay and Co-Debtor Stay (related document(s)10). Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2003 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 4C, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. (RK, ) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit Re: Motion for Relief from Stay & Co-Debtor Stay Filed by Barry L. Thompson on behalf of CitiCapital Commercial Corporation (related document(s)10). (Thompson, Barry) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Relief from Stay and Co-debtor Stay. Receipt Number CC03-9324, Fee Amount $150. Filed by Barry L. Thompson on behalf of CitiCapital Commercial Corporation. (Thompson, Barry) Modified receipt on 11/12/2003 (LB, ). (Entered: 11/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Barry L. Thompson Filed by Barry L. Thompson on behalf of CitiCapital Commercial Corporation. (Thompson, Barry) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?