NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD v. GIBBS CONTRACTING, INC.
Federal Court Proceeding District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-mc-01297

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 2:36 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Helene D. Lerner +1 202 273 3738 +1 202 273 4244 helene.lerner@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo GIBBS CONTRACTING, INC., Respondent
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Corrected Application by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Application, # 2 Exhibit A to Corrected Application, # 3 Exhibit B to Corrected Application)(Lerner, Helene) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT (APPLICATION) against GIBBS CONTRACTING, INC. (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Declaration of Eric Weitz, # 6 ENTERED IN ERROR..... Civil Cover Sheet)(Lerner, Helene) Modified on 6/21/2016 (md). (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 158 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?