Exxon Mobil Corporation v. Healey
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-00469-K
District Judge Ed Kinkeade, presiding

Tags
Last Updated May 23, 2017 at 11:48 PM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

ExxonMobil Corporation ExxonMobil Corporation, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, MOBIL CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by Cantey Hanger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Alix Dean Allison +1 817 877 2800 aallison@canteyhanger.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Ralph H Duggins +1 817 877 2800 +1 817 877 2807 rduggins@canteyhanger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Philip Avery Vickers +1 817 877 2849 +1 817 877 2807 pvickers@canteyhanger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ExxonMobil Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Daniel E Bolia +1 832 648 5500 +1 832 625 0379 daniel.e.bolia@exxonmobil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Patrick J. Conlon +1 713 656 5074 patrick.j.conlon@exxonmobil.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Nina Cortell +1 214 651 5579 +1 214 200 0411 nina.cortell@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Justin Ashley Anderson, PHV +1 202 223 7321 +1 202 204 7393 janderson@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted MICHELE HIRSHMAN +1 212 273 3000 +1 212 757 3990 mhirshman@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Daniel John Toal +1 212 373 3869 +1 212 492 0869 dtoal@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted THEODORE V. WELLS +1 212 373 3089 +1 212 492 0089 twells@paulweiss.com
v.
No Logo Eric Tradd Schneiderman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reese Gordon Marketos LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tyler J Bexley +1 214 382 9810 +1 214 501 0731 tyler.bexley@rgmfirm.com
Space Peter D. Marketos +1 214 382 9810 +1 214 501 0731 pete.marketos@rgmfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 610

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey M. Tillotson +1 214 382 3040 jtillotson@tillotsonlaw.com
No Logo Maura Tracy Healey, Defendant
No Logo ADR Provider, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Stanton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M Stanton +1 972 233 2300 +1 972 692 6812 JMS@stantonllp.com
No Logo Leonid Goldstein, Movant
No Logo Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, ALABAMA, MICHIGAN, ARIZONA, WISCONSIN, NEBRASKA, OKLAHOMA, UTAH, AND NEVADA, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Texas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Austin R Nimocks +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 370 9337 austin.nimocks@texasattorneygeneral.gov
No Logo State of Maryland, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thiruvendran Vignarajah +1 410 576 6330 tvignarajah@oag.state.md.us
No Logo State of New York, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith Naomi Vale +1 212 416 6274 judith.vale@ag.ny.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Office Fort Worth
Filed 6/15/2016
Jury Demand None
Demand
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Tarrant
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
416-cv-00364-K
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ADR
  Entries (182) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 180 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The merits of Exxon's claims, which involve important issues, should be considered in the proper venue. Accordingly, this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Manhattan Division. 28 U.S.C. § 1406. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/29/2017) (tln) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 178 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Rhys Davies. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/8/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Andrew Rhys Davies (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8185974) filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Appendix in Support filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman re 176 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 133 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Bexley, Tyler) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 176 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman re 133 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, 164 Order,, In Further Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Bexley, Tyler) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Appendix in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re 174 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion In Support of This Court's Personal Jurisdiction Over the Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - B, # 2 Exhibit(s) C - D, # 3 Exhibit(s) E - H, # 4 Exhibit(s) I - M, # 5 Exhibit(s) N - R) (Duggins, Ralph) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 174 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THIS COURT'S PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER THE DEFENDANTS filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re 164 Order. (Duggins, Ralph) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                LREF
                Blank 173 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Appendix in Support filed by Maura Tracy Healey re 172 Brief in Support of Dismissal for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Kamprath, Richard) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                  LREF
                  Blank 172 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Brief in Support of Dismissal for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Maura Tracy Healey. (Kamprath, Richard) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                    LREF
                    Blank 171 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Appendix in Support filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman re 133 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Supplemental Appendix) (Bexley, Tyler) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                      LREF
                      Blank 170 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman re: 133 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Bexley, Tyler) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                        LREF
                        Blank 169 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY filed by Maura Tracy Healey re: 124 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Appendix in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re 167 Response/Objection (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-B, # 2 Exhibit(s) C-F, # 3 Exhibit(s) G, # 4 Exhibit(s) H-I, # 5 Exhibit(s) J) (Duggins, Ralph) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re: 133 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Duggins, Ralph) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Appendix in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re 165 Response/Objection to Atty General Healey's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Duggins, Ralph) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RESPONSE filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re: 124 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Duggins, Ralph) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER: The Court hereby extends the deadline set by the Court's, December 12, 2016 Order (Doc. No. 159), to February 1, 2017 and ORDERS all parties to submit a brief to the Court regarding whether this Court has personal jurisdiction over Defendants Attorney General Healey and/or Attorney General Schneiderman. The briefs shall be no more than twenty-five (25) pages in length. No extensions of this deadline will be considered absent exigent circumstances. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/15/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: The Court hereby stays all discovery pending further order from this Court. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/15/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER - Before the Court is Defendant Maura Tracy Healey's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 41). The Court DENIES THE MOTION AS MOOT because Plaintiff Exxon amended its Complaint on November 10, 2016 (Doc. No. 100) and Attorney General Healey filed Defendant Attorney General Maura Healey's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint on November 28, 2016 (Doc. No. 124). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/14/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 161 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        USCA ORDER No. 16-11741. IT IS ORDERED that the petition for writ of mandamus is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to stay District Court proceedings pending the petition for writ of mandamus is DENIED AS MOOT. Court Order issued Dec. 13, 2016. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter) (tle) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 160 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Clarification to prior filing re: 156 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Appellate Review filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 159 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER: The Court ORDERS all parties to submit a brief to the Court regarding whether this Court has personal jurisdiction over Defendants Attorney General Healey and/or Attorney General Schneiderman totaling twenty-five (25) pages. All briefing on this issue of personal jurisdiction must be filed on or before January 4, 2017. No extensions of this deadline will be considered absent exigent circumstances. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/12/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 158 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: The Court hereby cancels the deposition of Attorney General Healey that is set for Tuesday, December 13, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/12/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman re 156 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Appellate Review (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 156 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Appellate Review filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 149 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric Del Pozo. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/9/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 148 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leslie B. Dubeck. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/9/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 147 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John D. Castiglione. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/9/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER denying 135 and 140 : After careful consideration of Defendants Motions, the responses, the replies, the supporting appendices, and the applicable law, the Court DENIES Defendants' Motions and all requested relief. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/9/2016) (wxc) Modified on 12/9/2016 (ewd). (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            PETITION FOR A WRIT OF MANDAMUS received from United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit [16-11741]. (tle) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 150 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              REPLY filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman re: 135 MOTION to Quash (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Eric Del Pozo (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8057094) filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Leslie B. Dubeck (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8057073) filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney John D. Castiglione (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8056974) filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 146 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REPLY filed by Maura Tracy Healey re: 140 MOTION to Stay Pending Appellate Review (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re 144 Response/Objection to Motion to Quash (Duggins, Ralph) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 144 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RESPONSE filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re: 135 MOTION to Quash (Duggins, Ralph) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as duplicative 138 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Brown. Clerk shall return admission fee to Applicant. The Court will consider the 132 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Brown, that was filed on this same date. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/7/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re: 140 MOTION to Stay Pending Appellate Review (Cortell, Nina) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER EXPEDITING RESPONSE AND REPLY DEADLINE re: 140 MOTION to Stay Pending Appellate Review. Responses due by 5:00 p.m, on 12/7/2016. Replies due by 5:00 p.m., on 12/8/2016. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/6/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 140 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Pending Appellate Review filed by Maura Tracy Healey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER EXPEDITING RESPONSE AND REPLY DEADLINE re: 135 MOTION to Quash . Responses due by 5:00 p.m, on 12/7/2016. Replies due by 5:00 p.m., on 12/8/2016. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/6/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 138 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney S. Jason Brown (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8048206) filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman re 135 MOTION to Quash , 133 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, 136 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 134 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Quash (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 136 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman re 135 MOTION to Quash (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 135 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION to Quash filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman re 133 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jason Brown (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8047624) filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Marketos, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 131 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Massachusetts Attorney General Maura Healey's Motion to Reconsider Jurisdictional Discovery Order (Doc. No. 78 ) and Attorney General Healey's Motion to Vacate and Reconsider November 17 Order, Stay Discovery, and Enter a Protective Order (Doc. No. 120 ). After careful consideration, the Court DENIES Defendant's Motions. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/5/2016) (tln) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 130 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Maura Tracy Healey re: 120 MOTION to Vacate 117 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,,, Corrected MOTION to Stay MOTION for Protective Order (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 126 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Roderick L. Arz. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/1/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 128 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re 127 Response/Objection (Duggins, Ralph) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 127 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re: 120 MOTION to Vacate 117 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,,, Corrected MOTION to Stay MOTION for Protective Order (Duggins, Ralph) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Roderick L. Arz (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8029943) filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Bexley, Tyler) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 125 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Maura Tracy Healey re 124 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Maura Tracy Healey (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER EXPEDITING RESPONSE AND REPLY DEADLINE re: 120 MOTION to Vacate 117 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,,, Corrected. Responses due by 3:00 p.m. on 11/29/2016. Replies due by 3:00 p.m. on 12/1/2016. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/26/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 11/26/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 122 Filed: 11/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Maura Tracy Healey re 120 MOTION to Vacate 117 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,,, Corrected (Attachments: # 1 Declaration(s) of Peter C. Mulcahy, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1, # 3 Exhibit(s) 2, # 4 Exhibit(s) 3, # 5 Exhibit(s) 4, # 6 Exhibit(s) 5, # 7 Exhibit(s) 6, # 8 Exhibit(s) 7) (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 11/26/2016)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 121 Filed: 11/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Maura Tracy Healey re 120 MOTION to Vacate 117 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,,, Corrected (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 11/26/2016)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 11/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION TO VACATE AND RECONSIDER 117 NOVEMBER 17 ORDER, STAY DISCOVERY, AND ENTER A PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed by Maura Tracy Healey. (Entered: 11/26/2016)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Maura Tracy Healey re 118 MOTION to Vacate 117 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration(s) of Peter C. Mulcahy, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1, # 3 Exhibit(s) 2, # 4 Exhibit(s) 3, # 5 Exhibit(s) 4, # 6 Exhibit(s) 5, # 7 Exhibit(s) 6, # 8 Exhibit(s) 7) (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 11/25/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 117 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER: On November 16, 2016, the Court conducted a telephone status conference with the parties. In order to expeditiously conduct the necessary discovery to inform the Court on issues relating to pending and anticipated motions related to jurisdictional matters, the Court orders that Attorney General Healey shall respond to written discovery ten (10) days from the date the discovery is served. It is further ordered that Attorney General Healey shall appear for her deposition in Courtroom 1627 at 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242 at 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, December 13, 2016. Attorney General Schneiderman is also advised to be available on December 13, 2016 in Dallas, Texas. The Court will enter an Order regarding Attorney General Schneiderman's deposition after he files his answer in this matter. The Court is mindful of the busy schedule of each of the Attorneys General Healey and Schneiderman and will be open to considering a different date for the deposition. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/17/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 11/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION TO VACATE 117 ORDER FOR DEPOSITION OF ATTORNEY GENERAL HEALEY AND STAY DISCOVERY, AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Maura Tracy Healey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Cawley, Douglas). (Entered: 11/25/2016)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of [Corrected] Joining Attorney General Schneidermans Response to Plaintiffs Request for Status Conference re: [113] Notice (Other) filed by Maura Tracy Healey (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Joining Attorney General Schneidermans Response to Plaintiffs Request for Status Conference re: [113] Notice (Other) filed by Maura Tracy Healey (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 11-16-16 before Judge Kinkeade. Court Reporter/Transcriber Todd Anderson, Telephone number 214-753-2170. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (25 pages) Redaction Request due 12/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2017. (jta)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Response to Plaintiff's Request for Status Conference re: [112] Notice (Other) filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Bexley, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of (Corrected) Request for Status Conference filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Cortell, Nina)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016, Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                        Request for Status Conference filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Cortell, Nina) Modified document title and terminated motion event per DJ chambers on 11/16/2016 (bdb).
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Summons Returned
                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Eric Tradd Schneiderman ; served on 11/14/2016. (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ed Kinkeade: Telephone Conference held on 11/16/2016. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Nina Cortell, Justin Anderson, Ted Wells, Pat Conlon, Dan Bolia, and Michele Hirshman. Defense - AG Healey - Richard Johnson, Melissa Hoffer, and Douglas Cawley. AG Schneiderman - Jason Brown, Jeff Tillotson, Pete Marketos and Roderick Arz.. (Court Reporter: Todd Anderson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :26. (chmb)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document
                                                                                                                                              (Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Eric Tradd Schneiderman (Bexley, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey M Tillotson on behalf of Eric Tradd Schneiderman. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler J Bexley on behalf of Eric Tradd Schneiderman. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Bexley, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter D Marketos on behalf of Eric Tradd Schneiderman. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Marketos, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016, Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                      Request for Status Conference filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Cortell, Nina) Modified document title and terminated motion event per DJ chambers on 11/16/2016 (bdb).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Eric Tradd Schneiderman. (tln)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: 11/11/2016 Request for Clerk to Issue Document
                                                                                                                                                          Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Vickers, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re [100] First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A - B, # (2) Exhibits C - F, # (3) Exhibits G - M, # (4) Exhibits N - R, # (5) Exhibits S - W, # (6) Exhibits X - GG, # (7) Exhibits HH - KK, # (8) Exhibits LL - MM, # (9) Exhibits NN - OO, # (10) Exhibits PP - TT, # (11) Exhibits UU - WW) (axm)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 100 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Maura Tracy Healey, Eric Tradd Schneiderman filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [74] Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/10/2016) (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by Leonid Goldstein re: [87] MOTION to Intervene (Goldstein, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re [96] Reply in Further Support of Exxon Mobil Corporation's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re: [74] MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: 11/7/2016 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Maura Tracy Healey re [94] Response/Objection to Exxon Mobil Corporation's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Declaration(s) of Peter Mulcahy, # (2) Exhibit(s) 1, # (3) Exhibit(s) 2, # (4) Exhibit(s) 3, # (5) Exhibit(s) 4, # (6) Exhibit(s) 5) (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: 11/7/2016 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE filed by Maura Tracy Healey re: [74] MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Maura Tracy Healey re: [87] MOTION to Intervene (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [77] Motion to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Motion for Leave to Amend. Attorney General Healey's opposition to ExxonMobils Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint (Doc. No. [74]) should be filed no later than NOON on November 7, 2016. Plaintiff Exxon Mobil's reply to Attorney General Healeys opposition to its Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint should be filed no later than NOON on November 9, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/3/2016) (ewd)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 91 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY filed by Maura Tracy Healey re: [78] MOTION for Reconsideration re [73] Order, Attorney General Healey's Motion to Reconsider Jurisdictional Discovery Order (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re: [78] MOTION for Reconsideration re [73] Order, Attorney General Healey's Motion to Reconsider Jurisdictional Discovery Order (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER SETTING RESPONSE DEADLINE re: [87] MOTION to Intervene. Any Responses due by 11/04/2016. There shall be no reply unless ordered by the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/25/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Leonid Goldstein. (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene filed by Leonid Goldstein. (Attachments: # (1) proposed complaint, # (2) appendix) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Maura Tracy Healey re [85] Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend (Attachments: # (1) Declaration(s) of Peter C. Mulcahy, # (2) Exhibit(s) 1, # (3) Exhibit(s) 2, # (4) Exhibit(s) 3, # (5) Exhibit(s) 4) (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Maura Tracy Healey re: [77] MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER EXPEDITING RESPONSE AND REPLY DEADLINE re: [78] MOTION for Reconsideration re [73] Order, Attorney General Healey's Motion to Reconsider Jurisdictional Discovery Order. Responses due by 10/27/2016. Replies due by 10/31/2016. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/20/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER EXPEDITING RESPONSE DEADLINE re: [77] MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. Responses due by NOON on 10/21/2016. There shall be no Reply unless ordered by the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/20/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER VACATING ORDERS 80 and 81. Corrected orders to follow. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***VACATED PER ORDER 82*** ELECTRONIC ORDER EXPEDITING RESPONSE AND REPLY DEADLINES re: [78] MOTION for Reconsideration re [73] Order, Attorney General Healey's Motion to Reconsider Jurisdictional Discovery Order. Responses due by 10/27/2016. Replies due by 10/31/2016. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/20/2016) (chmb) Modified on 10/20/2016 (chmb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***VACATED PER ORDER No. 82*** ELECTRONIC ORDER EXPEDITING RESPONSE DEADLINE re: [77] MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. Responses due by NOON on 10/21/2016. There shall be no reply unless ordered by the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/20/2016) (chmb) Modified on 10/20/2016 (chmb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Maura Tracy Healey re [78] MOTION for Reconsideration re [73] Order, Attorney General Healey's Motion to Reconsider Jurisdictional Discovery Order (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [73] Order, Attorney General Healey's Motion to Reconsider Jurisdictional Discovery Order filed by Maura Tracy Healey (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016, Terminated: 11/3/2016 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re [74] MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, [75] Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A, # (2) Exhibit(s) B (Declaration of Justin Anderson), # (3) Exhibit(s) B2 (A - B), # (4) Exhibit(s) B3 (C - F), # (5) Exhibit(s) B4 (G - M), # (6) Exhibit(s) B5 (N - R), # (7) Exhibit(s) B6 (S - W), # (8) Exhibit(s) B7 (X - GG), # (9) Exhibit(s) B8 (HH - KK), # (10) Exhibit(s) B9 (LL - MM), # (11) Exhibit(s) B10 (NN - OO), # (12) Exhibit(s) B11 (PP - TT), # (13) Exhibit(s) B12 (UU - WW), # (14) Exhibit(s) C) (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 75 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re [74] MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016, Terminated: 11/10/2016 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Before reaching a decision on either Plaintiff Exxon's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction or Defendant Attorney General Healey's Motion to Dismiss, the Court ORDERS that jurisdictional discovery be conducted. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/13/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:73. Thu Oct 13 12:05:32 CDT 2016 (crt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [70] Motion for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff Exxon Mobil Corporation's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/26/2016) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:72. Mon Sep 26 15:34:26 CDT 2016 (crt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 71 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support filed by Bharani Padmanabhan re [70] MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Texas. (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016, Terminated: 9/26/2016 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Texas filed by Bharani Padmanabhan. (Attachments: # (1) proposed brief) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEDIATION ORDER. The Court hereby appoints Mr. James Stanton with Stanton Law Firm PC, 9400 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 1304, Dallas, Texas 75231 as mediator in this case. The parties are ordered to mediate with Mr. Stanton within sixteen (16) days from the date of this Order at Mr. Stantons earliest convenience and direction. The Court further orders all attorneys and their clients to be present as well as representatives with full settlement authority, unless otherwise directed by Mr. Stanton. Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/22/2016) (chmb) (Main Document 69 replaced on 9/22/2016) (chmb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 9-19-16 before Judge Kinkeade. Court Reporter/Transcriber Todd Anderson, Telephone number 214-753-2170. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (105 pages) Redaction Request due 10/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2016. (jta) (Main Document 68 replaced on 9/26/2016) (chmb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ed Kinkeade: Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2016 re [8] Motion for Injunction filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Justin Anderson; Ted Wells; Sam Rudman; Nina Cortell; Ralph Duggins; and Jack Balagia; Defense - Richard Johnston; Melissa Hoffer; Peter Mulcahy; Douglas Cawley; and Richard Kamprath. (Court Reporter: Todd Anderson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 2:05. (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Maura Tracy Healey re [65] Reply Supplemental Appendix in Support of Attorney General Healey's Reply to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Pages 1-7) (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Maura Tracy Healey re: [41] MOTION to Dismiss (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER EXPEDITING RESPONSE DEADLINE: re: [63] MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae Any Responses due by 9/13/2016. There shall be no reply unless ordered by the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/9/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae filed by Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, ALABAMA, MICHIGAN, ARIZONA, WISCONSIN, NEBRASKA, OKLAHOMA, UTAH, AND NEVADA with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Additional Page(s) Brief in Support of Motion, # (2) Additional Page(s) Proposed Amicus Brief, # (3) Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave)Attorney Austin R Nimocks added to party Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, ALABAMA, MICHIGAN, ARIZONA, WISCONSIN, NEBRASKA, OKLAHOMA, UTAH, AND NEVADA(pty:am) (Nimocks, Austin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER SETTING HEARING re: [8] MOTION for Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade in the US Courthouse, Courtroom 1627, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/8/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re [60] Response/Objection (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re: [41] MOTION to Dismiss (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [44] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Judith N. Vale. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/30/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re [57] Reply Supplemental Appendix In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Pages v-45, # (2) Pages 46-122, # (3) Pages 123-168, # (4) Pages 169-177, # (5) Pages 178-185, # (6) Pages 186-199, # (7) Pages 200-284) (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re: [8] MOTION for Injunction (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [40] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thiruvendran Vignarajah. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/24/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re [52] MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED WITHOUT LOCAL COUNSEL. After carefully considering the Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by the amici States, the Court GRANTS the motion to the extent that the amici States seek to file a Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. However, if the amici States seek to present anything further to the Court in writing or orally, the amici States must obtain local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/24/2016) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by State of Maryland. Amendment to [49] Amended Document, [47] Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Vignarajah, Thiruvendran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by State of Maryland. Amendment to [46] MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Vignarajah, Thiruvendran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016, Terminated: 8/24/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED WITHOUT LOCAL COUNSEL by State of Maryland. Amendment to [45] MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Vignarajah, Thiruvendran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016 Supplemental Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Document by State of Maryland Correspondence. (Vignarajah, Thiruvendran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to [40] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, by Amicus State of Maryland. (Vignarajah, Thiruvendran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED DOCUMENT by State of Maryland. Amendment to [48] Supplemental Document. Amici Curiae Brief. (Vignarajah, Thiruvendran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016 Supplemental Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Document by State of Maryland Correspondence. (Vignarajah, Thiruvendran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of Law filed by State of Maryland re [46] MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief (Vignarajah, Thiruvendran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by State of Maryland (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Vignarajah, Thiruvendran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by State of Maryland (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Vignarajah, Thiruvendran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016, Terminated: 8/30/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7782378) filed by State of New York. Party State of New York added. (Vale, Judith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Maura Tracy Healey re: [8] MOTION for Injunction (Attachments: # (1) Appendix pp 1-390, # (2) Appendix pp 391-425, # (3) Appendix pp 426-465, # (4) Appendix pp 466-514, # (5) Appendix pp 515-564, # (6) Appendix pp 565-614, # (7) Appendix pp 615-664, # (8) Appendix pp 665-714, # (9) Appendix pp 715-764, # (10) Appendix 765-779) (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Maura Tracy Healey re [41] MOTION to Dismiss (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maura Tracy Healey (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016, Terminated: 8/24/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7780379) filed by State of Maryland (Attachments: # (1) certificate of good standing). Party State of Maryland added.Attorney Thiruvendran Vignarajah added to party State of Maryland(pty:am) (Vignarajah, Thiruvendran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [34] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter C. Mulcahy. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/15/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [33] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Johnston. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/15/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [32] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melissa A. Hoffer. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/15/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [31] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of I. Andrew Goldberg. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/15/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [30] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christophe Courchesne. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/15/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016, Terminated: 7/15/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Peter C. Mulcahy (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7726557) filed by Maura Tracy Healey (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016, Terminated: 7/15/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Richard A. Johnston (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7726535) filed by Maura Tracy Healey (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016, Terminated: 7/15/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Melissa A. Hoffer (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7726504) filed by Maura Tracy Healey (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016, Terminated: 7/15/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney I. Andrew Goldberg (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7726460) filed by Maura Tracy Healey (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016, Terminated: 7/15/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christophe Courchesne (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7726358) filed by Maura Tracy Healey (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: 7/7/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Alan Kamprath on behalf of Maura Tracy Healey. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Kamprath, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: 7/7/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas A Cawley on behalf of Maura Tracy Healey. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Cawley, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: 6/30/2016 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re [21] Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time for Responses to Complaint and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and to Set a Briefing Schedule, and Leave for Defendant to Appear Without Local Counsel for Limited Purpose of Joining this Motion. The Court GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time for Responses to Complaint and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and to Set a Briefing Schedule. The Court also GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel for, and only for, the purpose of joining the Motion for Enlargement of Time for Responses to Complaint and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and to Set a Briefing Schedule. (See Order for Specifics) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/30/2016) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [4] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michele Hirshman. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/22/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [20] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Theodore V. Wells, Jr.. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/22/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [19] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Toal. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/22/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [18] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin Anderson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/22/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [17] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick J. Conlon. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/22/2016) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/22/2016, Terminated: 6/30/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and to Set Briefing Schedule, and Leave for Defendant to Appear Without Local Counsel for Limited Purpose of Joining this Motion filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Cortell, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016, Terminated: 6/22/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Theodore V. Wells, Jr. (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7670215) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Additional Page(s), # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order) (Allison, Alix)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016, Terminated: 6/22/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Daniel J. Toal (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7670183) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Additional Page(s), # (2) Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order) (Allison, Alix)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016, Terminated: 6/22/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Justin Anderson (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7670153) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Proposed Order) (Allison, Alix)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016, Terminated: 6/22/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Patrick J. Conlon (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7670099) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Additional Page(s), # (2) Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order) (Allison, Alix)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 Summons Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Maura Tracy Healey; served on 6/16/2016. (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall subsequently be filed under case No. 4:16-CV-469-K. Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/21/2016) (trt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016 Court Request For RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Court Request for Recusal: Judge Sidney A Fitzwater recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:16-cv-364-M. (trt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016 Court Request For RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Court Request for Recusal: Judge Reed C O'Connor recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sidney A Fitzwater for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:16-cv-364-D. (trt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RECUSAL: Senior Judge Terry R Means recused. Case is assigned to the docket of Judge Reed C O'Connor. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:16-cv-469-O. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/17/2016) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Maura Tracy Healey. (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re [8] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # (1) part 2, # (2) part 3, # (3) part 4, # (4) part 5, # (5) part 6, # (6) part 7, # (7) part 8) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re [8] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Motion for Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Court Request For RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Court Request for Recusal: Judge John McBryde recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Senior Judge Terry R Means for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:16-cv-00469-Y. (trt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Paper Case Designation OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 6/15/2016) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Judge McBrydeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016, Terminated: 6/22/2016 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Michele Hirshman (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7651942) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing) (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Related Case filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Maura Tracy Healey filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-7651816) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration(s) Justin Anderson, # (2) Exhibit(s) A-C, # (3) Exhibit(s) D-M, # (4) Exhibit(s) N-R, # (5) Exhibit(s) S-Z, # (6) Exhibit(s) AA-OO, # (7) Cover Sheet) (Duggins, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 1,833 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?