DHI Group, Inc. v. Kent, Jr.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-01670
District Judge Gray H. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 23, 2021 at 3:54 PM DT (1.2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DHI Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin T. Jacobs +1 713 229 1947 +1 713 229 7847 kevin.jacobs@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin T. Jacobs +1 713 229 1947 +1 713 229 7847 kevin.jacobs@bakerbotts.com
Space Justin Guy Lipe +1 713 229 1312 justin.lipe@bakerbotts.com
Space Christine Nicole Ng +1 713 229 1331 christine.ng@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amir Halevy +1 713 955 4021 +1 713 955 9644 ahalevy@jlcfirm.com
Space Walter Gaylord Lynch +1 713 955 4026 +1 713 955 9644 wlynch@jlcfirm.com
Space Joseph Webster Golinkin, II +1 832 250 6567 jgolinkin@jlcfirm.com
No Logo Rigzone.com, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin T. Jacobs +1 713 229 1947 +1 713 229 7847 kevin.jacobs@bakerbotts.com
Space Kevin T. Jacobs +1 713 229 1947 +1 713 229 7847 kevin.jacobs@bakerbotts.com
Space Justin Guy Lipe +1 713 229 1312 justin.lipe@bakerbotts.com
Space Christine Nicole Ng +1 713 229 1331 christine.ng@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amir Halevy +1 713 955 4021 +1 713 955 9644 ahalevy@jlcfirm.com
Space Walter Gaylord Lynch +1 713 955 4026 +1 713 955 9644 wlynch@jlcfirm.com
Space Joseph Webster Golinkin, II +1 832 250 6567 jgolinkin@jlcfirm.com
v.
No Logo Bryan Robins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Robins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/20/2017 Bryan Robins

Toggle Switch Represented by ONE RIVERWAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/20/2017 Howard L Close +1 713 572 4321 close@wrightclosebarger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright & Close LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard Louis Close +1 713 572 4321 +1 713 572 4320 close@wrightclose.com
Space Edith Marie Jamison +1 713 572 4321 +1 713 572 4320 jamison@wrightclose.com
Space Andrew Curtis Nelson +1 713 572 4320 nelson@wrightclose.com
No Logo David W. Kent, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan L. Bickley +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 sbickley@BlankRome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara Ann Brown +1 214 999 4887 +1 214 999 3887 sabrown@foley.com
Space James G Munisteri +1 713 276 5752 +1 713 276 5555 jmunisteri@foley.com
Space Marla Thompson Poirot +1 713 276 5122 mpoirot@foley.com
Space Heidi Rasmussen +1 713 276 5239 hrasmussen@foley.com
No Logo Estevan Dufrin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin J Tomko +1 214 462 6447 etomko@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Estevan Dufrin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/20/2017 Estevan Dufrin
No Logo Jeremy Antonini, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by eslawpartners.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/20/2017 TTAB Attorney Placeholder george@eslawpartners.com
TERMINATED: 10/20/2017 Omaima N Poonawala omaima@eslawpartners.com
TERMINATED: 10/20/2017 Murtaza Fakhruddin Sutarwalla +1 832 716 7008 +1 713 583 8715 murtaza@eslawpartners.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeremy Antonini

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/20/2017 Jeremy Antonini
No Logo John Doe No. 1, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir I. Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 720 251 0425 gadeir.abbas@gmail.com
Space Tedrick Knightshead +1 225 389 8730 +1 225 389 8736 knightsheadlaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremiah A. Collins +1 202 842 2600 +1 202 842 1888 jcollins@bredhoff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew G. McAndrews

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew G. McAndrews

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia McConnell +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 pmcconnell@msek.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parish Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank J. Gremillion +1 225 389 8730 + 225 389 8736 fgremillion@brgov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 202 204 0253 gadeir@abbaslawfirm.com
No Logo John Doe No. 10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir I. Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 720 251 0425 gadeir.abbas@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 202 204 0253 gadeir@abbaslawfirm.com
No Logo John Doe No. 2, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir I. Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 720 251 0425 gadeir.abbas@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremiah A. Collins +1 202 842 2600 +1 202 842 1888 jcollins@bredhoff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew G. McAndrews

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew G. McAndrews

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia McConnell +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 pmcconnell@msek.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Lobb PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Lesley Dickson +1 281 488 0630 +1 281 488 2039 kdickson@murray-lobb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 202 204 0253 gadeir@abbaslawfirm.com
No Logo John Doe No. 3, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir I. Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 720 251 0425 gadeir.abbas@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 202 204 0253 gadeir@abbaslawfirm.com
No Logo John Doe No. 4, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir I. Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 720 251 0425 gadeir.abbas@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 202 204 0253 gadeir@abbaslawfirm.com
No Logo John Doe No. 5, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir I. Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 720 251 0425 gadeir.abbas@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 202 204 0253 gadeir@abbaslawfirm.com
No Logo John Doe No. 6, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir I. Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 720 251 0425 gadeir.abbas@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 202 204 0253 gadeir@abbaslawfirm.com
No Logo John Doe No. 7, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir I. Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 720 251 0425 gadeir.abbas@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 202 204 0253 gadeir@abbaslawfirm.com
No Logo John Doe No. 8, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir I. Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 720 251 0425 gadeir.abbas@gmail.com
Space Owen S Jones +1 281 992 1541 +1 281 648 2427 owenjoneslaw@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 202 204 0253 gadeir@abbaslawfirm.com
No Logo John Doe No. 9, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir I. Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 720 251 0425 gadeir.abbas@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 202 204 0253 gadeir@abbaslawfirm.com
No Logo Matthew Kent, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Laszlo & Associates - Shaker Heights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey O. Klein +1 216 410 4356 jklein@laszlolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rusty Hardin & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Pitard Wynne +1 713 652 9000 +1 713 652 9800 bwynne@rustyhardin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wynne Firm, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P Wynne +1 713 658 9001 Bob@TheWynneFirm.com
No Logo Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara Ann Brown +1 214 999 4887 +1 214 999 3887 sabrown@foley.com
Space James G Munisteri +1 713 276 5752 +1 713 276 5555 jmunisteri@foley.com
Space Marla Thompson Poirot +1 713 276 5122 mpoirot@foley.com
Space Heidi Rasmussen +1 713 276 5239 hrasmussen@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardere Wynne Sewell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S Vogel +1 214 999 4422 +1 214 999 3422 pvogel@gardere.com
No Logo Cypress Data Defense, LLC, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian A. Murphy, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian A. Murphy +1 303 316 0813 +1 303 320 0827 brian@brianmurphy.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (442) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Exhibits
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Exhibits
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 7/22/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None USCA Letter to Court Reporter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript - Appeal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript - Appeal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript - Appeal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Appeal Transcript Request (DKT-13)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Appeal Transcript Request (DKT-13)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Appeal Transcript Request (DKT-13)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Appeal Transcript Request (DKT-13)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Appeal Transcript Request (DKT-13)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal (FORM,noticing) - Civil
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Other Notice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Approval
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Order on motion for relief from judgment
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Approval
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Surreply to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Relief from Judgment
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Costs
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Judgment - Final
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Response
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Objections
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Jury Verdict
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 3/27/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 3/27/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 3/27/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Jury Note
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Document
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Proposed Jury Charge
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Proposed Jury Charge
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None New Trial
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 11/8/2020, Entered: None Objections
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Jury Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - PTC, FPT, JS, or JT
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Document
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - PTC, FPT, JS, or JT
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 4/25/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - PTC, FPT, JS, or JT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Advisory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Transfer (noticing) - Civil
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Adopting Memorandum and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/11/2019, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/11/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 264 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Set Aside
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 263 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 262 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 259 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 258 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 257 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 256 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice of Setting (noticing) - Civil
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 254 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 249 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 248 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 243 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 242 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None Sealed Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 236 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 235 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 232 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 228 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 227 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 225 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 222 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 221 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 220 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 219 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED 218 MOTION( Motion Docket Date 9/4/2018.), Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Matthew Kent Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. (Golinkin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 218 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Matthew Kent Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2018. (Golinkin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Other EXHIBITS re: 216 Response to Motion,,, by David W. Kent, Jr., Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit 7)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/11/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 215 Opposed MOTION to Strike Improper "Rebuttal" Expert Report of Trent Livingston filed by David W. Kent, Jr., Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Appendix Index to Compendium of Unpublished Authorities Cited in Oilpro's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Rebuttal Expert Report of Trent Livingston, # 29 Proposed Order)(Munisteri, James) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION to Strike Improper "Rebuttal" Expert Report of Trent Livingston Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Golinkin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 213 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT re: MOTION HEARING held on 6/19/18 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JAMES G. MUNISTERI Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2018., filed. (thudson, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James G. Munisteri for Transcript of 06/19/2018. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Munisteri, James) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting Services 6-25-18. Estimated completion 7-2-18. Modified on 6/25/2018 (TraceyConrad, 4).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Minute Entry/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Motion Hearing held on 06.19.18 denying 205 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Compel Request for Production MOTION to Seal Oilpro's Emergency Motion to Compel; Order and Exhibits, granting 204 MOTION to Enforce Scheduling Order. Appearances: Walter Gaylord Lynch, Joseph Webster Golinkin, II, James G Munisteri, Heidi Rasmussen. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 2:04-2:35PM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of 205 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Compel Request for Production MOTION to Seal Oilpro's Emergency Motion to Compel; Order and Exhibits, filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 209 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 ~~SEALED Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition to 205 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Compel Request for Production MOTION to Seal Oilpro's Emergency Motion to Compel; Order and Exhibits, filed by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Golinkin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Notice of Setting (noticing) - CivilCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED NOTICE of Setting re: 204 MOTION to Enforce Scheduling Order, 205 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Compel Request for Production MOTION to Seal Oilpro's Emergency Motion to Compel; Order and Exhibits. Motion Hearing set for 06.19.18 @2PM before Judge Johnson. Parties notified., filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Notice of Setting (noticing) - CivilCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Setting re: 205 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Compel Request for Production MOTION to Seal Oilpro's Emergency Motion to Compel; Order and Exhibits. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Emergency
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION to Compel Request for Production, MOTION to Seal Oilpro's Emergency Motion to Compel; Order and Exhibits( Motion Docket Date 7/5/2018.)Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Enforce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Enforce Scheduling Order Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/5/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E)(Golinkin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 Order on Motion to AmendCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 202 Motion to Amend.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend 200 Notice (Other) Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER. Rebuttal Expert Witness to be identified by 06/01/18. Discovery due by 8/1/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/5/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/5/2018.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Agreed Amended Schedule by DHI Group, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed Scheduling Order)(Golinkin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 63 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by DHI Group, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C)(Golinkin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 197 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT re: Motions Hearing held on March 20, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Joseph W. Golinkin II Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018., filed. (mahenry, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 184 Motion to Compel.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 192 Supplement, filed by DHI Group, Inc.. (Golinkin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James G. Munisteri for Transcript of Pre-Trial Proceeding 03/20/2018 Nancy K. Johnson. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Munisteri, James) \Copy order electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 3/26/2018. Estimated transcript completion date: 4/2/2018. (LaurenWebster, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff/ Jeb Golinkin for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 03/23/18 before Judge Johnson). Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Golinkin, Joseph) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 3/26/2018. Estimated transcript completion date: 4/2/2018. (LaurenWebster, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to 184 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to produce responsive documents by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Motion Hearing held on 03.20.18 granting in part, denying in part 184 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to produce responsive documents. Appearances: Walter Gaylord Lynch, Amir Halevy, Joseph Webster Golinkin, II, James G Munisteri. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 11:02-11:52AM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support of 184 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to produce responsive documents, filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 189 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Request for Removal From ECF Notification and Service List by DHI Group, Inc., filed. (Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Setting re: 184 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to produce responsive documents. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 185 Motion to Substitute.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Plaintiffs' CounselMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2018. (Golinkin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to produce responsive documentsMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Supplement Index to Compendium, # 23 Proposed Order)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ADOPTING 175 Memorandum and Recommendations DENYING 133 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of and/or Stay Oilpro's Counterclaim. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to 178 Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations, filed by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc.. (Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 180 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on January 4, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Kevin T. Jacobs Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018., filed. (mahenry, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Counter-Defendants' Objections to Memorandum and Recommendation Regarding Motion to Compel Arbitration on Oilpro's Counterclaim, filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Supplement)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to 175 Memorandum and Recommendations, filed by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Compendium of Authorities)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James G. Munisteri for Transcript of Hearing on 1/4/18 before Judge Nancy Johnson. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Munisteri, James)Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers on 1/22/2018. Estimated completion date 1/29/2018. Modified on 1/22/2018 (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kevin T. Jacobs for Transcript of Hearing on 1/4/18 before Judge Johnson. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Jacobs, Kevin) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 1/10/2018. Estimated transcript completion date: 2/10/2018. (LaurenWebster, 4) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION re 133 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of and/or Stay Oilpro's Counterclaim Objections to M&R due by 1/23/2018(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Motion Hearing held granting in part 163 MOTION to Quash Oilpro's Non-Party Subpoenas, granting in part 167 Sealed Event. Appearances: Chad Hess, Brian A. Murphy, Justin Guy Lipe, James G Munisteri, Marla Thompson Poirot, Heidi Rasmussen. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 2:03-2:52PM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Motion to Quash Oilpro's Non-Party Subpoenas, filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second SUPPLEMENT to 167 Sealed Event, 163 MOTION to Quash Oilpro's Non-Party Subpoenas by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 163 MOTION to Quash Oilpro's Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Resetting as to 167 Sealed Event, 163 MOTION to Quash Oilpro's Non-Party Subpoenas. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 1/4/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Resetting as to 167 Sealed Event, 163 MOTION to Quash Oilpro's Non-Party Subpoenas. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Setting re: 167 Sealed Event, 163 MOTION to Quash Oilpro's Non-Party Subpoenas. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 164 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James G. Munisteri for Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Compel, 11-21-2017, Magistrate Nancy Johnson. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Munisteri, James) Electronically forwarded to JTT 12/6/2017. Estimated Transcript Completion Date: 12/12/2017.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on November 21, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Kevin T. Jacobs Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2018., filed. (mahenry, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash Oilpro's Non-Party SubpoenasMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Motion Hearing held granting in part 129 Sealed Event. Appearances: Kevin Thomas Jacobs, Justin Guy Lipe, James G Munisteri, Marla Thompson Poirot, Heidi Rasmussen. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 10:00-10:34AM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kevin T. Jacobs for Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Compel, 11/21/17, Judge Nancy Johnson. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Jacobs, Kevin) Electronically forwarded to JTT 11/29/2017. Estimated Transcript Completion Date: 12/5/2017.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Event, filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SURREPLY to 133 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of and/or Stay Oilpro's Counterclaim, filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 129 Sealed Event filed by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G, # 2 Compendium of Authorities, # 3 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel ArbitrationMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2017. (Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Setting re: 129 Sealed Event. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 11/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Setting re: 129 Sealed Event. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 133 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of and/or Stay Oilpro's Counterclaim filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Appendix, # 6 Proposed Order)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ADOPTING 102 Memorandum and Recommendation GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 64 MOTION to dismiss.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 151 Motion for partial Dismissal. All claims between plaintiffs and defendant Antonini, Dufrin and Robins are dismissed.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/9/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order proposed order)(Lipe, Justin) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Status Conference held. Appearances: Chris Harvey, Kevin Thomas Jacobs, Justin Guy Lipe, James G Munisteri, Marla Thompson Poirot. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 2:02-2:15PM. Discovery due by 4/30/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/4/2018. Rebuttal experts' reports due by 2/23/2018 Responses due by 10/30/2017.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 10/16/2017 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Lift StayMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by David W. Kent, Jr., Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: In conformity with Docket Entry No. 140 and the status conference of July 11, 2017, this action is REINSTATED on the court's docket and STAYED until Defendant Kent has been sentenced. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 145 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT re: Status Conference held on July 7, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Kevin T. Jacobs Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2017., filed. (mahenry, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James G. Munisteri for Transcript of Hearing on 7/7/17 before Magistrate Johnson. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Munisteri, James) Copy Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas 07/13/2017. Estimated Transcript Completion Date: 07/27/2017. Modified on 7/13/2017 (MonicaBalboa, 4).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Status Conference held. Appearances: Kevin Thomas Jacobs, Justin Guy Lipe, James G Munisteri, Marla Thompson Poirot, Edith Marie Jamison. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 10:00-10:15AM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kevin T. Jacobs for Transcript of Hearing on 7/7/17 before Magistrate Johnson. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Jacobs, Kevin) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas 7/7/17. Estimated Completion date: 7/21/17. Modified on 7/7/2017 (tconrad, 4).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 7/7/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 140 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Event, filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 6/26/2017. Deadline to reinstate: within 30 days from the date of this order (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Alternative Dispute Resolution Questionnaire provided to all parties of record, filed. (ccassadyadi, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Alternative Dispute Resolution Memorandum; case settled, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Fee Report)(Soussan, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Quash DepositionsMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Appendix - Compendium of Authorities, # 6 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Quash SubpoenaMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Cypress Data Defense, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/30/2017. (vcantu, 5) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Brian A Murphy to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Cypress Data Defense, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/30/2017. (vcantu, 5) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Arbitration of and/or Stay Oilpro's CounterclaimMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/30/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Compendium of Authorities)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN of Service Executed as to Amazon Web Services, Inc. on 5/18/2017 re: Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action, filed.(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE of Setting re: 122 Sealed Event, 127 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, 129 Sealed Event. Parties notified., filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 130 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED exhibits to 129 Sealed Amended Motion to Compel, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/15/2017 (rkonieczny, 4).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 129 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED amended Motion to Compel filed by Oilpro, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/15/2017 (rkonieczny, 4).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 126 Motion for Brian A. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash Subpoena.Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Cypress Data Defense, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2017. (jengonzalez, 7) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2017: # 1 Proposed Order) (jengonzalez, 7). (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Brian A. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Cypress Data Defense, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2017. (jengonzalez, 7) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Setting re: 122 Sealed Event. Parties notified., filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Exhibit F to 122 Sealed Motion to Compel, filed. Modified on 6/15/2017 (rkonieczny, 4).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi Rasmussen on behalf of David W. Kent, Jr., Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. (Rasmussen, Heidi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 122 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION to compel filed by Oilpro, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/15/2017 (rkonieczny, 4).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN of Service Executed as to Cypress Data Defense, LLC on 05/17/2017 re: Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action, filed.(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kevin T. Jacobs for Transcript of Hearing on 5/12/17. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Jacobs, Kevin) Copy electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 5/31/2017. Estimated Transcript Completion Date: 6/7/2017. (LinhthuDo, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Jeremy Antonini, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Sutarwalla, Murtaza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN of Service Executed as to Holland & Knight, LLP on May 16, 2017 re: Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action, filed.(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 116 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT re: Hearing onMotion to Compel held on May 12, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Sara Ann Brown Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017., filed. (mahenry, ) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Exhibit 2 (Oilpro's response to counter-defendants' objections to Memorandum and Recommendation regarding motion to dismiss Oilpro's counterclaim), filed. Modified on 6/15/2017 (rkonieczny, 4).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to DHI Group's Objections to M&R (Docket No. 107), filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - Excerpts of Deposition of Michael Durney)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sara Ann Brown for Transcript of Hearing on May 16, 2017 * * May 12, 2017 * * Judge Nancy K. Johnson. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (mahenry, ) Modified on 5/19/2017 (smurdock, 4). Electronically forwarded to JTT on 5/19/17. Estimated transcript completion date 5/26/17. Modified on 5/31/2017 (LinhthuDo, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Motion Hearing held granting in part, denying in part 104 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery. Appearances: Murtaza Sutarwalla Sutarwalla, Kevin Thomas Jacobs, Justin Guy Lipe, James G Munisteri, Marla Thompson Poirot. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 9:06-10:05AM.( Status Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Main Document 111 replaced on 5/19/2017) (sjones, 4). (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to 103 Memorandum and Recommendations, filed by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Compendium of Authorities)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel re: 104 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery, filed.(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to plaintiffs' motion to compel, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 6/15/2017 (rkonieczny, 4).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to 102 Memorandum and Recommendations, filed by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Compendium)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Resetting as to 104 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 5/12/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Setting re: 104 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Compel DiscoveryMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/18/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 01, # 2 Exhibit 02, # 3 Exhibit 03, # 4 Exhibit 04, # 5 Exhibit 05, # 6 Exhibit 06, # 7 Exhibit 07, # 8 Exhibit 08, # 9 Exhibit 09, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Compendium, # 12 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION re 77 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND IMPROPER VENUE Objections to M&R due by 5/11/2017(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION re 64 MOTION to Dismiss 63 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , 49 MOTION to Dismiss 34 Amended Answer, Counterclaim Objections to M&R due by 5/5/2017(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 100 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on March 9, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Sara Ann Brown Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2017., filed. (mahenry, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bryan Robins, filed.(Close, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ADOPTING 93 Memorandum and Recommendations, GRANTING IN PART, DENYIING IN PART 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Motion Hearing held granting in part, denying in part 90 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Deposition of Mike Durney. Appearances: Ryan Higgns, George Edwards, IIl, Murtaza Sutarwalla Sutarwalla, Omaima N. Poonawala, Justin Guy Lipe, James G Munisteri, Marla Thompson Poirot, Edith Marie Jamison. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 2:00-2:15PM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sara Ann Brown for Transcript of 03/09/17 Hearing on Protective Order. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (mahenry) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 3/10/2017. Estimated transcript completion date: 4/10/2017. (LaurenWebster)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/4/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 90 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Deposition of Mike Durney filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (unsealed))(Brown, Sara) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/4/2017, Entered: None Sealed Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 94 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION re 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Objections to M&R due by 3/17/2017(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Main Document 93 replaced on 3/3/2017) (sjones, 4).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: 2/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Resetting as to 90 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Deposition of Mike Durney. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 3/9/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Setting re: 90 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Deposition of Mike Durney. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2017 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash Deposition of Mike Durney( Motion Docket Date 3/10/2017.)Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Appendix - Compendium of Authorities, # 11 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 88 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Susan L. Bickley and Barry Abrams and the Law Firm of Blank Rome LLP to Withdraw as AttorneyMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by David W. Kent, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/24/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel)(Bickley, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/28/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to 77 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND IMPROPER VENUE, filed by Jeremy Antonini. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Sutarwalla, Murtaza) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 77 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND IMPROPER VENUE filed by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Appendix - Compendium of Authorities, # 8 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sara Ann Brown for Transcript of Judge Nancy K. Johnson, 12/21/2016. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (mmapps) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 1/12/2017. Estimated transcript completion date 2/12/2017 (LaurenWebster).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Marla T. Poirot on behalf of Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. (Poirot, Marla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Marla T. Poirot on behalf of David W. Kent, Jr., filed. (Poirot, Marla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of 64 MOTION to Dismiss 63 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Ann Brown on behalf of David W. Kent, Jr., filed. (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Munisteri on behalf of David W. Kent, Jr., filed. (Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Agreed Protective OrderMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/24/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lipe, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND IMPROPER VENUE Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Jeremy Antonini, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/20/2017. (Sutarwalla, Murtaza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 74 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 73 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Oilpro's Counterclaims and MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ( Replies due by 1/6/2017)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(kmurphy, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on December 21, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Kevin T. Jacobs Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/29/2017., filed. (mahenry, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Oilpro's CounterClaims, Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages( Motion Docket Date 1/19/2017.)Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lipe, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition to 64 MOTION to Dismiss 63 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Compendium of Authorities)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kevin T. Jacobs for Transcript of Telephonic hearing 12/21/16. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Jacobs, Kevin) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 12/22/2016. Estimated transcript completion date 12/29/2016 (LaurenWebster).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Motion Hearing held granting in part 67 MOTION to Quash Depositions. Appearances: (BY PHONE) Chris Harvey, George Edwards, IIl, Kevin Thomas Jacobs, Robert P Wynne, Susan L Bickley, Edith Marie Jamison, James G Munisteri. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 10:04-10:29AM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition to 67 MOTION to Quash Depositions, filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 6)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Setting re: 67 MOTION to Quash Depositions. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash DepositionsMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Appendix - Compendium of Authorities Cited in Plaintiffs' Motion for Protection and to Quash Depositions, # 6 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by George Edwards III, counsel for Jeremy Antonini, filed. (Edwards, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER re: 64 MOTION to Dismiss 63 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed.(Lipe, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss 63 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Appendix)(Lipe, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against DHI Group, Inc. filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of David Kent, # 2 Exhibit B - Copyright Registration, # 3 Exhibit C)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: 10/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of 49 MOTION to Dismiss 34 Amended Answer, Counterclaim , filed by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix - Part 1, # 2 Appendix - Part 2)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 60 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages( Replies due by 10/11/2016).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages( Motion Docket Date 10/26/2016.)Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lipe, Justin) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition to 49 MOTION to Dismiss 34 Amended Answer, Counterclaim , filed by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - Declaration of David W. Kent, Jr., # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unpublished Authorities Cited in Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Brown, Sara) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Matthew Kent, filed.(Wynne, Robert) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 9/30/2016..(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Counter-Defendants' Motion to DismissMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Munisteri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Bryan Robins. (Close, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time Replies due by 9/16/2016.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lipe on behalf of DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. (Lipe, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Ng on behalf of DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. (Ng, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply for Rule 12(B)(6) MotionMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Bryan Robins, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Close, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss 34 Amended Answer, Counterclaim Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Appendix - Compendium of Authorities - Part 1, # 7 Appendix - Compendium of Authorities - Part 2, # 8 Appendix - Compendium of Authorities - Part 3)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Appendix - Compendium of Authorities - Part 1, # 6 Appendix Compendium of Authorities - Part 2)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: 9/1/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 10 days. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2016 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 5/22/2017. Pltf Expert Report due by 5/22/2017. Deft Expert Witness List due by 6/21/2017. Deft Expert Report due by 6/21/2017. Discovery due by 8/4/2017. Mediation due by 9/8/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/22/2017. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Matthew Kent, filed.(Wynne, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bryan Robins, filed.(Close, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Nelson on behalf of Bryan Robins, filed. (Nelson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by E. Marie Jamison on behalf of Bryan Robins, filed. (Jamison, Edith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 9/2/2016.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 9/2/2016..(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Bryan Robins' 12(b)(6) Motion to DismissMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Defendant and Counter-Plaintiff Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc. d/b/a Oilpro and Oilpro.com's Counterclaims for Injunctive ReliefMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: 8/23/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Regarding Proceeding Before Magistrate Judge by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed. (Lipe, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Regarding Proceeding Before Magistrate Judge by Jeremy Antonini, filed. (Poonawala, Omaima)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by R. Chris Harvey on behalf of Estevan Dufrin, filed. (Harvey, Ralph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. (Brown, Sara) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Bryan Robins, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/26/2016. (Close, Howard) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Estevan Dufrin, filed.(Tomko, Edwin) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Matthew Kent, filed.(Wynne, Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Estevan Dufrin, filed.(Tomko, Edwin) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Jeremy Antonini, filed. (Sutarwalla, Murtaza) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. (Brown, Sara) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed.(Brown, Sara) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 8/5/2016.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time Answer and Pre-Answer Filing DeadlineMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Bryan Robins, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Close, Howard) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jeremy Antonini, filed.(Sutarwalla, Murtaza) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Murtaza Sutarwalla on behalf of Jeremy Antonini, filed. (Sutarwalla, Murtaza) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DESIGNATION of George Edwards as attorney in charge of Jeremy Antonini, filed.(Sutarwalla, Murtaza) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Regarding Proceeding Before Magistrate Judge by David W. Kent, Jr., filed. (Bickley, Susan) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by David W. Kent, Jr., filed.(Bickley, Susan) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Vogel on behalf of Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed. (Vogel, Peter) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DESIGNATION of James G. Munisteri as attorney in charge of Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed.(Munisteri, James) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint by David W. Kent, Jr., filed.(Bickley, Susan) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc., filed.(Brown, Sara) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 7/22/2016.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer and Pre-Answer Filing DeadlineMotions referred to Nancy K Johnson. by Bryan Robins, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Close, Howard) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Jeremy Antonini, filed.(Edwards, George) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Single Integrated Operations Portal, Inc. served on 6/17/2016, answer due 7/8/2016, filed.(Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Estevan Dufrin served on 6/18/2016, answer due 7/11/2016, filed.(Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Jeremy Antonini served on 6/16/2016, answer due 7/7/2016, filed.(Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Matthew Kent served on 6/16/2016, answer due 7/7/2016, filed.(Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Bryan Robins served on 6/17/2016, answer due 7/8/2016, filed.(Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to David W. Kent, Jr. served on 6/17/2016, answer due 7/8/2016, filed.(Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by DHI Group, Inc., Rigzone.com, Inc., filed.(Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson, filed. (sjones, 4) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson for full pretrial management.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 8/31/2016(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons)(Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-16784679) filed by Rigzone.com, Inc., DHI Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 1,201 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?