USA v. Melamed et al
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cr-01409
District Judge Marilyn L. Huff, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 4, 2017 at 11:18 PM DT (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hootan Melamed, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Steven M Goldsobel Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine A. Bowles +1 310 552 4848 +1 310 695 3860 kate@sgoldsobel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M Goldsobel +1 310 552 4848 steve@sgoldsobel.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (148) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release (ECF No. 160 ) as to Jean Francois Picard (2). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/30/2017.(mxn) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Bond Modification Hearing as to Jean Francois Picard held on 10/30/2017. The Court grants the 160 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Jean Francois Picard. Written order to be filed. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Valerie Chu, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Bridget Kennedy, FD). (Pretrial Services Officer William Perales). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Jean Francois Picard (2)(bond). A Bond Hearing is set for 10/30/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. The Court orders the Defendant to appear at the hearing. Pretrial Services is requested to appear at the hearing as well. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Jean Francois Picard. (Kennedy, Bridget) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Jean Francois Picard (2). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/23/2017.(ag) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Minute ORDER: Defendant Jean Francois Picard (2) has filed a motion to modify his bond conditions to allow travel to Montreal, Canada from October 24, 2017 through October 27, 2017. (Doc. No. 155 .) The Court notes that the Defendant has been authorized to travel to Canada on two prior occasions (Doc. Nos. 64 and 71 ) and no reports of pretrial release violations have been reported to the Court. Accordingly, the Court's tentative is to grant the Defendant's motion. However, the Government may file its opposition to the Defendant's motion no later than October 23, 2017 by 9:00 a.m. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/20/2017. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Jean Francois Picard. (Kennedy, Bridget) (ag). (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Jonathan Pena (5)(bond). At the request of defense counsel, with representation that government counsel has no objection, the date of 10/23/2017 09:00 AM is vacated and Sentence With PSR is reset for 2/26/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. The Defendant has filed an acknowledgment of next court date and is ordered to appear before the Court for sentencing on 2/26/2018 at 09:00 AM, absent further order of the Court. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Jonathan Pena to appear on 2/26/18. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(VonHelms, Gretchen) (ag). (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Status Hearing re Counsel as to Jean Francois Picard held on 9/11/2017. The Court grants the Defendant's 149 Motion to Submit Declaration in Lieu of CJA Form 23 as to Jean Francois Picard (2). The Court orders the Defendant's financial declaration be filed under seal, absent further order of the Court. The Court confirms the appointment of Federal Defenders for Defendant Jean Francois Picard, subject to reimbursement if deemed appropriate by the Court at the conclusion of this case. (ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Valerie Chu, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Bridget Kennedy, FD). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bridget Kennedy appearing for Jean Francois Picard Co-Counsel (Kennedy, Bridget)Attorney Bridget Kennedy added to party Jean Francois Picard(pty:dft) (ag). (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Submit Declaration in Lieu of CJA Form 23 by Jean Francois Picard. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Barros, Elizabeth) (ag). (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER Modifying Release Conditions (ECF No. 129 ) as to Hootan Melamed (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/31/2017.(mxn) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            P/S Bond Filed as to Hootan Melamed in amount of $100,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. (mxn) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elizabeth M. Barros appearing for Jean Francois Picard (Barros, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth M. Barros added to party Jean Francois Picard(pty:dft) (ag). (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s) : Motion hearing re modification of bond set for 8/31/17 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is vacated. (no document attached) (tml) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Status Hearing re Counsel as to Jean Francois Picard (2) held on 8/30/2017. Federal Defenders appearing at the request of the Court. Retained Attorney Gerald Werksman appearing by telephone. Attorney Mark Werksman specially appearing by telephone with Attorney Gerald Werksman. The Court grants retained counsel Gerald Werksman's request to withdraw as counsel of record. Attorney Gerald Werksman is relieved as counsel in this case. The Court provisionally appoints Federal Defenders to represent Defendant Jean Francois Picard under the reimbursement provision of the Guide to Judiciary Policy, Vol 7A, Ch. 2, Section 230.40(c). The Court authorizes the Clerk to release sealed filings applicable to Defendant Picard, to Federal Defenders. A Status Hearing re Counsel is set for 9/11/2017 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff as to Defendant Picard only. If the Defendant qualifies for appointed counsel or if the Defendant retains his own counsel, the Defendant need not appear at the 9/11/2017 hearing. However, if the Defendant does not qualify for appointed counsel and has not retained new counsel, the Defendant is ordered to appear on 9/11/2017 before the Court. Pending motions are on file that requires a hearing and new counsel has been provisionally appointed. Accordingly, the Court continues the pending motions and finds valid excludable time under the Speedy Trial Act. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Valerie Chu, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Gerald Werksman, RET (by telephone); Mark Werksman, S/A (appearing by telephone); Elizabeth Barros, FD; Bridget Kennedy, FD). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Hootan Melamed. At the request of defense counsel and with the permission of the court the Motion Hearing re modification of bond is reset for 8/31/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. (no document attached) (tml) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Jean Francois Picard (2)(bond). A Status Hearing re Counsel is set for 8/30/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. The Defendant is ordered to appear before the Court on 8/30/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15A. The Court request an attorney from Federal Defenders to appear at the status hearing. (cc: John Ellis, Supervisory Trial Attorney, Federal Defenders). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Continue Motion Hearing/Trial Setting and Granting Joint Motion to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Hootan Melamed (1), Jean Francois Picard (2), John Pangelinan (3), and Phong Hung Tran (4). (Doc. No. 132 .) The motion hearing/trial setting date of August 28, 2017 is vacated and continued to November 20, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15A. Each defendant has filed an acknowledgment of next court date and each defendant is ordered to appear before the Court on November 20, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15A, absent further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/25/2017. (smy) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant John Pangelinan to appear on November 20, 2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hall, Patrick) (ag). (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Hootan Melamed to appear on November 20, 2017. (Goldsobel, Steven) (ag). (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Jean Francois Picard to appear on November 20, 2017 at 2:00 p.m.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Werksman, Mark) (ag). (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Phong Hung Tran to appear on 11/20/17. (Warwick, Thomas) (ag). (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING on behalf of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal as to Defendant Hootan Melamed. Motion Hearing to modify conditions of release is set for 8/29/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Counsel has been advised to provide the necessary signatures and an amended bond package to the Court. If the documents are received prior to 8-29-17 the hearing may be vacated.(no document attached) (tml) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue by Phong Hung Tran as to Hootan Melamed, Jean Francois Picard, John Pangelinan, Phong Hung Tran. (Warwick, Thomas) (jpp). (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Joint MOTION to Continue by Phong Hung Tran as to Hootan Melamed, Jean Francois Picard, John Pangelinan, Phong Hung Tran. (Warwick, Thomas) (jpp). (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Minute ORDER: The Court refers the joint motion to modify conditions of release for Defendant Hootan Melamed to the Magistrate Judge. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/14/2017. (Motion referred to Magsitrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Joint MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by USA as to Hootan Melamed. (Chu, Valerie) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER ACCEPTING GUILTY PLEA as to count(s) 1 of the Indictment, as to Jonathan Pena, adopting 122 Findings and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/28/2017. (acc) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              PLEA AGREEMENT as to Jonathan Pena (fth) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                CONSENT TO RULE 11 PLEA before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal by Jonathan Pena. (fth) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge upon a Tendered Plea of Guilty as to Jonathan Pena : Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/13/2017. (fth) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Defendant Jonathan Pena present on bond.Change of Plea Hearing as to Jonathan Pena held on 7/13/2017. Plea Tendered by Jonathan Pena. Guilty on count One (1) of the Indictment. Excludable(s) started as to Jonathan Pena : (XT) Interest of Justice (7/13/17 to 10/23/17). PSR Ordered.( Sentence With PSR set for 10/23/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff.) Pending motion - withdrawn. Motion hearing/trial setting date - vacated as to this deft only. (CD# 7/13/2017 BGS1:229-247). (Plaintiff Attorney AUSA, Jennifer Gmitro s/a for Valerie Chu, n/a). (Defendant Attorney Jan Ronis, s/a for Gretchen VonHelms, Ret, n/a). (no document attached) (tml) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Jonathan Pena. As requested by AUSA Valerie Chu a Change of Plea Hearing is set for 7/13/2017 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. (no document attached) (tml) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER Modifying Conditions of Pre-Trial Release as to Jean Francois Picard (2). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/28/2017.(ag) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Joint MOTION to Allow Jean Francois Picard to Travel to Northern California by Jean Francois Picard (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Proposed Order)(Werksman, Gerald) Modified on 6/27/2017 to create motion and correct docket text (ag). (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Continue Motion Hearing/Trial Setting and Granting Joint Motion to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Hootan Melamed (1), Jean Francois Picard (2), John Pangelinan (3), Phong Hung Tran (4), and Jonathan Pena (5). The motion hearing/trial setting date of May 22, 2017 is vacated and continued to August 28, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15A. Each defendant has filed an acknowledgment of next court date and each defendant is ordered to appear before the Court on August 28, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15A, absent further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/19/2017. (smy) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Phong Hung Tran to appear on 08/28/17. (Warwick, Thomas)(smy). (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Jean Francois Picard (2) to appear on August 28, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. (smy) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant John Pangelinan to appear on August 28, 2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hall, Patrick) (ag). (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Jonathan Pena to appear on 8/28/17. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(VonHelms, Gretchen) (ag). (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Hootan Melamed to appear on 8/28/2017. (Goldsobel, Steven) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing, Joint MOTION to Exclude Time by USA as to Hootan Melamed, Jean Francois Picard, John Pangelinan, Phong Hung Tran, Jonathan Pena. (Chu, Valerie) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER re 104 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Jonathan Pena (5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/1/2017.(ag) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SURETIES and Defendant by Jonathan Pena re 104 Joint MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(VonHelms, Gretchen) (ag). (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Jonathan Pena. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(VonHelms, Gretchen) (ag). (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Jonathan Pena. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(VonHelms, Gretchen) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Vacated Hearing: Defendant Jean Francois Picard (2) has filed an acknowledgment of next court date to appear on May 22, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. (Doc. No. 101 .) Accordingly, the Status Hearing re Acknowledgment set for 2/13/2017 at 02:00 p.m. is vacated. The Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 5/22/2017 at 02:00 p.m. is confirmed. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Jean Francois Picard (2) to appear on May 22, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. (smy) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Motion Hearing/Trial Setting as to Jean Francois Picard (2)(n/a) not held on 2/6/2017. Defense counsel not appearing due to illness. Defendant not appearing due to unavailability of defense counsel. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting is continued to 5/22/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. The Court orders the Defendant to file an acknowledgment of next court date (for the 5/22/2017 hearing) by 2/13/2017. A Status Hearing re Acknowledgment is set for 2/13/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. The Court will vacates the 2/13/2017 status hearing upon the filing of the acknowledgment of next court date. Defendant Jean Francois Picard is ordered to appear before the Court on 5/22/2017 at 02:00, absent further order of the Court. Pending pretrial motions are on file that requires a hearing. Accordingly, the Court finds valid excludable time under the Speedy Trial Act. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Valerie Chu, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER Authorizing Travel for Defendant Hootan Melamed During Pretrial Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/27/2017. (cc: US Pretrial Services)(ag) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 98 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MOTION to Travel by Hootan Melamed. (Goldsobel, Steven) (ag). (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Motion Hearing/Trial Setting as to Jean Francois Picard (2)(n/a) not held on 1/23/2017. Defense counsel unavailable due to illness. Defendant not appearing due to unavailability of defense counsel. The Court continues the Motion Hearing/Trial Setting to 2/6/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. The Defendant is ordered to appear on 2/6/2017 and shall file an acknowledgment of next court date prior to 2/6/2017. Pending pretrial motions are on file that requires a hearing. Accordingly, the Court finds valid excludable time under the Speedy Trial Act. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Valerie Chu, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Minute ORDER: Good cause appearing, the Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion to continue the Motion Hearing/Trial Setting date as to Defendants Hootan Melamed (1), John Pangelinan (3), Phong Hung Tran (4), and Jonathan Pena (5) only and GRANTS the parties' joint motion to exclude time under the Speedy Trial Act. (Doc. No. 91 .) Accordingly, the Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 1/23/2017 02:00 PM is vacated and is continued to 5/22/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Defendants Hootan Melamed (1), John Pangelinan (3), Phong Hung Tran (4), and Jonathan Pena (5) have each filed an acknowledgment of next court date. The Court orders these defendants to appear before the Court on 5/22/2017 at 02:00 PM, absent further order of the Court. Pending pretrial motions are on file that requires a hearing before the Court and a continuance is necessary to serve the interest of justice as stated in the joint motion. Accordingly, the Court finds valid excludable time under the Speedy Trial Act. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/20/2017. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Jonathan Pena to appear on May 22, 2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(VonHelms, Gretchen) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant John Pangelinan to appear on May 22, 2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hall, Patrick) (ag). (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Hootan Melamed to appear on 5/22/2017. (Goldsobel, Steven) (ag). (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Jonathan Pena to appear on 5/2/17. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(VonHelms, Gretchen) (ag). (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing by USA as to Hootan Melamed, John Pangelinan, Phong Hung Tran, Jonathan Pena. (Chu, Valerie) Modified on 1/19/2017 to delete reference to defendant Jean Francois Picard. This joint motion does not apply to defendant Picard (smy) (ag). (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Phong Hung Tran to appear on 05222017. (Warwick, Thomas) (ag). (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jean Francois Picard re 82 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment (Chu, Valerie) (ag). (Entered: 01/16/2017)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 85 Motion to Withdraw as Co-Counsel. Richard A Moss withdrawn from case as to Hootan Melamed (1). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/22/2016.(fth) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Richard A. Moss. by Hootan Melamed. (Moss, Richard) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Fred A. Sheppard appearing for USA. (Sheppard, Fred)Attorney Fred A. Sheppard added to party USA(pty:pla) (fth). (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER Authorizing Travel and Modifying Bond for Defendant Hootan Melamed During Pretrial Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/19/2016. (cc: US Pretrial Services)(ag) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Indictment by Jean Francois Picard. (Werksman, Gerald) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Travel by Hootan Melamed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldsobel, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Jean Francois Picard (2). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/27/2016.(ag) (jao). (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Jean Francois Picard. (Werksman, Gerald) (ag). (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute ORDER: Good cause appearing, the Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion to continue the Motion Hearing/Trial Setting date and GRANTS the parties' joint motion to exclude time under the Speedy Trial Act. (Doc. No. 72 .) Accordingly, the Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 10/24/2016 02:00 PM is vacated and is continued to 1/23/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Defendants Hootan Melamed (1), Jean Francois Picard (2), John Pangelinan (3), Phong Hung Tran (4), Jonathan Pena (5) have each filed an acknowledgment of next court date. The Court orders all defendants to appear before the Court on 1/23/2017 at 02:00 PM, absent further order of the Court. Pending pretrial motions are on file that requires a hearing before the Court and a continuance is necessary to serve the interest of justice as stated in the joint motion. Accordingly, the Court finds valid excludable time under the Speedy Trial Act. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/20/2016. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Jonathan Pena to appear on 1/23/17. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(VonHelms, Gretchen) (ag). (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Phong Hung Tran to appear on January 23, 2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Warwick, Thomas) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Jean Francois Picard to appear on January 23, 2017. (Werksman, Gerald) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant John Pangelinan to appear on 01/23/17. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hall, Patrick) (ag). (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Hootan Melamed to appear on January 23, 2017. (Goldsobel, Steven) (ag). (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing, Joint MOTION to Exclude Time by USA as to Hootan Melamed, Jean Francois Picard, John Pangelinan, Phong Hung Tran, Jonathan Pena. (Chu, Valerie) (ag). (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 70 Motion to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Jean Francois Picard (2). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants pretrial release conditions are modified to permit the Defendant to travel to Phoenix, Arizona on 10/18/2016 and to Saint-Rmi, Quebec, Canada from 10/21/2016 to 10/24/2016. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/14/2016.(acc) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Jean Francois Picard. (Werksman, Gerald) (acc). (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 68 Unopposed Motion Authorizing Travel and Modifying Bond for Defendant Hootan Melamed During Pretrial Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/19/2016. (cc: USPS)(ag) (jao). (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release , MOTION to Travel by Hootan Melamed. (Goldsobel, Steven) (ag). (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard A Moss appearing for Hootan Melamed (Moss, Richard)Attorney Richard A Moss added to party Hootan Melamed(pty:dft) (ag). (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 65 Unopposed Motion Authorizing Travel for Defendant Hootan Melamed During Pretrial Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/26/2016. (cc: USPS)(ag) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Travel by Hootan Melamed. (Goldsobel, Steven) (knb). (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Jean Francois Picard. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/25/2016. (cc: US Pretrial Services)(ag) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Bond by Jean Francois Picard. (Attachments: # 1 order)(Werksman, Gerald) Emailed attorney to email proposed order to chambers (ag). (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Bond Document: by Phong Hung Tran (ag) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            P/S Bond Filed as to Jean Francois Picard in amount of $ 20,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/8/2016. (Document applicable to USA, Jean Francois Picard.) (ag) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s) : Staus hearing re bond documents set for 8/9/16 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is - vacated. The Court has received the bond documents. (no document attached) (tml) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Jean Francois Picard. On Court's own motion a Status Hearing re bond documents is set for 8/9/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. (no document attached) (tml) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 57 Unopposed Motion Authorizing Travel for Defendant Hootan Melamed During Pretrial Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/4/2016.(ag) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Travel by Hootan Melamed. (Goldsobel, Steven) (ag). (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Travel by Hootan Melamed. (Goldsobel, Steven) Modified on 8/4/2016 to term motion; motion was re-filed (ag). (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute ORDER: Good cause appearing, the Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion to continue the Motion Hearing/Trial Setting date and GRANTS the parties' joint motion to exclude time under the Speedy Trial Act. (Doc. No. 45 .) Accordingly, the Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 7/25/2016 02:00 PM is vacated and is continued to 10/24/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Defendants Hootan Melamed (1), Jean Francois Picard (2), John Pangelinan (3), Phong Hung Tran (4), Jonathan Pena (5) have each filed an acknowledgment of next court date. The Court orders all defendants to appear before the Court on 10/24/2016 at 02:00 PM, absent further order of the Court. Pending pretrial motions are on file that requires a hearing before the Court and a continuance is necessary to serve the interest of justice. Accordingly, the Court finds valid excludable time under the Speedy Trial Act. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Jean Francois Picard to appear on October 24, 2016. (Werksman, Gerald) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Jonathan Pena to appear on 10/24/16. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(VonHelms, Gretchen) (ag). (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant John Pangelinan to appear on 10/24/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hall, Patrick) (ag). (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Phong Hung Tran to appear on 10/24/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Warwick, Thomas) (ag). (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acknowledgement of Next Court Appearance of Defendant Hootan Melamed by Hootan Melamed (Bowles, Katherine) (ag). (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER to Modify Conditions of Release as to Jean Francois Picard (2). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/20/2016.(ag) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Discovery by Jonathan Pena. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(VonHelms, Gretchen) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Katherine A. Bowles appearing for Hootan Melamed (Bowles, Katherine)Attorney Katherine A. Bowles added to party Hootan Melamed(pty:dft) (ag). (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Discovery by Jean Francois Picard. (Werksman, Gerald) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing, Joint MOTION to Exclude Time under Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Hootan Melamed, Jean Francois Picard, John Pangelinan, Phong Hung Tran, Jonathan Pena. (Chu, Valerie)(ag). (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Discovery by John Pangelinan. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proof of Service)(Hall, Patrick) (ag). (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute ORDER: Good cause appearing, the Court grants Defendant Hootan Melamed's (1) motion to shorten time to file (Doc. No. 41 ) his motion to compel discovery (Doc. No. 42 .) SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/19/2016. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Discovery by Hootan Melamed. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Goldsobel, Steven) (ag). (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Shorten Time by Hootan Melamed. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Goldsobel, Steven) (ag). (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Protective Order by Phong Hung Tran re 39 Order on Motion for Protective Order (Warwick, Thomas) (ag). (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Hootan Melamed (1), Jean Francois Picard (2), John Pangelinan (3), Phong Hung Tran (4), Jonathan Pena (5). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/15/2016.(ag) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute ORDER: The District Court hereby refers the parties' Joint Motion to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release for Defendant Jean Francois Picard to the Magistrate Judge. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/18/2016. (Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by USA as to Jean Francois Picard. (Chu, Valerie) (ag). (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appearance Bond Filed as to Phong Hung Tran in amount of $ 25,000 P/S, Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/12/2016. (Document applicable to USA, Phong Hung Tran.) (knb) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute ORDER: Good cause appearing, the Court grants Defendant Phong Hung Tran's (4) motion to shorten time to file (Doc. No. 34 ) his motion to compel discovery and motion for leave to file further motions (Doc. No. 33 .) SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/13/2016. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order to Shorten Time by Phong Hung Tran. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Warwick, Thomas) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Discovery , MOTION for Leave to File Further Motions by Phong Hung Tran. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Warwick, Thomas) (knb). (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 06/29/2016, in case as to Phong Hung Tran (ag) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/28/2016, in case as to Jean Francois Picard (ag) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      P/S Bond Filed as to John Pangelinan in amount of $ 50,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/7/2016. (Document applicable to USA, John Pangelinan.) (ag) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        P/S Bond Filed as to Hootan Melamed in amount of $ 25,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/7/2016. (Document applicable to USA, Hootan Melamed.) (ag) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Hootan Melamed, Jean Francois Picard, John Pangelinan, Phong Hung Tran, Jonathan Pena. (Chu, Valerie) Modified on 7/11/2016 to replace PDF with document containing the missing signature pages (smy). (ag). (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Jean Francois Picard. On Court's own motion a Status Hearing re counsel and bond paperwork is set for 7/7/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1B before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. (no document attached) (tml) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Valerie Chu appearing for USA. (Chu, Valerie)Attorney Valerie Chu added to party USA(pty:pla) (ag). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Phong Hung Tran. Defendant released on $25,000 P/S bond posted. Defendant appeared in court Fingerprint and Release. (yeb) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Phong Hung Tran (4) $25,000 P/S, secured by 1 FRA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 06/29/2016. (yeb) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    P/S Bond Filed as to Jonathan Pena in amount of $ 20,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 06/30/2016. (Document applicable to USA, Jonathan Pena.) (ag) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Phong Hung Tran (no document attached) (yeb) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Arraignment/Initial Appearance as to Phong Hung Tran (4) Count 1,7-8,12 of the Indictment held on 6/29/2016. Defendant Phong Hung Tran (4) out of custody and present in court. Not Guilty plea entered. Attorney Thomas J Warwick, JR is retained as counsel as Phong Hung Tran (4). Bond set as to Phong Hung Tran (4) $25,000 P/S, secured by 1 FRA. Bond packet to be submitted by 7/12/2016. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 7/25/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (CD# 6/29/2016 BGS 16:2:13-2:27). (Plaintiff Attorney Valerie Chu, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Tom Warwick, RET). (no document attached) (yeb) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Jonathan Pena. (tkl) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Jean Francois Picard. (tkl) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Hootan Melamed. (tkl) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Jean Francois Picard (2) $20,000 P/S.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/28/16. (tkl) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for John Pangelinan (3) $50,000 P/S.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/28/16. (tkl) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Jonathan Pena (5) $20,000 P/S.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/28/16. (tkl) Modified text and regenerated NEF on 6/29/2016 (tkl). (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Hootan Melamed (1) $25,000 P/S.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/28/16. (tkl) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Hootan Melamed, Jean Francois Picard, John Pangelinan, Jonathan Pena (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Arraignment on Indictment and Initial Appearance as to Hootan Melamed (1) Count 1,2-6,9-11,13-14, Jean Francois Picard (2) Count 1,2-6,13-14, John Pangelinan (3) Count 1,7-8,12 and Jonathan Pena (5) Count 1 held on 6/28/2016. Not Guilty pleas entered. Attorney Steven M Goldsobel retained as counsel for Hootan Melamed. Attorney Gerald M Werksman retained as counsel for Jean Francois Picard. Attorney Patrick Q. Hall retained as counsel for John Pangelinan. Attorney Gretchen C. VonHelms retained as counsel for Jonathan Pena. Bond set as to Hootan Melamed (1) $25,000 P/S secured by 1 FRA, Bond packet to be filed by 7/05/16. Bond set as to Jean Francois Picard (2) $20,000 P/S, Bond pakcet to be filed by 7/07/16. Bond set as to John Pangelinan (3) $50,000 P/S as set in Central District secured by 1 FRA, Bond packet to be filed by 6/30/16. Bond set as to Jonathan Pena (5) $20,000 P/S secured by 1 FRA. Bond packet to be filed by 6/30/16. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 7/25/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Print release as to Defendants 1,2,5. (CD# 6/28/2016 BGS 16:2:01-2:32). (Plaintiff Attorney Valerie Chu, AUSA; Andrew Leal, AUSA). (Defendant 1 Attorney Steven M Goldsobel, RET; Defendant 2 Attorney Gerald M Werksman, RET; Defendant 3 Attorney Patrick Q. Hall, RET; Defendant 5 Attorney Gretchen C. VonHelms, RET). (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Phong Hung Tran : Per instructions from the court, Arraignment on Indictment is reset for 6/29/2016 before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. (no document attached) (yeb) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Hootan Melamed, Jean Francois Picard, Phong Hung Tran and Jonathan Pena: Arraignment on Indictment set for 6/28/2016 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. (no document attached) (lao) Modified text on 6/24/2016 to correct date (lao). (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Unseal Indictment by USA; Order Thereon as to Hootan Melamed, Jean Francois Picard, John Pangelinan, Phong Hung Tran, Jonathan Pena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 6/21/2016. (jah) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/17/2016, in case as to John Pangelinan, re 4 Warrant Issued. (no document attached) (jah) Modified on 6/23/2016 (tb-v). (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to John Pangelinan: Arraignment on Indictment set for 6/28/2016 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Criminal Summons Issued in case as to Jonathan Pena to appear before criminal duty judge for Initial Appearance set for 6/28/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1B. (jah) Modified on 6/20/2016 (tb-v). (jah). Modified on 6/22/2016 - Case ordered unsealed. Pdf added (jah). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks in case as to Phong Hung Tran. (no document attached) (jah) Modified on 6/20/2016 (tb-v). (jah). Modified on 6/22/2016 - Case ordered unsealed. Pdf added (jah). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks in case as to John Pangelinan. (jah) Modified on 6/20/2016 (tb-v). Modified on 6/22/2016 - Case ordered unsealed. Pdf added (jah). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks in case as to Jean Francois Picard. (jah) Modified on 6/20/2016 (tb-v). Modified on 6/22/2016 - Case ordered unsealed. Pdf added (jah). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks in case as to Hootan Melamed. (jah) Modified on 6/20/2016 (tb-v). Modified on 6/22/2016 - Case ordered unsealed. Pdf added (jah). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INDICTMENT as to Hootan Melamed (1) count(s) 1, 2-6, 9-11, 13-14, Jean Francois Picard (2) count(s) 1, 2-6, 13-14, John Pangelinan (3) count(s) 1, 7-8, 12, Phong Hung Tran (4) count(s) 1, 7-8, 12, Jonathan Pena (5) count(s) 1. (cc: cc: Pretrial) (jah) (sjt). Modified on 6/20/2016 (tb-v). Modified on 6/22/2016 - Ordered unsealed. Pdf added (jah). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 18,369 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?