SHAPIRO v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-01263
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags
Last Updated May 4, 2021 at 3:32 PM DT (3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jeffrey Light

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Louis Light +1 202 277 6213 +1 202 223 5316 jeff@patientsnotpatents.org
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marian L. Borum +1 703 562 2438 mborum@fdic.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marsha Wellknown Yee +1 202 252 2539 +1 202 252 2599 marsha.yee@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Proposed Briefing Schedule
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/05/16. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Borum, Marian) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/27/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/27/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/27/2016. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: 7/11/2016 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Marian L. Borum on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Borum, Marian)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4576601) filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Department of Justice, # 4 Summons US Attorney's Office)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 254 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?