Lisa Douglass v. USAA Casualty Insurance, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-02601
District Judge Manuel L. Real, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 5:43 PM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Lisa Douglass, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lisa Douglass

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Douglass +1 323 346 5175
v.
No Logo Bank of America Corporation, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raffi Kassabian +1 213 457 8118 +1 213 457 8080 rkassabian@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raagini Shah +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 rshah@reedsmith.com
No Logo Bank Of America, Inc., Defendant
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Oneida Ltd.
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raffi Kassabian +1 213 457 8118 +1 213 457 8080 rkassabian@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raagini Shah +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 rshah@reedsmith.com
No Logo Does, Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC Equifax Information Services LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nokes and Quinn APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Quinn, Jr. +1 949 376 3500 +1 949 376 3070 tquinn@nokesquinn.com
Equifax, Inc. Equifax, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Meridian Corp
Officer/Director, Aar Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Nokes and Quinn APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Quinn, Jr. +1 949 376 3500 +1 949 376 3070 tquinn@nokesquinn.com
TransUnion LLC TransUnion LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Musick Peeler & Garrett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald E. Bradley +1 714 668 2447 +1 714 668 2490 d.bradley@mpglaw.com
TransUnion Corporation TransUnion Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Transunion, Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Musick Peeler & Garrett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald E. Bradley +1 714 668 2447 +1 714 668 2490 d.bradley@mpglaw.com
No Logo USAA Casualty Insurance, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniels, Fine, Israel, Schonbuch & Lebovits, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maureen M Michail +1 310 556 7900 +1 310 556 2807 michail@dfis-law.com
No Logo USAA Federal Savings Bank, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniels, Fine, Israel, Schonbuch & Lebovits, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maureen M Michail +1 310 556 7900 +1 310 556 2807 michail@dfis-law.com
No Logo USAA Savings Bank, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniels, Fine, Israel, Schonbuch & Lebovits, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maureen M Michail +1 310 556 7900 +1 310 556 2807 michail@dfis-law.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1681
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Disqualify Judge
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/3/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/3/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Objection
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Vacate
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Set Aside Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Continue
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    SCHEDULING NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 15 set for hearing on June 20, 2016 at 10:00 A.M., is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties, without the need for oral argument; therefore, the said Motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed, and the hearing date of June 20, 2016 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to First Amended Complaint of USAA Savings Bank, USAA Federal Savings Bank, and USAA Casualty Insurance Company filed 5/27/2016 25 . The following error(s) was found: USAA Savings Bank, Inc., only, was selected as the filer of this Answer. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING PRE-TRIAL & TRIAL DATES by Judge Manuel L. Real. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that this action is hereby placed on calendar for FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on OCTOBER 24, 2016 AT 11:00 A.M. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit Lists and Witness Lists shall be filed and served on or before OCTOBER 3, 2016, which date will also serve as the discovery cut-off date in this action. There is no Motion Cut-Off Date set. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER shall be lodged with this Court on or before OCTOBER 17, 2016. JURY TRIAL DATE is set as NOVEMBER 22, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cch) (Entered: 06/05/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan [FRCP Rule 26, 26-1] ; estimated length of trial 3 to 7 days, filed by Defendant Bank of America, NA.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service by Mail on Pro Se Plaintiff)(Shah, Raagini) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS OR ENTITIES of Interested Parties filed by Defendant USAA Savings Bank, Inc., (Michail, Maureen) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES OF USAA SAVINGS BANK, USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, AND USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed by Defendant USAA Savings Bank, Inc..(Attorney Maureen M Michail added to party USAA Savings Bank, Inc.(pty:dft))(Michail, Maureen) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 13 and Defenses filed by DEFENDANT Transunion LLC.(Bradley, Donald) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 13 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court 15 by Defendants Jointly filed by Defendant Bank of America, NA. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service by Overnight Delivery on Pro Se Plaintiff)(Shah, Raagini) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court hereby ORDERS the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 14 , CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 17 , for the following reasons: First Amended Complaint was filed on May 3, 2016. See Docket 13 . (iv) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Dismiss Case 19 . The following error(s) was found: Lacking statement re conference of counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7-3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (iv) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Bank of America, NA. Motion set for hearing on 7/5/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Mail Service of Motion to Dismiss on Pro Se Plaintiff, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Mail Service of [Proposed] Order on Pro Se Plaintiff) (Shah, Raagini) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING by Judge Manuel L. Real. IT IS ORDERED that the Application for Permission for Electronic Filing 12 is hereby DENIED. (iv) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                              ***STRICKEN*** CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants USAA Savings Bank, Inc., USAA Federal Savings Bank, Inc., USAA Casualty Insurance, Inc., Bank of America, Inc., Bank of America, NA, Transunion LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, and Does 1-50, Inclusive; correcting (Corrected) First Amended Complaint 14 with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (gk) Modified on 5/24/2016 21 (iv). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF REQUEST for Remand of Civil Action 15 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (gk) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  MOTION for Request for Remand of Civil Action filed by Plaintiff Lisa Douglass. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (gk) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ***STRICKEN*** CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants USAA Savings Bank, Inc., USAA Federal Savings Bank, Inc., USAA Casualty Insurance, Inc., Bank of America, Inc., Bank of America, NA, Transunion LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, and Does 1-50, Inclusive; correcting First Amended Complaint 13 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (gk) Modified on 5/24/2016 21 (iv). (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants USAA Savings Bank, Inc., USAA Federal Savings Bank, Inc., USAA Casualty Insurance, Inc., Bank of America, Inc., Bank of America, NA, Transunion LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, and Does 1-50, Inclusive; Party Transunion, Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Inc. and Equifax, Inc. terminated; amending Complaint 1 ; with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (gk) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (iv) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only 5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 4 served on May 4, 2016. (Attachments: # 1 Dkt. 4, # 2 Dkt. 5, # 3 Proof of Service)(Shah, Raagini) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax, Inc., identifying Equifax, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Equifax, Inc..(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax, Inc.(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bank of America Corporation, Inc. answer now due 5/6/2016, re Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service by Mail on Plaintiff)(Shah, Raagini) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Transunion, Corp. identifying TransUnion as Corporate Parent. (Bradley, Donald) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 and Defenses filed by DEFENDANT Transunion, Corp..(Attorney Donald E Bradley added to party Transunion, Corp.(pty:dft))(Bradley, Donald) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bank Of America Corporation, identifying Bank of America, N.A., is a wholly owned subsidiary of Bank of America Holding Corp., which is a wholly owned subsidiary of BAC North America Holding Company, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of NB Holdings Corp., which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Bank of America Corporation, which is a publicly-traded corporation in which no publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock.. (Shah, Raagini) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Bank Of America Corporation. (Shah, Raagini) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC613959 Receipt No: 0973-17653958 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Bank Of America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Complaint and Summons), # 2 Exhibit B (Notice of Assignment), # 3 Exhibit C (USAA Casualty Insurance, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint)) (Attorney Raagini Shah added to party Bank Of America Corporation(pty:dft))(Shah, Raagini) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 458 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?