Caston et al v. U.S.F.E.M.A. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00286
District Judge ROBERT C. JONES, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 7:08 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo African Union, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by African Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space African Union
No Logo Charles Caston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by General Delivery

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Caston
No Logo European Union, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by European Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space European Union
No Logo Goodwill of Houston Texas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwill of Houston Texas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Goodwill of Houston Texas
No Logo Mississippi Citizens Bilouxi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mississippi Citizens Bilouxi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mississippi Citizens Bilouxi
No Logo Paris Hilton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Paris Hilton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paris Hilton
No Logo Rufford & Kie Murdock, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rufford & Kie Murdock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rufford & Kie Murdock
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "C.I.A. General Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo R&J Pawn Shop, Defendant
No Logo U.S. F.E.M.A., Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. President George W. Bush, Jr."
No Logo U.S. Vice Dick Chaney, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Affirming 3 Report and recommendation; complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/3/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss the complaint with prejudice. Order Granting 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Charles Caston. Objections to R&R due by 6/30/2007 Signed by Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 6/14/07. (AXM) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Charles Caston, Paris Hilton, Mississippi Citizens Bilouxi, Rufford & Kie Murdock, European Union, African Union, Goodwill of Houston Texas. (AXM) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
        MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiffs Charles Caston, Paris Hilton, Mississippi Citizens Bilouxi, Rufford & Kie Murdock, European Union, African Union, Goodwill of Houston Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Petition)(AXM) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 87 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?