GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., et al v. U.S Army Corps of Engineers, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 16-13486

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 11:49 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109018187 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney John R. Monroe for Appellants GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James and Brain Barrs. No hearings.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109017462 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
    Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Abby Christine Wright for Appellee U.S Army Corps of Engineers. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Abby Wright)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109016499 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
      TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney John R. Monroe for Appellants GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James and Brain Barrs. No hearings. (ECF: John Monroe)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109016495 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
        Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney John R. Monroe for Appellants GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James and Brain Barrs. (ECF: John Monroe)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109016488 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
          Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John R. Monroe for Appellants GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James and Brain Barrs. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: John Monroe)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109016474 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
            APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John R. Monroe for GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James and Brain Barrs. (ECF: John Monroe)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 01109010873 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
              APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Abby C. Wright for U.S. Army Corps of Engineers and Chytka (ECF: Abby Wright)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109010522 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Brain Barrs, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc. and David James on 05/23/2016. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/25/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 07/01/2016 as to Appellant Brain Barrs
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 517 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?