Bellitto et al v. Snipes
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:16-cv-61474-BB
District Judge Beth Bloom, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 7, 2018 at 2:10 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Civil Rights Union, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Christopher Coates +1 843 609 7080 +1 843 737 5180 curriecoates@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Earl Davis +1 305 482 8400 +1 305 482 8600 wdavis@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Interest Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Christian Adams +1 703 963 8611 +1 703 740 1779 adams@publicinterestlegal.org
Space Kaylan Lytle Phillips +1 317 203 5599 +1 888 815 5641 kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by theacru.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth A. Klukowski +1 877 730 2278 kklukowski@theacru.org
No Logo Andrea Bellitto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Christopher Coates +1 843 609 7080 +1 843 737 5180 curriecoates@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Earl Davis +1 305 482 8400 +1 305 482 8600 wdavis@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Interest Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Christian Adams +1 703 963 8611 +1 703 740 1779 adams@publicinterestlegal.org
Space Kaylan Lytle Phillips +1 317 203 5599 +1 888 815 5641 kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
Space JOSEPH A. VANDERHULST +1 317 203 5599 jvanderhulst@publicinterestlegal.org
v.
No Logo Brenda Snipes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Burnadette Norris-Weeks +1 954 768 9770 +7689 768 768 9790 bnorris199@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by apnwlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle Austin Pamies +1 954 768 9770 maustin@apnwlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips Richard & Rind

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen Marie Phillips +1 305 412 8322 +4128 412 412 8299 kphillips@phillipsrichard.com
No Logo 1199/seiu, United Healthcare Workers East, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DÄ“mos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
Space Kali N. Bracey +1 202 639 6871 kbracey@jenner.com
Space Tassity S. Johnson +1 202 637 6303 +1 202 639 6066 tjohnson@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips Richard & Rind

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen Marie Phillips +1 305 412 8322 +4128 412 412 8299 kphillips@phillipsrichard.com
Space Lucia Piva +1 305 412 8322 +1 305 412 8299 lpiva@phillipsrichard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Service Employees International Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Roberson-Young +1 954 804 2710 +1 305 571 1396 katherine.roberson-young@seiu.org
No Logo John Gale, Mediator
Citation Civil Miscellaneous Case
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Office Ft Lauderdale
Filed 6/27/2016
Jury Demand None
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Broward (Office
Terminated 3/30/2018
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 18-11808-GG[USCA]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags AOV,APPEAL,CLOSED,MEDIATION,PERMSEAL,REF_DISCOV
  Entries (253) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 248 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Electronic Availability of ROA
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: [246] Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 18-11808-GG. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (hh)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018 Acknowledgment of Receipt from USCA
    Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re [246] Notice of Appeal, filed by American Civil Rights Union. Date received by USCA: 4/30/2018. USCA Case Number: 18-11808-GG. (apz)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
      Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [246] Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/29/2018, Entered: 4/29/2018 Notice of appeal
          Notice of Appeal as to [245] Judgment, [244] Order by American Civil Rights Union. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-10610093. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Davis, William)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 judgmentCourt Filing
            FINAL JUDGMENT, Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/30/2018. (mno) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 244 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 OrderCourt Filing
              BENCH ORDER on TRIAL, Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/30/2018. (mno)
                LREF
                Blank 243 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                PAPERLESS ORDER granting [242] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Carrie F. Apfel terminated and Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Carrie Apfel. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018, Terminated: 2/8/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Carrie Apfel. by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 2/22/2018 (Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 241 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting [240] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marina K. Jenkins terminated and Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Marina Jenkins. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017, Terminated: 12/1/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Marina K. Jenkins. by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 12/15/2017 (Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Notice - other
                        NOTICE OF FILING Email Received to Court's E-File Account (tas)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/21/2017, Entered: 10/21/2017 Proposed Findings of Fact
                          Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by Brenda Snipes. (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 237 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Proposed Findings of Fact
                            Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by American Civil Rights Union. (Davis, William)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Proposed Findings of Fact
                              Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 235 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                PAPERLESS ORDER granting [234] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cameron Bell terminated and Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Cameron Bell. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017, Terminated: 9/29/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cameron A. Bell. by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/13/2017 (Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Day 5 held on 08/02/2017 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 5 of 5, 1 - 261 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2017. (yhz)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Day 4 held on 07/31/2017 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 4 of 5, 1 - 219 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2017. (yhz)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Day 3 held on 07/27/2017 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 3 of 5, 1 - 181 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2017. (yhz)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Day 2 held on 07/26/2017 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 2 of 5, 1 - 260 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2017. (yhz)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Trial, Day 1 held on 7/25/2017 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 1 of 5, 1 - 275 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2017. (yhz)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 228 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/21/2017 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                              PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part [226] Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall submit proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law within 30 days from the date the trial transcript becomes available. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [226] MOTION for Extension of Time to file Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes. Replies due by 8/24/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Attorneys' Email Exchange)(Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017, Terminated: 8/21/2017 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to file Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 8/31/2017 (Davis, William)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence
                                                    CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): 1, 6-16, 19-25, 27-184, 187, 189 by Katherine Roberson-Young on behalf of 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                      SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 224 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1099332)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Exhibits
                                                        TRIAL EXHIBITS 116-184, 187, 189 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 116, # (2) Exhibit 117, # (3) Exhibit 118, # (4) Exhibit 119, # (5) Exhibit 120, # (6) Exhibit 121, # (7) Exhibit 122, # (8) Exhibit 123, # (9) Exhibit 124, # (10) Exhibit 125, # (11) Exhibit 126, # (12) Exhibit 127, # (13) Exhibit 128, # (14) Exhibit 129, # (15) Exhibit 130, # (16) Exhibit 131, # (17) Exhibit 132, # (18) Exhibit 133, # (19) Exhibit 134, # (20) Exhibit 135, # (21) Exhibit 136, # (22) Exhibit 137, # (23) Exhibit 138, # (24) Exhibit 139, # (25) Exhibit 140, # (26) Exhibit 141, # (27) Exhibit 142, # (28) Exhibit 143, # (29) Exhibit 144, # (30) Exhibit 145, # (31) Exhibit 146, # (32) Exhibit 147, # (33) Exhibit 148, # (34) Exhibit 149, # (35) Exhibit 150, # (36) Exhibit 151, # (37) Exhibit 152, # (38) Exhibit 153, # (39) Exhibit 154, # (40) Exhibit 155, # (41) Exhibit 156, # (42) Exhibit 157, # (43) Exhibit 158, # (44) Exhibit 159, # (45) Exhibit 160, # (46) Exhibit 161, # (47) Exhibit 162, # (48) Exhibit 163, # (49) Exhibit 164, # (50) Exhibit 165, # (51) Exhibit 166, # (52) Exhibit 167, # (53) Exhibit 168, # (54) Exhibit 169, # (55) Exhibit 170, # (56) Exhibit 171, # (57) Exhibit 172, # (58) Exhibit 173, # (59) Exhibit 174, # (60) Exhibit 175, # (61) Exhibit 176, # (62) Exhibit 177, # (63) Exhibit 178, # (64) Exhibit 179, # (65) Exhibit 180, # (66) Exhibit 181, # (67) Exhibit 182, # (68) Exhibit 183, # (69) Exhibit 184, # (70) Exhibit 187, # (71) Exhibit 189)(Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Exhibits
                                                          TRIAL EXHIBITS 55-115 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 55, # (2) Exhibit 56, # (3) Exhibit 57, # (4) Exhibit 58, # (5) Exhibit 59, # (6) Exhibit 60, # (7) Exhibit 61, # (8) Exhibit 62, # (9) Exhibit 63, # (10) Exhibit 64, # (11) Exhibit 65, # (12) Exhibit 66, # (13) Exhibit 67, # (14) Exhibit 68, # (15) Exhibit 69, # (16) Exhibit 70, # (17) Exhibit 71, # (18) Exhibit 72, # (19) Exhibit 73, # (20) Exhibit 74, # (21) Exhibit 75, # (22) Exhibit 76, # (23) Exhibit 77, # (24) Exhibit 78, # (25) Exhibit 79, # (26) Exhibit 80, # (27) Exhibit 81, # (28) Exhibit 82, # (29) Exhibit 83, # (30) Exhibit 84, # (31) Exhibit 85, # (32) Exhibit 86, # (33) Exhibit 87, # (34) Exhibit 88, # (35) Exhibit 89, # (36) Exhibit 90, # (37) Exhibit 91, # (38) Exhibit 92, # (39) Exhibit 93, # (40) Exhibit 94, # (41) Exhibit 95, # (42) Exhibit 96, # (43) Exhibit 97, # (44) Exhibit 98, # (45) Exhibit 99, # (46) Exhibit 100, # (47) Exhibit 101, # (48) Exhibit 102, # (49) Exhibit 103, # (50) Exhibit 104, # (51) Exhibit 105, # (52) Exhibit 106, # (53) Exhibit 107, # (54) Exhibit 108, # (55) Exhibit 109, # (56) Exhibit 110, # (57) Exhibit 111, # (58) Exhibit 112, # (59) Exhibit 113, # (60) Exhibit 114, # (61) Exhibit 115)(Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Exhibits
                                                            TRIAL EXHIBITS 1, 6-16, 19-25, 27-54 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, Part 1, # (2) Exhibit 1, Part 2, # (3) Exhibit 1, Part 3, # (4) Exhibit 6, Part 1, # (5) Exhibit 6, Part 2, # (6) Exhibit 6, Part 3, # (7) Exhibit 6, Part 4, # (8) Exhibit 6, Part 5, # (9) Exhibit 6, Part 6, # (10) Exhibit 6, Part 7, # (11) Exhibit 7, Part 1, # (12) Exhibit 7, Part 2, # (13) Exhibit 8, Part 1, # (14) Exhibit 8, Part 2, # (15) Exhibit 9, # (16) Exhibit 10, # (17) Exhibit 11, # (18) Exhibit 12, # (19) Exhibit 13, # (20) Exhibit 14, # (21) Exhibit 15, # (22) Exhibit 16, # (23) Exhibit 19, Part 1, # (24) Exhibit 19, Part 2, # (25) Exhibit 19, Part 3, # (26) Exhibit 19, Part 4, # (27) Exhibit 20, # (28) Exhibit 21, # (29) Exhibit 22, # (30) Exhibit 23, # (31) Exhibit 24, # (32) Exhibit 25, # (33) Exhibit 27, # (34) Exhibit 28, # (35) Exhibit 29, # (36) Exhibit 30, # (37) Exhibit 31, # (38) Exhibit 32, # (39) Exhibit 33, # (40) Exhibit 34, # (41) Exhibit 35, # (42) Exhibit 36, # (43) Exhibit 37, # (44) Exhibit 38, # (45) Exhibit 39, # (46) Exhibit 40, # (47) Exhibit 41, # (48) Exhibit 42, # (49) Exhibit 43, # (50) Exhibit 44, # (51) Exhibit 45, # (52) Exhibit 46, # (53) Exhibit 47, # (54) Exhibit 48, # (55) Exhibit 49, # (56) Exhibit 50, # (57) Exhibit 51, # (58) Exhibit 52, # (59) Exhibit 53, # (60) Exhibit 54)(Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence
                                                              CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): 3, 4, 5, 9, 12, 13, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29 by William Earl Davis on behalf of American Civil Rights Union (Davis, William)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Exhibits
                                                                TRIAL EXHIBITS 12, 13, 15, 16, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29 by American Civil Rights Union. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 12, # (2) Exhibit 13, # (3) Exhibit 15, # (4) Exhibit 16, # (5) Exhibit 18, # (6) Exhibit 19, # (7) Exhibit 20, # (8) Exhibit 21, # (9) Exhibit 22, # (10) Exhibit 23, # (11) Exhibit 24, # (12) Exhibit 25, # (13) Exhibit 26, # (14) Exhibit 27, # (15) Exhibit 28, # (16) Exhibit 29)(Davis, William)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Notice - other
                                                                  NOTICE by Brenda Snipes of Filing Documents Related to Exhibit #188 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                    SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 219 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (750809)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                      SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 218 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (519897)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 215 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting [213] Motion to Seal. Matters should remain sealed permanently. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 214 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Bench Trial CompletedCourt Filing
                                                                          PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Bench Trial completed on 8/2/2017. Witnesses Jorge Nunez and Professor Daniel Smith testified. Defendants continue with the presentation of their case, evidence entered. Defendants rest. Closing arguements presented by all parties. Exhibits to be filed electronically by Monday, 8/14/17. The parties are instructed and permitted by the Court to file unredacted exhibits under seal.The parties shall submit to the Court their proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by Friday, 9/15/17. NOTICE OF NEW POLICY RE ELECTRONIC SUBMISSION OF EXHIBITS. Ordered by the presiding Judge that the parties shall file all exhibits admitted in the bench trial by 8/14/17, parties must file in the CMECF system electronic versions of most documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. At the time of filing the electronic exhibits, the attorney for the filing party shall complete and file a Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence. Electronically filed exhibits are subject to CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Section 6, Redaction of Personal Information, Privacy Policy, and Inappropriate Materials. Failure to file the electronic exhibits and Notice of Compliance by 8/14/17 may result in the imposition of sanctions. The Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence, a Quick Reference Guide to Electronically Filing Trial Exhibits, and the full text of Administrative Order 2016-70 can be found at the Courts website, http://www.flsd.uscourts.gov (tas)Total time in court: 9 hour. Attorney Appearance(s): Trisha Pande, Cameron Bell, Stuart C. Naifeh, Katherine Roberson-Young, Kali N. Bracey, Marina K. Jenkins, Carrie F. Apfel, J. Christian Adams, William Earl Davis, Joseph A. Vanderhulst, Burnadette Norris-Weeks, Michelle Pamies. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (tas)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017, Terminated: 8/2/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                            Joint MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Brenda Snipes. (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Excerpt Transcript of Trial, Day 4, Testimony of Sharon Flemming held on 07/31/2017 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 54 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2017. (yhz)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Excerpt of Trial, Day 2, Continued Cross-Examination of Scott Gessler held on 07/26/2017 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 83 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2017. (yhz)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Excerpt of Trial, Day 1, Testimony of Steven A. Camarota held on 07/25/2017 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 48 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2017. (yhz)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 209 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                    PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Bench Trial held on 7/31/2017 Witness Mary Hall, Brenda Snipes, and Sharon Flemming testified. Defendant and Defendant-Intervenor admitted exhibits into evidence. Plaintiff rests its case. The Court denies Defendant's motion for directed verdict for the reasons stated on the record. Total time in court: 6 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Trisha Pande, Cameron Bell, Stuart C. Naifeh, Katherine Roberson-Young, Kali N. Bracey, Marina K. Jenkins, Carrie F. Apfel, J. Christian Adams, William Earl Davis, Joseph A. Vanderhulst, Burnadette Norris-Weeks, Michelle Pamies. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ch1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 208 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                      PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Bench Trial held on 7/27/2017 Witness Susan Carleson, Scott Gessler, Richard Gabbay and Greg Prentice testified. Plaintiff and Intervenor-Defendant admitted exhibits into evidence. Total time in court: 4 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Trisha Pande, Cameron Bell, Stuart C. Naifeh, Katherine Roberson-Young, Kali N. Bracey, Marina K. Jenkins, Carrie F. Apfel, J. Christian Adams, Kenneth A. Klukowski, William Earl Davis, Joseph A. Vanderhulst, Burnadette Norris-Weeks, Michelle Pamies. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ch1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND DOCUMENTS granting [206] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/27/2017. (yha)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017, Terminated: 7/27/2017 Motion for protective order
                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Brenda Snipes. (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 205 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                            PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Bench Trial held on 7/26/2017 Witness Scott Gessler, Kirk Wolkak, William Skinner, Logan Churchwell, and Richard DeNapoli testified. Plaintiff ACRU admitted exhibits into evidence. Total time in court: 8 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Trisha Pande, Cameron Bell, Stuart C. Naifeh, Katherine Roberson-Young, Kali N. Bracey, Marina K. Jenkins, Carrie F. Apfel, J. Christian Adams, Kenneth A. Klukowski, William Earl Davis, Joseph A. Vanderhulst, Burnadette Norris-Weeks, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ch1)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Bench Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                              PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Bench Trial held on 7/25/2017 Witness Dr. Steven Camarota and Scott Gessler testified. Plaintiff ACRU admitted exhibits into evidence. Total time in court: 7 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Cameron Bell, Stuart C. Naifeh, Katherine Roberson-Young, Kali N. Bracey, Marina K. Jenkins, Jessica Ring Amunson, Carrie F. Apfel, J. Christian Adams, William Earl Davis, Joseph A. Vanderhulst, Burnadette Norris-Weeks, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ch1).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 203 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Order on Motion to Bring Electronic EquipmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER granting [202] Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017, Terminated: 7/24/2017 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment
                                                                                                  MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 8/7/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting [200] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michelle Kanter Cohen terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Michelle Kanter Cohen. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017, Terminated: 7/24/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michelle E. Kanter, Esq. by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 8/7/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/23/2017, Entered: 7/23/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                        NOTICE by American Civil Rights Union re [184] Pretrial Stipulation Updated Schedules A and B (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Schedule A Update, # (2) Exhibit Schedule B Update) (Davis, William)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER Dismissing Count II. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/21/17. (tas)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Order on Trial InstructionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Order of Instructions before Trial. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/21/2017. (tas)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 196 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Order on Motion to Bring Electronic EquipmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER granting [195] Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017, Terminated: 7/20/2017 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment
                                                                                                                MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes. Responses due by 8/3/2017 (Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 194 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Order on Motion to Bring Electronic EquipmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting [193] Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017, Terminated: 7/19/2017 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment
                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto. Responses due by 8/2/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 192 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Order on Motion to Bring Electronic EquipmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER granting [191] Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017, Terminated: 7/18/2017 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment
                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto. Responses due by 8/1/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 190 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: denying [176] Motion in Limine; denying [178] Motion in Limine; Calendar Call held on 7/18/2017; Final Pretrial Conference held on 7/18/2017. Bench Trial set for Tuesday, 7/25/2017 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom, 400 North Miami Avenue, Courtroom 10-2. Counsel shall submit to the Court proposed orders for electronic equipment. Counsel shall test electronic equipment on Wednesday, July 19, 2017 at 3:00 pm in Courtroom 10-2. Total time in court: 45 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Cameron Bell, Stuart C. Naifeh, Katherine Roberson-Young, Kali N. Bracey, Marina K. Jenkins, Carrie F. Apfel, J. Christian Adams, William Earl Davis, Joseph A. Vanderhulst, Burnadette Norris-Weeks. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE OF NEW POLICY RE ELECTRONIC SUBMISSION OF EXHIBITS. Unless otherwise ordered by the presiding Judge, Administrative Order 2016-70 directs that within three (3) days of the conclusion of a proceeding, parties must file in the CMECF system electronic versions of most documentary exhibits admitted into evidence (excluding sealed exhibits in criminal cases), including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. At the time of filing the electronic exhibits, the attorney for the filing party shall complete and file a Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence. Electronically filed exhibits are subject to CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Section 6, Redaction of Personal Information, Privacy Policy, and Inappropriate Materials. Failure to file the electronic exhibits and Notice of Compliance within three (3) days may result in the imposition of sanctions. The Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence, a Quick Reference Guide to Electronically Filing Trial Exhibits, and the full text of Administrative Order 2016-70 can be found at the Courts website, http://www.flsd.uscourts.gov (tas)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [176] MOTION in Limine filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes. Replies due by 7/24/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit 12)(Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [178] MOTION in Limine filed by American Civil Rights Union. Replies due by 7/24/2017. (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 187 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER PURSUANT to ECF No. [186] Notice/Request for Pre-Trial Confernece filed by American Civil Rights Union, the Calendar Call set for 7/18/17 at 1:15 pm will be a Pretrial Conference where 45 minutes has been set aside. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/17/17. (tas)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by American Civil Rights Union Request for Pre-Trial Conference (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting [175] Motion for Leave to File Inadvertently Excluded Exhibits from Defendant Brenda Snipes' and Defendant-Intervenor 1199 SEIU United Healthcare Workers East's Pretrial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/15/2017 Pretrial Stipulation
                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL STIPULATION JOINT by American Civil Rights Union (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Schedule A, # (2) Exhibit Schedule B, # (3) Exhibit Schedule C, # (4) Exhibit Schedule D)(Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [175] MOTION for Leave to File Inadvertently Excluded Exhibits from Defendant Brenda Snipes' and Defendant-Intervenor 1199 SEIU United Healthcare Workers East's Pretrial Disclosures filed by American Civil Rights Union. Replies due by 7/21/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration)(Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY denying [117] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [142] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part [144] Motion to Suppress; denying [145] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot [149] Motion to Strike ; denying as moot [164] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/11/2017. (pes)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 181 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER requiring expedited responses to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine, ECF NO. [176], and Defendants' Motion in Limine, ECF No. [178], no later than July 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                              Reset Deadlines per [181] Order as to [176] MOTION in Limine , [178] MOTION in Limine . Responses due by 7/17/2017 (asl)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 180 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Plaintiff's expedited Response to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Inadvertently Excluded Exhibits, ECF No. [175], no later than July 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                  Reset Deadlines per [180] Order as to [175] MOTION for Leave to File Inadvertently Excluded Exhibits from Defendant Brenda Snipes' and Defendant-Intervenor 1199 SEIU United Healthcare Workers East's Pretrial Disclosures. Responses due by 7/14/2017 (asl)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017, Terminated: 7/18/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Excerpts from Deposition of Logan Churchwell, # (2) Exhibit Excerpts from Richard Gabbay's Email Correspondence with Dr. Snipes, # (3) Exhibit Excerpts from Deposition of Dr. Daniel A. Smith, # (4) Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. Daniel A. Smith)(Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law Pretrial by American Civil Rights Union. (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017, Terminated: 7/18/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine by American Civil Rights Union. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017, Terminated: 7/17/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Inadvertently Excluded Exhibits from Defendant Brenda Snipes' and Defendant-Intervenor 1199 SEIU United Healthcare Workers East's Pretrial Disclosures by Brenda Snipes. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Response/Reply (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Objections to [167] Initial Disclosure(s) by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes. (Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re [164] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Evidence and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes. (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 172 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Order on motion for clarificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting [171] Motion for Clarification. With the exception of the time for filing the Parties' Joint Pretrial Stipulation on July 14, 2017, all other deadlines set forth in ECF No. [127], remain in effect. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017, Terminated: 7/6/2017 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for clarification [170] Order, Modifying Pretrial Deadlines by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 7/20/2017 (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 170 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER modifying pretrial deadlines as set forth in ECF NO. [127]. This Cause is before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. In order to allow the parties to properly prepare for trial, the deadline for the filing of the Parties' Joint Pretrial Stipulation is extended to July 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [164] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Evidence and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by American Civil Rights Union. Replies due by 7/7/2017. (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucia Piva on behalf of 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Attorney Lucia Piva added to party 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East(pty:intvd). (Piva, Lucia)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                            Initial Disclosure(s) of 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by American Civil Rights Union (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                              Initial Disclosure(s) /Pretrial Disclosure(s) by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes (Attachments: # (1) Supplement)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [142] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of Amended Complaint filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Cameron Bell, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6)(Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017, Terminated: 7/12/2017 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Evidence and Memorandum of Law in Support by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes. Responses due by 6/30/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [144] MOTION to Suppress To Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Proposed Experts and Memorandum in Support filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [161] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Catherine M. Flanagan terminated, Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Catherine Flanagan. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/12/2017. (jas)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017, Terminated: 6/13/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Catherine M. Flanagan. by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 6/26/2017 (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/10/2017 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement of: Opposition to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendants's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by American Civil Rights Union re [143] Statement, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 7, # (7) Exhibit 8, # (8) Exhibit 9, # (9) Exhibit 10, # (10) Exhibit 11, # (11) Exhibit 13, # (12) Exhibit A)(Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [142] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of Amended Complaint filed by American Civil Rights Union. Replies due by 6/16/2017. (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of: Opposition to Defendant Snipes's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by American Civil Rights Union re [146] Statement (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [145] MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law as to Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by American Civil Rights Union. Replies due by 6/16/2017. (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [144] MOTION to Suppress To Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Proposed Experts and Memorandum in Support filed by American Civil Rights Union. Replies due by 6/16/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Notice of Adoption
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Adoption by Brenda Snipes Related document:[152] Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 154 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER denying [153] Motion to Strike. The Plaintiff shall timely file responses to ECF Nos. [142] and [145]. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017, Terminated: 6/5/2017 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike [145] MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law as to Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 6/19/2017 (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [149] Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike [145] MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law as to Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Replies due by 6/9/2017. (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by American Civil Rights Union of Withdrawal of Firm Attorney (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to [144] MOTION to Suppress To Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Proposed Experts and Memorandum in Support by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017, Terminated: 7/12/2017 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike [145] MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law as to Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 6/15/2017 (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 148 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting [147] Motion for Leave to File Exhibits. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017, Terminated: 5/31/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Inadvertently Excluded Exhibits to Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Proposed Experts by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Brenda Snipes (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017, Terminated: 7/12/2017 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law as to Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Brenda Snipes. Responses due by 6/9/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017, Terminated: 7/12/2017 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Suppress To Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Proposed Experts and Memorandum in Support by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 6/9/2017 (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts In Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment with Declarations by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes re [142] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of Amended Complaint (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017, Terminated: 7/12/2017 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of Amended Complaint by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East, Brenda Snipes. Attorney Kathleen Marie Phillips added to party Brenda Snipes(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/9/2017 (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 141 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER granting [140] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Tassity S. Johnson. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017, Terminated: 5/26/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Tassity S. Johnson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9765966 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 6/9/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 139 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting [138] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kenneth A. Klukowski. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017, Terminated: 5/23/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kenneth A. Klukowski. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9756883 by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 6/6/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 137 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting [136] Motion for Extension of Time to update or revise ACRU's expert reports by May 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017, Terminated: 5/9/2017 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Update/Revise Expert Report by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 5/19/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 135 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re [134] Order, Set/Reset Deadlines. Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case #17-cv-60844. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Requiring Verified Certificate of Counsel Regarding Any Prior Filings Under the Americans With Disabilities Act. ( Responses due by 5/22/2017). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/1/2017. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [132] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott Novakowski terminated Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Scott Novakowski. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/1/2017. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017, Terminated: 5/1/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Scott Novakowski. by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 5/12/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement of: Plaintiff's Reply Regarding Statement of Undisputed Material Facts Supporting Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count II of the First Amended Complaint by American Civil Rights Union re [118] Statement, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit F)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [117] Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count II of the First Amended Complaint filed by American Civil Rights Union. (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [117] Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count II of the First Amended Complaint filed by Brenda Snipes. Replies due by 4/6/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement of: Material Facts inn Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count II of the First Amended Complaint by Brenda Snipes re [118] Statement, (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESCHEDULING ORDER: ( Bench Trial reset for 7/24/2017 at 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call reset for 7/18/2017 at 1:15 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Discovery due by 5/5/2017., In Limine Motions due by 7/10/2017., Dispositive Motions due by 5/26/2017., Motions due by 5/26/2017., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/10/2017.) Denying as moot: [124] Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/27/2017. (pes) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [111] Motion to Compel and Re-Open Limited Discovery. Discovery due by 5/5/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/24/2017. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to [120] Response to Motion, to Compel Production of Documents and Re-Open Limited Discovery by Brenda Snipes (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017, Terminated: 3/27/2017 Motion for ClarificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification [77] Order, Terminate Motions, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, [20] Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Order Referring Case to Judge,,,,,,,,, by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 4/5/2017 (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [111] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Re-Open Limited Discovery filed by American Civil Rights Union. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit G)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [111] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Re-Open Limited Discovery filed by American Civil Rights Union. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit E, # (2) Exhibit F)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 121 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting [119] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kaylan L. Phillips. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [111] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Re-Open Limited Discovery filed by Brenda Snipes. Replies due by 3/23/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017, Terminated: 3/17/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kaylan L. Phillips. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9570468 by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 3/30/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts Supporting Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count II of the First Amended Complaint by American Civil Rights Union re [117] Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count II of the First Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017, Terminated: 7/12/2017 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count II of the First Amended Complaint by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 3/30/2017 (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [111] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Re-Open Limited Discovery filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Replies due by 3/22/2017. (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Mediation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by John Gale. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Re: Mediation Results: On or before March 20, 2017, the parties shall submit a mediation report indicating the results of the January 11, 2017 mediation conference if held or, if the mediation conference was cancelled, a notice explaining the parties' failure to submit a proposed order rescheduling mediation and showing cause as to the parties failure to meet the final mediation deadline as amended in the Courts December 23, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/14/2017. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Defendant Snipes's expedited response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Re-Open Limited Discovery. Response due by 3/16/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 112 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER granting [110] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Carrie F. Apfel. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017, Terminated: 3/24/2017 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Re-Open Limited Discovery by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 3/24/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017, Terminated: 3/10/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Carrie F. Apfel. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9554241 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 3/24/2017 (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 109 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER denying [108] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017, Terminated: 3/6/2017 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Reset Deadlines re [77] Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set/Reset Deadlines, [79] Order on Motion for Clarification, [78] Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification [77] Order, Terminate Motions, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 3/20/2017 (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 107 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting [106] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jessica Ring Amunson. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017, Terminated: 3/3/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jessica Ring Amunson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9533234 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 3/17/2017 (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting [103] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kali N. Bracey. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 104 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER granting [102] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Marina K. Jenkins. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017, Terminated: 3/1/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kali N. Bracey. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9526300 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 3/15/2017 (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017, Terminated: 3/1/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Marina K. Jenkins. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9526234 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 3/15/2017 (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [100] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicole G. Berner terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Nicole Berner.. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/3/2017. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017, Terminated: 2/6/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nicole Berner. by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 2/17/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph A. Vanderhulst (system address updated) (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Roberson-Young on behalf of 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Attorney Katherine Roberson-Young added to party 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East(pty:intvd). (Roberson-Young, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting [96] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David Slutsky. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017, Terminated: 1/27/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David Slutsky. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9439334 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 2/10/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER denying [89] Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena of Monica Russo ; denying [89] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [89] MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena of Monica Russo MOTION for Protective Order filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [89] MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena of Monica Russo MOTION for Protective Order filed by American Civil Rights Union. Replies due by 2/1/2017. (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER requring Plaintiff's expedited response to 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East's Motion to Quash and for Protective Order, ECF No. [89], no later than 1/27/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerks Notice to Filer re [89] MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena of Monica Russo. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part [85] Motion for Protective Order; granting [85] Motion to Quash. The deposition schedule shall be as follows: 1/26/2017 at 9:00 am: Brenda Snipes; 1/27/2017 at 9:00 am: Mary Hall; 1/27/2017 at 3:00 pm: Fred Bellis; 1/30/2017 at 9:00 am: Dolly Gibson; 1/30/2017 at 3:00 pm: Sonia Cahuasqui. All depositions shall be held at the office of Burnadette Norris-Weeks, P.A., 401 Avenue of the Arts, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33311. The depositions shall proceed until completed and the Defendant shall make arrangements for each witness to be present. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017, Terminated: 1/25/2017 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena of Monica Russo by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Stuart C. Naifeh, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of Monica Russo)(Phillips, Kathleen). Added MOTION for Protective Order on 1/23/2017 (pes).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [85] MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash or in the Alternative, Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoenas Relating to the Scheduling of Depositions Set by the Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion to Extend Deadlines and Compel Discovery filed by American Civil Rights Union. Replies due by 1/27/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Plaintiff's expedited response to ECF No. [85], Defendant's Motion for Protective Order, specifying why the proposed schedule set forth in paragraphaph 12 should not be approved. Plaintiff shall file its response by 1/23/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017, Terminated: 1/23/2017 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION to Quash by Brenda Snipes. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 Order StrikingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER STRIKING [83] Notice of Unavailability filed by Brenda Snipes. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/18/2017. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 Notice of unavailability
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STRICKEN - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Brenda Snipes for dates of 1-23-2017 through 1-25-2017 (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette) Modified per DE [84] on 1/18/2017 (pes).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Order StrikingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER STRIKING [80] Initial Disclosure(s) filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/13/2017. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: 1/16/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Brenda Snipes Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STRICKEN - Initial Disclosure(s) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East (Phillips, Kathleen) Modified per DE [82] on 1/17/2017 (pes).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Order on motion for clarificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part [78] Motion for Clarification. The Court's Order, ECF No. [77], sets forth the operative pretrial dates. To the extent that the Plaintiffs' request to continue conflicts with those dates, the request to continue is denied. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016, Terminated: 12/28/2016 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification [77] Order, Terminate Motions, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 1/6/2017 (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [71] Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines., ( Discovery due by 3/10/2017., Expert Discovery due by 3/10/2017., Mediation Deadline 3/10/2017., In Limine Motions due by 4/17/2017., Pretrial Motions due by 3/31/2017., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/17/2017.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/23/2016. (tpl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016, Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification [75] Order on Motion to Continue, Order on Motion to Compel,,,, by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 1/5/2017 (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part [71] Motion to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines or in the Alternative to Compel Discovery. Defendant shall permit inspection of the documents requested by Plaintiff to take place no later than 1/13/2017. The following pretrial deadlines are extended: all discovery, including expert discovery shall be completed by 1/27/2017; Mediation deadline is 2/17/2017; dispositive motion deadline, including all Daubert motions, to be filed by 2/27/2017; in limine motions to be filed by 4/10/2017. All other deadlines remain in place per the Court's scheduling order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [71] Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines or in the Alternative to Compel Discovery re [68] Order on Motion to Continue, MOTION to Compel filed by Brenda Snipes. Replies due by 12/28/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B)(Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerks Notice to Filer re [71] Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines or in the Alternative to Compel Discovery re [68] Order on Motion to Continue,. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Defendant's expedited response to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines, ECF No. [71], and to show cause why Defendant has not met and conferred with Plaintiff or allowed for the timely inspection or production of all documents responsive to Plaintiff's requests for production. Defendant shall file a response no later than 12/23/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016, Terminated: 12/22/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines or in the Alternative to Compel Discovery re [68] Order on Motion to Continue, by American Civil Rights Union. Responses due by 1/3/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Joseph A Vanderhulst, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Gutierrez, Mathew). Added MOTION to Compel on 12/21/2016 (pes).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Order StrikingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER STRIKING [69] NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Reponses and Objections toPlaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production ofDocuments. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/13/2016. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STRICKEN - NOTICE by Brenda Snipes (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette) Modified to strike per DE [70] on 12/14/2016 (pes).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [67] Motion to Continue. Discovery due by 3/10/2017. Expert Discovery due by 3/10/2017. Mediation Deadline 3/10/2017. Motions due by 3/31/2017. Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/17/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/28/2016. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: 11/23/2016, Terminated: 11/28/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue (Joint Motion to Reset Pretrial Deadlines) by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto. Responses due by 12/12/2016 (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Brenda Snipes. (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: 10/26/2016 Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [16] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Bellitto's claims only; denying [36] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Defendant Snipes has until November 4, 2016 to file an Answer to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/25/2016. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Answer Due Deadline per Order DE [64]: Brenda Snipes answer to Amended Complaint due 11/4/2016. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re [36] MOTION TO DISMISS [12] Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [61] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Nicole G. Berner. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 10/21/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Pro Hac Vice. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9185494 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 11/7/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting [58] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney J. Christian Adams. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER granting [57] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney H. Christopher Coates. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016, Terminated: 10/18/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for J. Christian Adams. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9174143 by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto. Responses due by 11/4/2016 (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016, Terminated: 10/18/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for H. Christopher Coates. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9174077 by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto. Responses due by 11/4/2016 (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting [55] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alvin Velazquez terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Alvin Velazquez. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016, Terminated: 10/17/2016 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alvin Velazquez. by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 11/3/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [36] MOTION TO DISMISS [12] Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto. Replies due by 10/24/2016. (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [38] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/3/2016. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting [50] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michelle E. Kanter Cohen. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER granting [49] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Catherine M. Flanagan. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016, Terminated: 9/30/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michelle E. Kanter Cohen. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9134549 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/17/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016, Terminated: 9/30/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Catherine M. Flanagan. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9134533 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/17/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016 Order scheduling Mediation.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Scheduling Mediation before John Gale. Mediation Hearing set for 1/11/2017 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/29/2016. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [23] MOTION to Intervene filed by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto. Replies due by 10/11/2016. (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016 Notice of Mediation Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Mediation Hearing before Mediator, John Gale filed by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto. Mediation Hearing set for 1/11/2017 10:00 AM (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Requiring Scheduling of Mediation on or before September 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/26/2016. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 Clerks Appointment of Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Appointment of Mediator: John Gale added (pt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 Request for Clerk to Appoint Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Clerk to Appoint Mediator(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting [40] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michelle Austin Pamies. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Re: [38] Motion for Reconsideration:Plaintiffs are permitted to file a response to the Motion to Intervene, ECF No. [23], on or before September 29, 2016. United is permitted to file a reply to that response on or before October 4, 2016. Ruling on the Motion for Reconsideration, ECF No. [38], is deferred. Plaintiffs shall file a response to the Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. [40], on or before October 14, 2016. United shall file its reply on or before October 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/23/2016. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016, Terminated: 9/23/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michelle Austin Pamies. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9113951 by Brenda Snipes. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REQUIRING MEDIATION TO BE SCHEDULED on or before September 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/22/2016. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016, Terminated: 10/3/2016 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re [29] Order on Motion to Intervene, by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Clerks Appointment of Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk's Appointment of Mediator: Malcolm H. Fromberg added (pt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016, Terminated: 10/26/2016 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO DISMISS [12] Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Request for Clerk to Appoint Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Clerk to Appoint Mediator(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting [28] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Stuart C. Naifeh. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER granting [27] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Scott Novakowski. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting [26] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Cameron Bell. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER granting [25] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Trisha Pande. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER granting [24] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Alvin Velazquez. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [23] United States Motion to Intervene. United shall separately file its response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before September 21, 2016. Plaintiffs shall file their response to any motions filed by United on or before October 5, 2016. United shall file its reply on or before October 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/20/2016. (tas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016, Terminated: 9/21/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Motion to Appear Pro Hac. (S. Naifeh) Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9104113 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/7/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016, Terminated: 9/21/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Motion to Appear Pro Hac. (S. Navakowski) Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9104104 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/7/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016, Terminated: 9/21/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (C. Bell) Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9104083 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/7/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016, Terminated: 9/21/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Motion to Appeal Pro Hac. (T. Pande) Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9104053 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/7/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016, Terminated: 9/21/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for To Appeal Pro Hac Vice. (A. Velazquez) Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9103940 by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Responses due by 10/7/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016, Terminated: 9/20/2016 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Intervene by 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East. Attorney Kathleen Marie Phillips added to party 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East(pty:intvd). (Phillips, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [16] Second MOTION TO DISMISS [12] Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brenda Snipes. (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [16] Second MOTION TO DISMISS [12] Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American Civil Rights Union. Replies due by 9/16/2016. (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: 9/1/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 5/1/2017 at 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 4/25/2017 at 1:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2016., Discovery due by 12/30/2016., Expert Discovery due by 12/30/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2016., Mediation Deadline 1/13/2017., In Limine Motions due by 3/27/2017., Dispositive Motions due by 1/20/2017., Motions due by 1/20/2017., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/27/2017.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 1/13/2017.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/1/2016. (pes) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Civil Rights Union (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Parties by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016, Terminated: 10/26/2016 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second MOTION TO DISMISS [12] Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Brenda Snipes. Responses due by 9/6/2016 (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report by 8/31/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016, Terminated: 8/9/2016 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time To extend the time to develop a Joint Scheduling Report for twenty (20) days. by Brenda Snipes. Responses due by 8/26/2016 (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot [10] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brenda Snipes, filed by Andrea Bellitto, American Civil Rights Union. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties, due by 8/11/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/21/2016. (pes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/20/2016, Terminated: 8/4/2016 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION TO DISMISS [1] Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [1] Complaint, ( Responses due by 8/8/2016) by Brenda Snipes. (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/20/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Burnadette Norris-Weeks on behalf of Brenda Snipes. Attorney Burnadette Norris-Weeks added to party Brenda Snipes(pty:dft). (Norris-Weeks, Burnadette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting [7] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Joseph A. Vanderhulst. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016, Terminated: 7/14/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph A. Vanderhulst. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-8915150 by American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto. Responses due by 8/1/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: 7/7/2016 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Andrea Bellitto, American Civil Rights Union. Brenda Snipes served on 6/29/2016, answer due 7/20/2016. (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: 7/6/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mathew Daniel Gutierrez on behalf of American Civil Rights Union, Andrea Bellitto. Attorney Mathew Daniel Gutierrez added to party American Civil Rights Union(pty:pla), Attorney Mathew Daniel Gutierrez added to party Andrea Bellitto(pty:pla). (Gutierrez, Mathew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Brenda Snipes. (srd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (srd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom (srd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/27/2016 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Brenda Snipes. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8864222, filed by Andrea Bellitto, American Civil Rights Union. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet, # (4) Summon(s))(Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 235 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?