USA v. Michaels et al
Criminal Case California Central District Court, Case No. 8:16-cr-00076

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 19, 2021 at 8:06 PM ST (5.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1368 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1361 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Continue
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1258 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1247 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Continue
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Change of Plea Hearing (plea accepted)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MINUTES OF POST-INDICTMENT ARRAIGNMENT: held before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick as to Defendant Gilbert Gil N Michaels (1) Count 1,2-25,26-28,29-30 and Jerry P Feldman (2) Count 1,2-25 and Anjanette S Lester (3) Count 1,2-4 and Glen K Katayama (4) Count 1,5-6 and Tiffany M Ostrander (5) Count 1,7-8 and Sean S Moustakas (6) Count 1,7-8 and James R Milheiser (7) Count 1,9 and Cynthia A Weekes (9) Count 1,11 and John A Buzzard (13) Count 1,14 and Stephen D Paine (15) Count 1,17 and Sharon Scandaliato Virag (16) Count 1,18 and Glen M Diamond III (17) Count 1,19 and Tammi L Williams (18) Count 1,19 and Christina M Cadena (19) Count 1,20-21 and Michelle C Nunez (20) Count 1,20-21 and Francis Frank S Scimeca (21) Count 1,22-23 and Cynda L Hill (22) Count 1,24-25 and Henry L Hill II (23) Count 24-25. Defendant arraigned. Defendant entered not guilty plea to all counts as charged. Attorney: Mark Mermelstein, Appearing Specially for Gilbert Gil N. Michaels; Katherine T Corrigan, CJA Appointed for todays hearing only, for Jerry P Feldman ; Thomas H Wolfsen, CJA appointed for Anjanette S Lester; Jason Hannan, DFPD appointed for Glen K Katayama; Mark J. Werksman, Appearing Specially for Tiffany M. Ostrander and Sean S. Moustakas; Craig Wilke, CJA appointed for James R Milheiser; John W Barton, CJA appointed for Cynthia A Weekes; David L Fleck, Retained for John A Buzzard; Robert M Bernstein, Retained for Stephen D Paine; Robison D Harley, Jr., CJA appointed for Sharon Scandaliato Virag; James W. Spertus, Specially appearing for Glen M. Diamond III; Correen Wiley Ferrentino, CJA appointed for Tammi L Williams; Marri B Derby, CJA appointed for todays hearing only for Christina M Cadena; David L Fleck, Retained for Michelle C Nunez; Shaun Khojayan, CJA appointed for Francis Frank S Scimeca; David J Thomas, CJA Appointed for Cynda L Hill; David J. Thomas specially appearing for John N Aquilina, CJA appointed for Henry L Hill II, present. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna. Jury Trial set for 8/23/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Status Conference set for 8/15/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Trial estimate: 4-6 weeks. (See document for details.) Court Smart: CS 06/28/2016. (dv) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
                      REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Christina M Cadena; defendant's Year of Birth: 1967; date of arrest: 6/28/2016. (dv) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER Sealing Indictment and Related Documents by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lwag) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
                          EX PARTE APPLICATION for an Amended Order Sealing Indictment and Related Documents filed by Plaintiff USA. (lwag) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi: granting 28 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case as to Gilbert Gil N Michaels (1), Jerry P Feldman (2), Anjanette S Lester (3), Glen K Katayama (4), Tiffany M Ostrander (5), Sean S Moustakas (6), James R Milheiser (7), Thomas A Sanetti (8), Cynthia A Weekes (9), Michael B Weekes (10), Daniel C.J. Ellis (11), Leah D Johnson (12), John A Buzzard (13), Jonathan M Brightman (14), Stephen D Paine (15), Sharon Scandaliato Virag (16), Glen M Diamond III (17), Tammi L Williams (18), Christina M Cadena (19), Michelle C Nunez (20), Francis Frank S Scimeca (21), Cynda L Hill (22), Henry L Hill II (23) (dg) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                              EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Gilbert Gil N Michaels, Jerry P Feldman, Anjanette S Lester, Glen K Katayama, Tiffany M Ostrander, Sean S Moustakas, James R Milheiser, Thomas A Sanetti, Cynthia A Weekes, Michael B Weekes, Daniel C.J. Ellis, Leah D Johnson, John A Buzzard, Jonathan M Brightman, Stephen D Paine, Sharon Scandaliato Virag, Glen M Diamond III, Tammi L Williams, Christina M Cadena, Michelle C Nunez, Francis Frank S Scimeca, Cynda L Hill, Henry L Hill II. (dg) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Gilbert Gil N Michaels, Jerry P Feldman, Anjanette S Lester, Glen K Katayama, Tiffany M Ostrander, Sean S Moustakas, James R Milheiser, Thomas A Sanetti, Cynthia A Weekes, Michael B Weekes, Daniel C.J. Ellis, Leah D Johnson, John A Buzzard, Jonathan M Brightman, Stephen D Paine, Sharon Scandaliato Virag, Glen M Diamond III, Tammi L Williams, Christina M Cadena, Michelle C Nunez, Francis Frank S Scimeca, Cynda L Hill, Henry L Hill II Re Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh, Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, Magistrate Judge Michael Wilner, Magistrate Judge Jean Rosenbluth, Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, Magistrate Judge Douglas McCormick, and Magistrate Judge Rozella Oliver (dg) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Gilbert Gil N Michaels, Jerry P Feldman, Anjanette S Lester, Glen K Katayama, Tiffany M Ostrander, Sean S Moustakas, James R Milheiser, Thomas A Sanetti, Cynthia A Weekes, Michael B Weekes, Daniel C.J. Ellis, Leah D Johnson, John A Buzzard, Jonathan M Brightman, Stephen D Paine, Sharon Scandaliato Virag, Glen M Diamond III, Tammi L Williams, Christina M Cadena, Michelle C Nunez, Francis Frank S Scimeca, Cynda L Hill, Henry L Hill II. This criminal action, being filed on 6/1/16, was not pending in the U. S. Attorneys Office before the date on which Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Michael Fitzgerald began receiving criminal matters. (dg) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE TO COURT OF COMPLEX CASE filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Gilbert Gil N Michaels, Jerry P Feldman, Anjanette S Lester, Glen K Katayama, Tiffany M Ostrander, Sean S Moustakas, James R Milheiser, Thomas A Sanetti, Cynthia A Weekes, Michael B Weekes, Daniel C.J. Ellis, Leah D Johnson, John A Buzzard, Jonathan M Brightman, Stephen D Paine, Sharon Scandaliato Virag, Glen M Diamond III, Tammi L Williams, Christina M Cadena, Michelle C Nunez, Francis Frank S Scimeca, Cynda L Hill, Henry L Hill II. (dg) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                                      CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Gregory W. Staples as to Defendant Christina M Cadena; defendants Year of Birth: 1967 (dg) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                                        SEALED INDICTMENT filed as to Gilbert Gil N Michaels (1) count(s) 1, 2-25, 26-28, 29-30, Jerry P Feldman (2) count(s) 1, 2-25, Anjanette S Lester (3) count(s) 1, 2-4, Glen K Katayama (4) count(s) 1, 5-6, Tiffany M Ostrander (5) count(s) 1, 7-8, Sean S Moustakas (6) count(s) 1, 7-8, James R Milheiser (7) count(s) 1, 9, Thomas A Sanetti (8) count(s) 1, 9-10, Cynthia A Weekes (9) count(s) 1, 11, Michael B Weekes (10) count(s) 1, 11, Daniel C.J. Ellis (11) count(s) 1, 12-13, Leah D Johnson (12) count(s) 1, 14, John A Buzzard (13) count(s) 1, 14, Jonathan M Brightman (14) count(s) 1, 15-16, Stephen D Paine (15) count(s) 1, 17, Sharon Scandaliato Virag (16) count(s) 1, 18, Glen M Diamond III (17) count(s) 1, 19, Tammi L Williams (18) count(s) 1, 19, Christina M Cadena (19) count(s) 1, 20-21, Michelle C Nunez (20) count(s) 1, 20-21, Francis Frank S Scimeca (21) count(s) 1, 22-23, Cynda L Hill (22) count(s) 1, 24-25, Henry L Hill II (23) count(s) 24-25. (dg) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/3/2016) (dg). (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 4,448 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?