Henry v. Anchorage et al
Federal Court Proceeding Alaska District Court, Case No. 3:16-mc-00019
District Judge Timothy M. Burgess, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2017 at 11:54 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony Henry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dillon & Findley, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Molly C. Brown +1 907 277 5400 +1 907 277 9896 molly@dillonfindley.com
v.
No Logo Mark Mew, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori B. Alexander +1 203 234 6344 +1 203 234 6345 lalexander@littler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Testa +1 203 974 8717 +1 203 654 7267 ptesta@littler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Halloran +1 907 561 1214 +1 907 561 1215 shalloran@littler.com
No Logo Municipality of Anchorage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori B. Alexander +1 203 234 6344 +1 203 234 6345 lalexander@littler.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Halloran +1 907 561 1214 +1 907 561 1215 shalloran@littler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Testa +1 203 974 8717 +1 203 654 7267 ptesta@littler.com
No Logo Police Department Anchorage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori B. Alexander +1 203 234 6344 +1 203 234 6345 lalexander@littler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Testa +1 203 974 8717 +1 203 654 7267 ptesta@littler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Halloran +1 907 561 1214 +1 907 561 1215 shalloran@littler.com
No Logo Daigle Law Group, LLC, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daigle Law Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P. Daigle
No Logo Eric Daigle, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daigle Law Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P. Daigle
No Logo Police Performance Consulting, LLC, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daigle Law Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P. Daigle
Citation motquash
Nature of Suit 990 - Other
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:16-mc-00043. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/28/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 5 Motion to Transfer. The Clerk is directed to transfer the pending 1 Motion to Quash to the District of Alaska for consideration and resolution in connection with the underlying litigation, Henry v. Municipality of Anchorage, et al., No. 15-cv-187-RRB. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/18/2016. (Shin, D.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 05/18/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting unopposed 12 Motion to Intervene; granting unopposed 13 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/17/2016. (Shin, D.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 05/17/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Halloran on behalf of Municipality of Anchorage, Police Department Anchorage, Mark Mew (Halloran, Sean) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 04/20/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
          ORDER granting 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sean Halloran.. Signed by Clerk on 4/20/2016. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 04/20/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
            MOTION for Attorney(s) Sean Halloran to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3970205) by Municipality of Anchorage, Police Department Anchorage, Mark Mew. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sean Halloran and Certificates of Good Standing)(Testa, Paul) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 04/19/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Testa on behalf of Municipality of Anchorage, Police Department Anchorage, Mark Mew (Testa, Paul) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 21 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/12/2016. (Shin, D.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
                  Sealed Document: Exhibit N and Exhibit O by Anthony Henry re 20 Reply to Response to Motion, 21 MOTION to Seal Exhibits N and O to Pl's Reply to Defs' Opp to Mot to Transfer . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, # 2 Exhibit O)(Brown, Molly) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Seal Exhibits N and O to Pl's Reply to Defs' Opp to Mot to Transfer by Anthony Henry. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Molly) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
                      REPLY to Response to 1 MOTION to Quash Pl's Reply to Defs' Opp to Mot to Tranfer at Dkt. 18 filed by Anthony Henry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L, # 5 Exhibit M, # 6 Exhibit N, # 7 Exhibit O)(Brown, Molly) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 15 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/29/2016. (Shin, D.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE re 5 Response, (Opposition to Motion to Transfer) filed by Municipality of Anchorage, Police Department Anchorage, Mark Mew. (Alexander, Lori) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
                            Sealed Document: Reply to Opposition to Motion to Quash by Municipality of Anchorage, Police Department Anchorage, Mark Mew re 1 MOTION to Quash . (Alexander, Lori) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
                              REPLY to Response to 1 MOTION to Quash filed by Municipality of Anchorage, Police Department Anchorage, Mark Mew. (Alexander, Lori) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Seal Exhibits 11, 12 and 13 to defendants' Reply to Opposition to Motion to Quash by Municipality of Anchorage, Police Department Anchorage, Mark Mew. (Alexander, Lori) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Daigle on behalf of Eric Daigle, Daigle Law Group, LLC, Police Performance Consulting, LLC (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Joinder re 1 MOTION to Quash filed by Mark Mew, Police Department Anchorage, Municipality of Anchorage by Eric Daigle, Daigle Law Group, LLC, Police Performance Consulting, LLC. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Intervene by Eric Daigle, Daigle Law Group, LLC, Police Performance Consulting, LLC.Responses due by 4/7/2016 (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Anthony Henry re 5 Response, of Filing Amended Affidavit (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Amended Affidavit of Molly C. Brown)(Brown, Molly) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by Anthony Henry re 5 Response, 8 Exhibit of Filing Amended Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Errata Amended Certificate of Service)(Brown, Molly) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 6 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/15/2016. (Shin, D.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                              EXHIBIT Affidavit of Molly C. Brown by Anthony Henry re 6 MOTION to Seal Confidential Exhibits and Text to Opposition to Motion to Quash and Motion to Transfer. (Brown, Molly) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                Sealed Document: Confidential Text and Exhibits to Opposition to Motion to Quash and Motion to Transfer by Anthony Henry re 6 MOTION to Seal Confidential Exhibits and Text to Opposition to Motion to Quash and Motion to Transfer, 5 Response, to Motion to Quash and Motion to Transfer - REDACTED. (Attachments: # 1 Confidential Portions of Opposition to Motion to Quash and Motion to Transfer, # 2 Exhibit B (Confidential), # 3 Exhibit C (Confidential), # 4 Exhibit D (Confidential), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Molly) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Seal Confidential Exhibits and Text to Opposition to Motion to Quash and Motion to Transfer by Anthony Henry. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Molly) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE to Motion to Quash and Motion to Transfer - REDACTED and MOTION for Transfer Under Federal Civil Rule 45(f) filed by Anthony Henry. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Molly C. Brown, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Molly) Modified on 5/17/2016 to change to motion event/relief.(Perez, J.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/4/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Counsel shall call 888-808-6929 and enter the code 9284309. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/3/2016. (Shin, D.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/29/2016.(Caffrey, A.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Lori B. Alexander on behalf of Municipality of Anchorage, Police Department Anchorage, Mark Mew (Caffrey, A.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Quash by Municipality of Anchorage, Police Department Anchorage, Mark Mew.Responses due by 3/21/2016 (Caffrey, A.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/28/2016.] (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?