Karen Bacharach v. Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 15-31009

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 4:20 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503575544 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None
JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [15-31009] (DTG)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503575456 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [15-31009 Affirmed ] Judge: TMR , Judge: JES , Judge: CH Mandate pull date is 07/21/2016 [15-31009] (DTG)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503543292 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
      APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Ms. Karen Bacharach. # of Copies Provided: 0. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/15/2016, for Appellant Karen Bacharach. [15-31009] (DLJ)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503543237 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        COURT ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that appellant's motion for leave to file her reply brief out of time is GRANTED (IN DETAIL) [8213467-2]. Judge(s): CH. [15-31009] (DLJ)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503525738 Filed: 5/30/2016, Entered: None
          DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Amended Motion to File Reply Brief Out of Time received from Appellant Ms. Karen Bacharach because counsel re-filed the motion rather than e-mailing the revised motion to the court as instructed. The revised motion has been uploaded to the original filing replacing the originally filed motion and will be processed accordingly [15-31009] (AGL)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503523987 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
            MOTION for leave to file reply brief out of time [8213467-2] - Brief Tendered? Yes. Date of service: 05/26/2016 [15-31009]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Karen Bacharach for leave to file brief out of time [8213467-2] - Brief Tendered? Yes, for leave to file brief instanter [8213467-3]. Date of service: 05/26/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Breeden, Koerner; Attorney for Appellees: Rider, Szygenda [15-31009] (Louis Roy Koerner Jr.)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503518557 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
              CLERK ORDER denying motion to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellant Ms. Karen Bacharach [8208348-2] [15-31009] (AGL)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503515534 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                MOTION to extend time to file reply brief until 05/27/2016 [8208348-2]. Date of service: 05/20/2016 [15-31009]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Ms. Karen Bacharach for filing REPLY BRIEF until 05/27/2016 at 12:00 am. [15-31009] (Louis Roy Koerner Jr.)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 96 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?