E.S. Bankest L.C.
Bankruptcy Case Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 05-M-08
District Judge A. Jay Cristol, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 11:00 PM EST (4.9 years ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Barry E Mukamal, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Allison R Day, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison R Day, +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Paul Steven Singerman, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Steven Singerman, Esq +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340
No Logo E.S. Bankest L.C., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Allison R Day, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison R Day, +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Paul Steven Singerman, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Steven Singerman, Esq +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the US Trustee"
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing by Paul Steven Singerman for Creditor Banco Espirito Santo International Ltd Re: [82-1] Motion For Protective Order by Banco Espirito Santo International Ltd Schd For 11:00 1/13/05 at Room 1410, Miami (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
    Certificate Of Service By Allison R Day for other professional Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Of [88-1] Order Granting [47-1] Motion To Approve Settlement and Compromise With (i) Performance Team Inc and (ii) Gale Triangle Inc, [89-1] Order Granting [37-1] Motion for Approval of Settlement & Compromise W/ Barry Mukamal, [91-1] Order Granting [49-1] Application To Employ Michael R O'Donnell, [86-1] Order Granting [56-1] Motion to Modify and Obtain a Short Extension of (I) the Exclusivity Period, [90-1] Order Granting [46-1] Motion To Approve Settlement and Compromise With K.W. Textiles, [87-1] Order Granting [30-1] Motion to Approve Settlement and Compromise With (i) Howard Cantor, (ii) Anthony Ronconi and (iii) Arnold Girnun . (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
      Order ( 12/22/04) Granting [49-1] Application To Employ Michael R O'Donnell, as Special Counsel, nunc pro tunc to August 9, 2004 by Lewis B Freeman. (SEE ORDER) (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
        Order ( 12/22/04) Granting [46-1] Motion To Approve Settlement and Compromise With K.W. Textiles by Lewis B Freeman (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
          Order ( 12/22/04) Granting [37-1] Motion for Approval of Settlement & Compromise W/ Barry Mukamal by Lewis B Freeman (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
            Order ( 12/22/04) Granting [47-1] Motion To Approve Settlement and Compromise With (i) Performance Team Inc and (ii) Gale Triangle Inc by Lewis B Freeman (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
              Order ( 12/22/04) Granting [30-1] Motion to Approve Settlement and Compromise With (i) Howard Cantor, (ii) Anthony Ronconi and (iii) Arnold Girnun by Lewis B Freeman (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
                Order (12/22/04) Granting [56-1] Motion to Modify and Obtain a Short Extension of (I) the Exclusivity Period to File and Amended Plan of Liquidation and Related Disclosure Stmt on Behalf of the Db and (II) the Time to Obtain Acceptances of the Plan by Lewis B Freeman and OverRuling [81-1] Objection by BDO Seidman LLP. Extension: Jan 6, 2005 (SEE ORDER) (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
                  Notice of Hearing by Kevin S Neiman for Creditor Euler Hermes ACI Re: [83-1] Motion For Relief From Stay To Allow Settlement of Claims by Euler Hermes ACI schd For 2:30 12/29/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 12/23/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
                    Notice of Hearing by Allison R Day for other professional Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Re: [77-3] Motion To Abate Pending Discovery by Lewis B Freeman, [77-2] Motion To Reconsider Order [69-1] Shortening Time For Receiver to Respond to Request for Production by Lewis B Freeman, [77-1] Motion For Protective Order by Lewis B Freeman schd For 2:30 12/22/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 12/23/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None
                      Emergency Motion By Creditor Euler Hermes ACI For Relief From Stay To Allow Settlement of Claims (Receipt # 250146 Amount: $ 150) (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
                        Motion By Creditor Banco Espirito Santo International Ltd For Protective Order . (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
                          Objection By Creditor BDO Seidman LLP To [56-1] Motion to Modify and Obtain a Short Extension of (I) the Exclusivity Period to File and Amended Plan of Liquidation and Related Disclosure Stmt on Behalf of the Db and (II) the Time to Obtain Acceptances of the Plan by Lewis B Freeman . (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                            Notice of Hearing by Allison R Day for other professional Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Re: [74-1] Motion to Strike Re: [32-1] Motion To Convert Case From Chapter 11 to 7 by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, [32-2] Motion To Appoint Ch 11 Trustee by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, [32-3] Motion To Appoint Examiner by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA by Lewis B Freeman schd For 11:00 1/13/05 at Room 1410, Miami (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                              Notice of Hearing by Paul Steven Singerman for Creditor Banco Espirito Santo International Ltd Re: [71-1] Motion to Strike Re: [32-1] Motion To Convert Case From Chapter 11 to 7 by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, [32-2] Motion To Appoint Ch 11 Trustee by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, [32-3] Motion To Appoint Examiner by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA by Banco Espirito Santo International Ltd SCHD For 11:00 1/13/05 at Room 1410, Miami (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                Certificate Of Service By Allison R Day for other professional Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Of [76-1] Order Gr 2nd Intermi Fee Aplc by Paul Steven Singerman Esq, Lewis B Freeman, Lewis B Freeman & Partners Inc, Allison R Day . (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                  Motion By other professional Lewis B Freeman For Protective Order , To Reconsider Order [69-1] Shortening Time For Receiver to Respond to Request for Production , To Abate Pending Discovery (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
                                    Order (12/16/04) Granting [64-1] Application For 2nd Interim Compensation ( Fees: $ 160,215.50, Expenses: $ 7,700.97) by Allison R Day Esq payment to Allison R. Day of $128172.40 in fees and $7700.97 in expenses Granting [67-1] Application For 2nd Interim Compensation ( Fees: $ 123,249.50, Expenses: $ 0) by Lewis B Freeman & Partners Inc payment to Lewis B Freeman & Partners Inc of $98599.60 in fees Granting [66-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 25,125.00, Expenses: $ 0) by Lewis B Freeman payment to Lewis B. Freeman of $11910.25 in fees Granting [61-1] Application For 2nd Interim Compensation ( Fees: $56,847.50, Expenses: $ 4,152.97) by Paul Steven Singerman payment to Paul S. Singerman of $45478.00 in fees and $4152.97 in expenses (Vazquez S cm) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
                                      Certificate Of Service By Scott Baena for Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA Of [69-1] Order Gr Mtn To Shorten Time. (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                        Motion by Interested Party Lewis B Freeman to Strike Re: [32-1] Motion To Convert Case From Chapter 11 to 7 by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, [32-2] Motion To Appoint Ch 11 Trustee by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, [32-3] Motion To Appoint Examiner by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                          Joinder by: Creditor BDO Seidman LLP in re: Motion To Convert Case From Chapter 11 to 7 [32-1] by Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, Motion To Appoint Ch 11 Trustee [32-2] by Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, Motion To Appoint Examiner [32-3] by Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                            Response In Opposition By: Creditor Banco Espirito Santo International Ltd Re: [51-1] Motion For Entry Of A Case Management Order and Request For Expedited Hearing by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                              Motion by Creditor Banco Espirito Santo International Ltd to Strike Re: [32-1] Motion To Convert Case From Chapter 11 to 7 by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, [32-2] Motion To Appoint Ch 11 Trustee by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, [32-3] Motion To Appoint Examiner by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                Re-Notice of Hearing by Gregory M Garno for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Re: [37-1] Motion for Approval of Settlement & Compromise W/ Barry Mukamal by Lewis B Freeman, [30-1] Motion to Approve Settlement and Compromise With (i) Howard Cantor, (ii) Anthony Ronconi and (iii) Arnold Girnun by Lewis B Freeman, [51-1] Motion For Entry Of A Case Management Order and Request For Expedited Hearing by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA Schd For 2:30 12/22/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                  Order (12/10/04) Granting [59-1] Ex Parte Motion To Shorten Time for the Receiver to Respond to Request for Production of Documents by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA. Shortened to December 23, 2004 unless the Recevr obj to this Order and req immediate hrg. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Filing By Gregory M Garno for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Re: [67-1] Application For 2nd Interim Compensation ( Fees: $ 123,249.50, Expenses: $ 0) by Lewis B Freeman & Partners Inc, [66-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 25,125.00, Expenses: $ 0) by Lewis B Freeman (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                      Application By accountant Lewis B Freeman & Partners Inc For 2nd Interim Compensation ( Fees: $ 123,249.50, Expenses: $ 0) dates of svcs: 10/01/04 - 11/30/04. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                        Application By Interested Party Lewis B Freeman For Compensation ( Fees: $ 25,125.00, Expenses: $ 0) dates of svcs: 9/16/04 - 11/30/04. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                          Notice of Filing By Allison R Day for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Re: [64-1] Application For 2nd Interim Compensation ( Fees: $ 160,215.50, Expenses: $ 7,700.97) by Allison R Day Esq (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                            Application By Allison R Day for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman and Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. For 2nd Interim Compensation ( Fees: $ 160,215.50, Expenses: $ 7,700.97) dates of svcs: 10/01/04 - 11/30/04. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                              Certificate Of Service By Allison R Day for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Of [57-1] Order Continuing Hearing On:( [5-1] Motion (1) For Authority To Use Cash Collateral, [5-2] Motion (2) Obtaing Further Financiang, [5-3] Motion (3) Granting Security Interest, [5-4] Motion (4) According Priority Status Miami, [5-5] Motion (5) For Adequate Protection, [5-6] Motion (6)Consenting to Modication of Relief From Stay by E.S. Bankest L.C., Lewis Freeman Hearing reset to 2:30 12/22/04 at Room 1410, Miami ), [57-2] Order . (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                Notice of Hearing by special counsel Paul Steven Singerman Re: [61-1] Application For 2nd Interim Compensation ( Fees: $56,847.50, Expenses: $ 4,152.97) by Paul Steven Singerman Schd For 2:00 12/16/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  Summary Application By special counsel Paul Steven Singerman For 2nd Interim Compensation ( Fees: $56,847.50, Expenses: $ 4,152.97) dates of svcs: 10/01/04 - 11/30/04. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    Objections By Creditor Espirito Santo Bank of Florida To [45-1] Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination (Duces Tecum) of Espirito Santo Bank of Florida on 12/03/04 @ 10am by Creditor BDO Seidman LLP (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      Ex Parte Motion By Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA To Shorten Time for the Receiver to Respond to Request for Production of Documents . (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/10/2004)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        Notice of Hearing by Gregory M Garno for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Re: [56-1] Motion to Modify and Obtain a Short Extension of (I) the Exclusivity Period to File and Amended Plan of Liquidation and Related Disclosure Stmt on Behalf of the Db and (II) the Time to Obtain Acceptances of the Plan by Lewis B Freeman Schd For 2:30 12/22/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/10/2004)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          Order (12/09/04), Continuing Hearing On:( [5-1] Motion (1) For Authority To Use Cash Collateral, [5-2] Motion (2) Obtaing Further Financiang, [5-3] Motion (3) Granting Security Interest, [5-4] Motion (4) According Priority Status Miami, [5-5] Motion (5) For Adequate Protection, [5-6] Motion (6)Consenting to Modication of Relief From Stay by E.S. Bankest L.C., Lewis Freeman Hearing reset to 2:30 12/22/04 at Room 1410, Miami ) (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/10/2004)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            Motion By Interested Party Lewis B Freeman to Modify and Obtain a Short Extension of (I) the Exclusivity Period to File and Amended Plan of Liquidation and Related Disclosure Stmt on Behalf of the Db and (II) the Time to Obtain Acceptances of the Plan . (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                              Certificate Of Service By Scott Baena for Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA Of [52-1] Order Continuing Hrg On:( [32-1] Motion To Convert Case From Chapter 11 to 7, [32-2] Motion To Appoint Ch 11 Trustee and [32-3] Motion To Appoint Examiner by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA Hearing reset to 10:00 1/20/05 at Room 1410, Miami ), [52-2] Order . (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Hearing by Scott Baena for Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA Re: [51-1] Motion For Entry Of A Case Management Order and Request For Expedited Hearing by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA Schd For 2:00 12/15/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Hearing by Gregory M Garno for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Re: [49-1] Application To Employ Michael R O'Donnell, as Special Counsel, nunc pro tunc to August 9, 2004 by Lewis B Freeman Schd For 2:30 12/22/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                    Order (12/01/04), Continuing Hrg On:( [32-1] Motion To Convert Case From Chapter 11 to 7, [32-2] Motion To Appoint Ch 11 Trustee and [32-3] Motion To Appoint Examiner by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA Hearing reset to 10:00 1/20/05 at Room 1410, Miami ) (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion by Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA For Entry Of A Case Management Order and Request For Expedited Hearing (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice of Filing By Kenneth B Robinson for Interested Party Creditors Committee Re: Notice of Unavailability December 15, 2004 - January 5, 2005. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          Application By Interested Party Lewis B Freeman To Employ Michael R O'Donnell, as Special Counsel, nunc pro tunc to August 9, 2004 . Affidavit Attached? Yes (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                            Notice of Hearing by Allison R Day for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Re: [47-1] Motion To Approve Settlement and Compromise With (i) Performance Team Inc and (ii) Gale Triangle Inc and [46-1] Motion To Approve Settlement and Compromise With Textiles by Lewis B Freeman Schd For 2:30 12/22/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Covington K cm) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                              Motion by Interested Party Lewis B Freeman To Approve Settlement and Compromise With (i) Performance Team Inc and (ii) Gale Triangle Inc (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                Motion by Interested Party Lewis B Freeman To Approve Settlement and Compromise With K.W. Textiles (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination (Duces Tecum) of Espirito Santo Bank of Florida on 12/03/04 @ 10am by Creditor BDO Seidman LLP (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Ex Parte Motion By Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA To Continue Hrg On:( [32-1] Motion To Convert Case From Chapter 11 to 7, [32-2] Motion To Appoint Ch 11 Trustee and [32-3] Motion To Appoint Examiner by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA ) . (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Notice Filed By Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA To Withdraw Document. Terminating [31-1] Motion Extending Deadline for Parties In Interest to Challenge the Extent, Validity and Priority of Liens Purportedly Held by Besil by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA . (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing by Scott Baena for Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA Re: [32-1] Motion To Convert Case From Chapter 11 to 7 by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, [32-2] Motion To Appoint Ch 11 Trustee by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA, [32-3] Motion To Appoint Examiner by Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA Schd For 2:00 12/15/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Certificate Of Service By Allison R Day for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Of [40-1] Order Granting Motion by Interested Party Lewis B Freeman in 04-10941 for Approval of Settlement and Compromise with Steven S Oscher, Chapter 7 Trustee for United Container LLC (cp#159), [40-2] Order . (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Order (11/17/04), Granting Motion by Interested Party Lewis B Freeman in 04-10941 for Approval of Settlement and Compromise with Steven S Oscher, Chapter 7 Trustee for United Container LLC (cp#159) (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing by Gregory M Garno for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Re: [37-1] Motion for Approval of Settlement & Compromise W/ Barry Mukamal by Lewis B Freeman Schd For 2:00 12/15/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing by Allison R Day for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Re: [30-1] Motion to Approve Settlement and Compromise With (i) Howard Cantor, (ii) Anthony Ronconi and (iii) Arnold Girnun by Lewis B Freeman Schd For 2:00 12/15/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Motion by Interested Party Lewis B Freeman for Approval of Settlement & Compromise W/ Barry Mukamal (Sanabria N cm) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing by John B Hutton for Creditor BDO Seidman LLP Re: [33-1] Motion To Extend Purported Lien Challenge Deadline Established at Hrg Dated Sept 22, 2004 by BDO Seidman LLP Schd For 4:00 11/17/04 at Room 1410, Miami (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Joint Joinder by: Interested Party Soneet R Kapila, Interested Party Creditors Committee in re: Motion To Extend Purported Lien Challenge Deadline Established at Hrg Dated Sept 22, 2004 [33-1] by Creditor BDO Seidman LLP and Motion Extending Deadline for Parties In Interest to Challenge the Extent, Validity and Priority of Liens Purportedly Held by Besil [31-1] by Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing By John B Hutton for Creditor BDO Seidman LLP Re: Declration of Karen Y Bitar In Support of [33-1] Motion To Extend Purported Lien Challenge Deadline Established at Hrg Dated Sept 22, 2004 by BDO Seidman LLP (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Motion By Creditor BDO Seidman LLP To Extend Purported Lien Challenge Deadline Established at Hrg Dated Sept 22, 2004 EXPEDITED HRG REQ. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Motion By Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA To Convert Case From Chapter 11 to 7 , To Appoint Ch 11 Trustee , To Appoint Examiner [Receipt #00248797, Amount: $15.00] (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Motion By Interested Party Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA Extending Deadline for Parties In Interest to Challenge the Extent, Validity and Priority of Liens Purportedly Held by Besil {Adv Proc #04-1444-AJC-A} . (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Motion by Interested Party Lewis B Freeman to Approve Settlement and Compromise With (i) Howard Cantor, (ii) Anthony Ronconi and (iii) Arnold Girnun (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Certificate Of Service By special counsel Paul Steven Singerman Of [24-1] Ntc of Filing by Paul Steven Singerman Re: Verified Statement of Frederic Bise on Behalf of Creditor Banco Espirito Santo Interntl Limited p/Bankruptcy Rule 2019. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Certificate Of Service By special counsel Paul Steven Singerman Of [25-1] Ntc of Filing by Paul Steven Singerman Re: Verified Statement of Steven W Thomas on Behalf of Sullivan & Cromwell LLP p/Bankruptcy Rule 2019.; [22-1] Verified Statement of Paul Steven Singerman on Behalf of Berger Singerman PA, as Special Litigation Counsel, p/Bankruptcy Rule 2019; [26-1] Ntc of Filing by Paul Steven Singerman Re: Supplemental Declaration of [25-1] Verified Statement of Steven W Thomas on Behalf of Sullivan & Cromwell LLP p/Bankruptcy Rule 2019; and [23-1] Supplemental Declaration By: special counsel Paul Steven Singerman To [22-1] Verified Statement of Paul Steven Singerman on Behalf of Berger Singerman PA. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing By special counsel Paul Steven Singerman Re: (1) Original Executed Supplemental Declaration of Steven W Thomas and (2) Original Executed Verified Statement of Steven W Thomas. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing By special counsel Paul Steven Singerman Re: Supplemental Declaration of [25-1] Verified Statement of Steven W Thomas on Behalf of Sullivan & Cromwell LLP p/Bankruptcy Rule 2019. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing By special counsel Paul Steven Singerman Re: Verified Statement of Steven W Thomas on Behalf of Sullivan & Cromwell LLP p/Bankruptcy Rule 2019. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing By special counsel Paul Steven Singerman Re: Verified Statement of Frederic Bise on Behalf of Creditor Banco Espirito Santo Interntl Limited p/Bankruptcy Rule 2019. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Declaration By: special counsel Paul Steven Singerman To [22-1] Verified Statement of Paul Steven Singerman on Behalf of Berger Singerman PA, as Special Litigation Counsel, p/Bankruptcy Rule 2019 . (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Verified Statement of Paul Steven Singerman on Behalf of Berger Singerman PA, as Special Litigation Counsel, p/Bankruptcy Rule 2019 . (Covington K cm) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Certificate Of Service By Allison R Day for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Of [20-1] Order For First Interim Compensation Fees: $61142.80, Expenses: $ 5129.99 payment to Paul J. Battista of $61142.80 in fees and $5129.99 in expenses by Lewis B Freeman, Randolph Kroner, Paul J Battista Esq, [20-2] Order For Compensation Fees: $65621.52, payment to Randolph Kroner of $65621.52 in fees by Lewis B Freeman, Randolph Kroner, Paul J Battista Esq, [20-3] Order For Compensation Fees: $1674.55 payment to Lewis B. Freeman of $1674.55 in fees by Lewis B Freeman, Randolph Kroner, Paul J Battista Esq, [20-4] Order by Lewis B Freeman, Randolph Kroner, Paul J Battista Esq . (Gutierrez S cm) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Order (AJC 10/22/04) For First Interim Compensation Fees: $61142.80, Expenses: $ 5129.99 payment to Paul J. Battista of $61142.80 in fees and $5129.99 in expenses , For Compensation Fees: $65621.52, payment to Randolph Kroner of $65621.52 in fees , For Compensation Fees: $1674.55 payment to Lewis B. Freeman of $1674.55 in fees . (Gutierrez S cm) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Order (AJC 10/21/04) Granting Motion To Extend Time To Assume or Reject Unexpired Leases or Real Property . The Receiver shall have up to the time of the hearing on confirmation of the Debtor's Plan of Liquidation to assume or reject its leases of nonresidential real property. (Gutierrez S cm) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Order (AJC 10/21/04) Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Lewis B Freeman & Partners Inc as Accountants to the Estate of ES Bankest LC . (Gutierrez S cm) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Order (AJC 10/21/04) Deconsolidating Case. (COPY) The original order is located in 04-10941-BKC-AJC) (Gutierrez S cm) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing of First Meeting of Creditors Schd for 2:00 9/23/04 at 51 SW 1 Ave, Room 1021 Last Day to File Proofs of Claim: 12/22/04. (Gutierrez S cm) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing on at least 16 Days Notice By: Allison R Day for Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. Re: [5-1] Motion (1) For Authority To Use Cash Collateral by E.S. Bankest L.C., Lewis B Freeman, [5-2] Motion (2) Obtaing Further Financiang by E.S. Bankest L.C., Lewis B Freeman, [5-3] Motion (3) Granting Security Interest by E.S. Bankest L.C., Lewis B Freeman, [5-4] Motion (4) According Priority Status by E.S. Bankest L.C., Lewis B Freeman, [5-5] Motion (5) For Adequate Protection by E.S. Bankest L.C., Lewis B Freeman, [5-6] Motion (6)Consenting to Modication of Relief From Stay by E.S. Bankest L.C., Lewis B Freeman, [7-1] Motion to Fix Bar Date for Filing Applca Seeking Administ. Exp and to Designate Form and Manner of Notice of Bar Date by E.S. Bankest L.C., Lewis B Freeman, [6-1] Motion for an Administrative Order and Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals by E.S. Bankest L.C., Lewis B Freeman, [9-1] Application To Employ Allison R Day and Genovese Joblove & Battista PA by Lewis B Freeman, [8-1] Motion To Employ Lewis B Freeman & Partners Inc as Forensic Accountants and Consultants to the Receiver, [11-1] Application To Employ Sullivan & Cromwell LLP and Steven W Thomas, as Special Litigation Counsel by Lewis B Freeman, [10-1] Application To Employ Berger Singerman PA and Paul S Singerman, as Special Litigation Counsel by Lewis B Freeman - Responsive Papers Required to be filed with the court on or before 8/26/04 Hrg is Scheduled For 2:30 8/31/04 At Room 1410, Miami (misdocketed belonging to 04-10941) (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Order (AJC 8/11/04) Granting [12-1] Application For Joint Administration of 04-17602-AJC Under 04-10941-BKC-AJC by E.S. Bankest L.C. (Gutierrez S cm) (Entered: 08/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Deficiency for Incomplete Filings and Certificate of Mailing. Missing document: -List of Equity Security Holders Due: 8/24/04. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency Application Filed By Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. For Joint Administration of 04-10941-AJC and 04-17602-AJC (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Application By Interested Party Lewis B Freeman To Employ Sullivan & Cromwell LLP and Steven W Thomas, as Special Litigation Counsel . Affidavit Attached? Yes (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Application By Lewis B Freeman, Receiver To Employ Berger Singerman PA and Paul S Singerman, as Special Litigation Counsel . Affidavit Attached? Yes (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Application By Lewis B Freeman, Receiver To Employ Allison R Day and Genovese Joblove & Battista PA . Affidavit Attached? Yes (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Motion By To Employ Lewis B Freeman as Forensic Accountants and Consultants to the Receiver Affidavit attached? Yes (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Motion by Lewis B Freeman, Receiver and Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. to Fix Bar Date for Filing Applca Seeking Administ. Exp and to Designate Form and Manner of Notice of Bar Date (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Motion by Lewis B Freeman, Receiver and Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. for an Administrative Order and Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion By Interested Party Lewis B Freeman, Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. (1) For Authority To Use Cash Collateral , (2) Obtaing Further Financiang , (3) Granting Security Interest , (4) According Priority Status , (5) For Adequate Protection , (6)Consenting to Modication of Relief From Stay HEARING REQUESTED ON AT LEAST 16 DAYS' NOTICE. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Disclosure Statement By Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. (expandable folder) (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Combined Chapter 11 Plan Of Reorganization Filed By Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Ownership Statement by Debtor E.S. Bankest L.C. (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Voluntary Petition Filed Under Chapter 11 . Complete Schedules Filed? No. (Receipt # 00245236 Amount: $ 839) . (Covington K cm) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?