Patricia Arellano v. Clark County Collection Serv., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-15467

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 19, 2017 at 12:11 AM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed clerk order: The letter brief [45] submitted by Patricia Arellano is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: not applicable. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10543566] (SML) [Entered: 08/14/2017 02:19 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Submitted (ECF) Letter Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Patricia Arellano. Date of service: 08/14/2017. [10542933] [16-15467] --[COURT UPDATE: Backdated entry to reflect correct filing date. 8/14/2017 by TYL] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 08/14/2017 10:45 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [43] submitted by Clark County Collection Service, LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10542277] (SML) [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:57 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Clark County Collection Service, LLC. Date of service: 08/11/2017. [10542212] [16-15467] (Reilly, Patrick) [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:28 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, STEPHEN REINHARDT and EDWARD R. KORMAN) Within 14 (fourteen) days from the date of this order, the parties shall file simultaneous supplemental briefs addressing whether a private party’s use of a procedure permitted under state law is subject to federal preemption in the same way that state common law or statutory claims may be. The parties should address both binding and persuasive relevant case law as well as federalism and preemption principles. The briefs shall not exceed 2,800 words and may be in the form of letters to the clerk of this court. [10525665] (OC) [Entered: 07/28/2017 01:50 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Filed (ECF) Appellant Patricia Arellano citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/27/2017. [10523975] [16-15467] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 07/27/2017 01:40 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filed (ECF) Appellees Clark County Collection Service, LLC and Borg Law Group, LLC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/27/2017. [10523391] [16-15467] (Reilly, Patrick) [Entered: 07/27/2017 10:11 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/[10461382] (JN) [Entered: 06/06/2017 11:17 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick J. Reilly for Appellees Borg Law Group, LLC and Clark County Collection Service, LLC. [10384536] [16-15467] (Reilly, Patrick) [Entered: 04/05/2017 11:57 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Deepak Gupta for Appellant Patricia Arellano. [10384307] [16-15467] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 04/05/2017 10:37 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Filed (ECF) Appellees Clark County Collection Service, LLC and Borg Law Group, LLC Correspondence: regarding availability for oral argument. Date of service: 03/01/2017 [10338839] [16-15467] (Reilly, Patrick) [Entered: 03/01/2017 02:40 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Filed (ECF) Appellees Borg Law Group, LLC and Clark County Collection Service, LLC Correspondence: regarding availability for oral argument. Date of service: 01/27/2017 [10288925] [16-15467] (Reilly, Patrick) [Entered: 01/27/2017 04:53 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Filed clerk order: The reply brief [27] submitted by Patricia Arellano is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10239122] (SML) [Entered: 12/19/2016 04:12 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Patricia Arellano. Date of service: 12/19/2016. [10239096] [16-15467] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 12/19/2016 04:04 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellant’s unopposed motion [25] for a second extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief is due December 19, 2016. [10223511] (LBS) [Entered: 12/07/2016 11:11 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Patricia Arellano Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 12/19/2016. Date of service: 12/06/2016. [10221807] [16-15467] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 12/06/2016 11:28 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellant’s unopposed motion [21] for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief is due December 12, 2016. [10166349] (LBS) [Entered: 10/19/2016 03:52 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Patricia Arellano Unopposed Motion to extend time to file a reply until 12/12/2016. Date of service: 10/18/2016. [10164029] [16-15467] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 10/18/2016 02:23 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Filed clerk order: The answering brief [18] submitted by Borg Law Group, LLC and Clark County Collection Service, LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [19] submitted by Borg Law Group, LLC and Clark County Collection Service, LLC. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10159969] (SML) [Entered: 10/14/2016 12:46 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees Borg Law Group, LLC and Clark County Collection Service, LLC. Date of service: 10/13/2016. [10159004] [16-15467] (Reilly, Patrick) [Entered: 10/13/2016 04:46 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Borg Law Group, LLC and Clark County Collection Service, LLC. Date of service: 10/13/2016. [10158963] [16-15467] (Reilly, Patrick) [Entered: 10/13/2016 04:34 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellees’ late unopposed motion [16] for a second extension of time to file answering brief is granted. The answering brief is due October 13, 2016. and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10137115] (LBS) [Entered: 09/26/2016 02:31 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Clark County Collection Service, LLC Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 10/13/2016. Date of service: 09/23/2016. [10135483] [16-15467] (Reilly, Patrick) [Entered: 09/23/2016 04:00 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Filed clerk order: The opening brief [9] submitted by Patricia Arellano is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [10] submitted by Patricia Arellano. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10070314] (SML) [Entered: 08/01/2016 10:26 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Patricia Arellano. Date of service: 07/29/2016. [10069589] [16-15467] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 07/29/2016 04:08 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Patricia Arellano. Date of service: 07/29/2016. [10069581] [16-15467] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 07/29/2016 04:06 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Deepak Gupta for Appellant Patricia Arellano. Date of service: 05/09/2016. [9968658] [16-15467] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 05/09/2016 09:36 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                        Filed Mediation order: This case is not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [9956691] (VS) [Entered: 04/28/2016 11:55 AM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                          MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 04/28/2016, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [9931077] (VS) [Entered: 04/07/2016 10:36 AM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Patricia Arellano Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/23/2016. [9911915] [16-15467] (Gesund, Keren) [Entered: 03/23/2016 08:28 AM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                              DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/28/2016. Transcript ordered by 04/20/2016. Transcript due 05/20/2016. Appellant Patricia Arellano opening brief due 06/29/2016. Appellees Borg Law Group, LLC and Clark County Collection Service, LLC answering brief due 07/29/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9908268] (IV) [Entered: 03/21/2016 08:40 AM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 414 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?