United States of America v. Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-03777-LB
Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Facebook, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 24, 2019 article Reality Check: Facebook, Inc..

Last Updated November 27, 2018 at 12:10 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Talburt Matchison +1 202 307 6531 +1 202 307 0054 amy.t.matchison@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Edward Weaver +1 202 305 4929 +1 202 307 0054 James.E.Weaver@usdoj.gov
v.
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Respondent
Officially listed as "Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries"

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott H. Frewing +1 650 856 2400 +1 650 856 9299 scott.frewing@bakermckenzie.com
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Office San Francisco
Filed 7/6/2016
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Cause Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402 IRS
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County San Mateo
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
316-cv-05884-LB
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CONSENT,RELATE
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 89 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Clerks Notice
CLERK'S NOTICE. The parties state that they have resolved all remaining disputes, that no further relief is sought from the court, and that the case can be closed. Accordingly, the court vacates the 11/29/2018 case-management conference and closes the case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Status report
    STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by United States of America. (Weaver, James) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 87 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Clerks Notice
      CLERK'S NOTICE. Per the parties' request, the court continues the 9/27/2018 case-management conference to 11/29/2018 at 11:00 a.m. The court directs the parties to submit a further status update on or before 11/20/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Status report
        STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by United States of America. (Weaver, James) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 85 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting [84] Stipulation.Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018, Terminated: 7/26/2018 stipulation
            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and Proposed Seventh Amendment to Case Management Order) filed by United States of America. (Weaver, James) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
              Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting [82] Stipulation and Sixth Amendment to Case Management Order. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 7/5/2018 is reset to 8/2/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018, Terminated: 6/25/2018 stipulation
                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and Proposed Sixth Amendment to Case Management Order) filed by United States of America. (Weaver, James) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 81 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER. The parties have resolved their disputes regarding the three documents that remained outstanding from the court's in-camera review and order. See ECF Nos. 78, 80. If the parties have further disputes regarding privilege or work-product claims for additional documents, they should meet and confer in good faith and in accordance with the court's standing order, ECF No. 71-1. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on June 4, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 80 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 statement
                    Statement (Supplemental Submission) by United States of America. (Weaver, James) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
                      LREF
                      Blank 79 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER re [78] Statement, filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries.The court is in receipt of Facebook's supplemental submission. ECF No. 78. The parties previously stipulated that, at the court's request, the United States will be given an opportunity to provide any further information it may wish to submit regarding the document or documents for which Facebook supplied additional information. ECF No. 73 at 4. (Because Facebook has withdrawn its privilege claim over Summons 1, Tab 16, the only outstanding documents are Summons 1, Tabs 125 and 271.) The court directs the parties to confer to see if they can agree on how Tabs 125 and 271 should be handled (if they have not done so already). If they do not agree, the United States may file a supplemental submission regarding Tabs 125 and 271, not to exceed five double-spaced pages (not including exhibits), within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on May 16, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 statement
                        Statement re [76] Order,,, Submission Pursuant to Courts Order Adjudicating Privilege Disputes by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Ted Price Supporting Submission Pursuant to Courts Order)(Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                        LREF
                        Blank 77 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Clerks Notice
                        CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: For the court's own scheduling reasons, the court continues the initial CMC to 7/5/2018 at 11:00 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 76 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER re [55] MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons (UNITED STATES' BRIEF REGARDING PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS STILL IN DISPUTE) filed by United States of America. As set forth in the attached order, the court accepts Facebook's claims of attorney-client privilege, tax-practitioner privilege, and/or work-product protection for 12 of the 15 documents that Facebook submitted in camera. For the remaining three documents, Facebook may (but is not required to) provide the court with additional information within 14 days of this order. If Facebook provides additional information, the court will determine what next steps are appropriate, including any potential government response. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on April 30, 2018. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 75 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                            Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting [74] Stipulation and Fifth Amendment to Case Management Order. Initial Case Management Conference is reset from 5/3/2018 to 5/31/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 74 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018, Terminated: 4/25/2018 stipulation
                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and Proposed Fifth Amendment to Case Management Order) filed by United States of America. (Weaver, James) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 73 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 stipulation
                                STIPULATION re [71] Order on Motion to Enforce IRS Summons,,, Stipulation Regarding Procedure Involving Ex Parte Submissions Related to Privilege Dispute filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  terminate hearings
                                  Based on the parties' stipulation, ECF No. [73], the court cancels the hearing set for April 5. The court is continuing its review of the documents Facebook submitted in camera and will reach out to the parties regarding a process for submitting any additional information as needed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  terminate hearings
                                    Based on the parties' stipulation, ECF No. [73], the court cancels the hearing set for April 5. The court is continuing its review of the documents Facebook submitted in camera and will reach out to the parties regarding a process for submitting any additional information as needed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 72 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Notice - other
                                      NOTICE by United States of America re [71] Order on Motion to Enforce IRS Summons,,, (United States' List of Selected Documents For In Camera Review) (Weaver, James) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 71 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Order on Motion to Enforce IRS SummonsCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part [55] Motion to Enforce IRS Summons. As set forth in the attached order, the government's request is granted in part. The government may select a sample of up to fifteen documents for Facebook to submit for an in camera review. The court continues the hearing currently set for March 29 to April 5, 2018 at 9:30 a.m.The parties have raised the issue of Facebook submitting additional evidence and arguments supporting its claims of privilege and whether those submissions should be ex parte. The court directs the parties to meet and confer. If they are unable to resolve their differences, they should submit a joint letter brief in accordance with the court's standing order by April 3, 2018. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 70 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                        NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Scott H. Frewing (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Declaration in Support
                                          Declaration of Leland Wong in Support of [68] Reply to Opposition/Response, (Second Wong Declaration) filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 47, # (2) Exhibit 48, # (3) Exhibit 49A, # (4) Exhibit 49B, # (5) Exhibit 50, # (6) Exhibit 51, # (7) Exhibit 52, # (8) Exhibit 53)(Related document(s)[68]) (Weaver, James) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                          REPLY (re [55] MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons (UNITED STATES' BRIEF REGARDING PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS STILL IN DISPUTE) ) filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix (Reply Appendix 1), # (2) Appendix (Reply Appendix 2), # (3) Appendix (Reply Appendix 3))(Weaver, James) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Declaration in Support
                                          Declaration of Joseph Myszka in Support of [63] Declaration in Support, [60] Opposition/Response to Motion, [62] Declaration in Support, [66] Declaration in Support, [65] Declaration in Support, [61] Declaration in Support, [64] Declaration in Support, Regarding Privileged Documents Still in Dispute filed byFacebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Related document(s)[63], [60], [62], [66], [65], [61], [64]) (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Declaration in Support
                                            Declaration of Gary Sprague in Support of [63] Declaration in Support, [60] Opposition/Response to Motion, [62] Declaration in Support, [65] Declaration in Support, [61] Declaration in Support, [64] Declaration in Support, Regarding Privileged Documents Still in Dispute filed byFacebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 1)(Related document(s)[63], [60], [62], [65], [61], [64]) (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Declaration in Support
                                              Declaration of Frederick Chilton in Support of [63] Declaration in Support, [60] Opposition/Response to Motion, [62] Declaration in Support, [61] Declaration in Support, [64] Declaration in Support, Regarding Privileged Documents Still in Dispute filed byFacebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Related document(s)[63], [60], [62], [61], [64]) (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                Declaration of Joseph Sullivan in Support of [63] Declaration in Support, [60] Opposition/Response to Motion, [62] Declaration in Support, [61] Declaration in Support, Regarding Privileged Documents Still in Dispute filed byFacebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Related document(s)[63], [60], [62], [61]) (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                  Declaration of David Kling in Support of [60] Opposition/Response to Motion, [62] Declaration in Support, [61] Declaration in Support, Regarding Privileged Documents Still in Dispute filed byFacebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Related document(s)[60], [62], [61]) (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                    Declaration of Jue Lin in Support of [60] Opposition/Response to Motion, [61] Declaration in Support, Regarding Privileged Documents Still in Dispute filed byFacebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Related document(s)[60], [61]) (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                      Declaration of Ted Price in Support of [60] Opposition/Response to Motion, Regarding Privileged Documents Still in Dispute filed byFacebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 1)(Related document(s)[60]) (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [55] MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons (UNITED STATES' BRIEF REGARDING PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS STILL IN DISPUTE) ) To United States' Brief Regarding Privileged Documents Still In Dispute filed byFacebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A, # (2) Appendix A-1, # (3) Appendix B, # (4) Appendix C, # (5) Appendix D, # (6) Appendix E)(Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Frewing Notice of Appearance of Counsel Victoria Kovanis (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Frewing Notice of Appearance of Counsel - Joseph A. Myszka (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Given the pending motion to dismiss, the court resets the Initial Case Management Conference to 5/3/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re [55] MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons (UNITED STATES' BRIEF REGARDING PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS STILL IN DISPUTE) Declaration of Leland Wong filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9A, # (10) Exhibit 9B, # (11) Exhibit 9C, # (12) Exhibit 10A, # (13) Exhibit 10B, # (14) Exhibit 11A, # (15) Exhibit 11B, # (16) Exhibit 12B, # (17) Exhibit 12C, # (18) Exhibit 12D, # (19) Exhibit 12E, # (20) Exhibit 12F, # (21) Exhibit 12G, # (22) Exhibit 12H, # (23) Exhibit 12I, # (24) Exhibit 12J, # (25) Exhibit 12K, # (26) Exhibit 12L, # (27) Exhibit 13A, # (28) Exhibit 13B, # (29) Exhibit 14A, # (30) Exhibit 14B, # (31) Exhibit 15A, # (32) Exhibit 15B, # (33) Exhibit 15C, # (34) Exhibit 15D, # (35) Exhibit 15E, # (36) Exhibit 16, # (37) Exhibit 17, # (38) Exhibit 18, # (39) Exhibit 19, # (40) Exhibit 20, # (41) Exhibit 21, # (42) Exhibit 22, # (43) Exhibit 23, # (44) Exhibit 24, # (45) Exhibit 25A, # (46) Exhibit 25B, # (47) Exhibit 26, # (48) Exhibit 27A, # (49) Exhibit 27B, # (50) Exhibit 28, # (51) Exhibit 29, # (52) Exhibit 30, # (53) Exhibit 32, # (54) Exhibit 33, # (55) Exhibit 34, # (56) Exhibit 35A, # (57) Exhibit 35B, # (58) Exhibit 35C, # (59) Exhibit 35D, # (60) Exhibit 37A, # (61) Exhibit 37B, # (62) Exhibit 38, # (63) Exhibit 39, # (64) Exhibit 40, # (65) Exhibit 41, # (66) Exhibit 42, # (67) Exhibit 43, # (68) Exhibit 44A, # (69) Exhibit 44B, # (70) Exhibit 45, # (71) Exhibit 46A, # (72) Exhibit 46B)(Related document(s)[55]) (Weaver, James) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018, Terminated: 3/27/2018 Motion to Enforce IRS SummonsCourt Filing
                                                                MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons (UNITED STATES' BRIEF REGARDING PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS STILL IN DISPUTE) filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 2/22/2018. Replies due by 3/1/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A, # (2) Appendix B)(Weaver, James) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting [53] Stipulation and Fourth Amendment to Case Management Order. Deadline for Petitioner to file a Privilege Brief is extended to 02/08/2018. Response due by 03/02/2018. Reply due 03/13/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018, Terminated: 1/10/2018 stipulation
                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and Proposed Fourth Amendment to Case Management Order) filed by United States of America. (Weaver, James) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                    Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting [49] Administrative Motion Relating Case C17-6490 KAW. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                      Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting [50] Stipulation and Third Amendment to Case Management Order. Further Case Management Conference reset from 1/25/2018 to 3/29/2018, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017, Terminated: 11/9/2017 stipulation
                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and [Proposed] Third Amendment to Case Management Order) filed by United States of America. (Weaver, James) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017, Terminated: 11/16/2017 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                          ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. Responses due by 11/13/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related)(Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                            NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Scott H. Frewing (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Craig Hammill (Hammill, Robert) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/12/2017. The meet and confer deadline of 10/30/2017, is extended as needed by the parties to address privilege and other issues. Issued after court: Updated Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2018, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Another Further Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2018, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. These dates reflect the parties briefing schedule per docket [40].Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff's Attorneys: James Weaver and Amy Matchison. Defendant's Attorneys: Scott Frewing and Andrew Crousore. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/12/2017)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2018. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Terminate Hearings
                                                                                      Further Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.The court has a conflict on 10/19/2017 and thus advances the CMC one week to 10/12/2017 and directs the filing of an updated CMC statement by 10/5/2017. If the date is not convenient for counsel, they may stipulate to resetting the hearing.(This is a text-only entry. No document is attached.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 9/23/2017)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: 8/28/2017 Clerks Notice
                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                          Order granting [42] Request to Reschedule Case Management Conference. Status Conference reset for 10/19/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/26/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017, Terminated: 7/26/2017 stipulation
                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 4/30/2017, Entered: 4/30/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                              Order granting [40] Stipulation entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler.The court approves the parties' STIPULATED SECOND AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER dated April 28, 2017; the parties must comply with its provisions. All other terms of the Case Management Order dated November 16, 2016 will remain in effect. For now, the CMC set for August 17, 2016 remains calendared. The parties may move it by stipulation if things are proceeding on schedule. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017, Terminated: 4/30/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Second Amendment to Case Management Order filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Order signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting [38] STIPULATED AMENDMENT TO ORDER PURSUANT TO FRE 502 FRCP 16(B) & CIVIL L.R. 16-7. (rxmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017, Terminated: 3/27/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [31] Order on Stipulation Stipulated Amendment to Order Pursuant to FRE 502, FRCP 16(b) & Civil L.R. 16-7 filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER GRANTED by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler [36].(rm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017, Terminated: 1/30/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [35] Order on Stipulation, Stipulation and [Proposed] Amended Case Management Order filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting [34] Stipulation. To avoid losing track of the case, the court sets a status conference for 8/17/2017 at 11 a.m. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016, Terminated: 11/17/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                            Stipulation and [Proposed] Case Management Order filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 11/16/2016) Modified on 11/17/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Order
                                                                                                              ORDER. The court asks the parties to confer this week and try to work out a case-management order and a timeline for productions and raising disputes. First, Facebook is working on its productions, and both parties agree that a case-management order makes sense. Second, the parties worked out their Rule 502(d) order, which seemingly resolves issues raised in the opposition to the petition. Third, the government's issuance of the summonses (asking for the same information as the the IDRs) and subsequent enforcement action seem driven by the pending expiration of the statute of limitations. For these and other reasons, the court thinks the parties can make progress on their own before Monday's hearing. The court asks the parties to submit a joint statement with their agreements and any disagreements about the timeline by Friday, 11/18/2016, at 2 p.m. (This is a text entry order generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 11/15/2016) Modified on 11/16/2016 (lsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to [12] Motion Order pursuant to Case Mangement Order Notice of Motion and Motion for Case Mangement Order. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 11/12/2016, Entered: 11/12/2016 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Order finding as moot [11] Motion entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (based on ECF No. 30). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER PURSUANT TO FRE 502, FRCP 16(b) & CIVIL L.R. 16-7 by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting [30] Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court has a scheduling conflict out of the district on 11/17/2016 and 11/18/2016 and thus resets the motion hearing for 11/21/2016 at 9:30 a.m. The court realizes that the new hearing date is during Thanksgiving week and thus may be inconvenient for the parties. They may reset the hearing by stipulation to any morning in November at 9:30 a.m. or any Thursday at 9:30 a.m. in December. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: 11/7/2016, Terminated: 11/9/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [11] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) (Stipulation and Proposed Order Pursuant to FRE 502, FRCP 16(b) & CIVIL L.R. 16-7) filed by United States of America. (Weaver, James) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                            REPLY (re [12] MOTION Order pursuant to Case Mangement Order Notice of Motion and Motion for Case Mangement Order ) Facebook's Reply in Support of Motion for Case Management Order filed byFacebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jay Cha-Young Kim in Support of [26] Reply to Opposition/Response, Facebook's Reply in Support of Motion for Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) filed byFacebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Related document(s)[26]) (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                REPLY (re [11] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) ) Facebooks Reply in Support of Motion for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) filed byFacebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re [12] MOTION Order pursuant to Case Mangement Order Notice of Motion and Motion for Case Mangement Order ) filed byUnited States of America. (Weaver, James) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re [11] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) ) filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Weaver, James) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to re [10] Response, (Reply to Facebook's Opposition to Amended Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summonses) by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Nancy Bronson)(Weaver, James) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            RELATED CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting [14] Administrative Motion. The court has determined that the following cases are related: C16-3777 LB and C16-5884 TEH. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR THE U.S.A. TO: (1) REPLY TO FACEBOOK'S OPPOSITION TO AMENDED PETITION TO ENFORCE IRS SUMMONSES; AND (2) RESPOND TO FACEBOOK'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting [18] Stipulation. U.S. Reply to Opposition due October 25, 2016. U.S. Response to Administrative Motion to Relate Cases due October 25, 2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016, Terminated: 10/14/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time filed by United States of America. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Frewing of Jay Cha-young Kim (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Frewing of Andrew P. Crousore (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [14] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/12/2016) Modified on 10/12/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016, Terminated: 10/20/2016 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. Responses due by 10/17/2016. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/11/2016) Modified on 10/12/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016, Terminated: 11/17/2016 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Case Mangement Order filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/25/2016. Replies due by 11/1/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Jay Cha-young Kim in Support of Motion for Case Management Order, # (2) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Facebook's Motion for Case Management Order)(Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/11/2016) Modified on 10/12/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016, Terminated: 11/12/2016 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) filed by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/25/2016. Replies due by 11/1/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Jay Cha-young Kim in Support of Motion for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(d, # (2) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(d))(Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/11/2016) Modified on 10/12/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 response
                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to [7] Amended Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summonses by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Jay Cha-young Kim in Support of Opposition to Amended Petition to Enforce, # (2) Declaration Declaration of Ronald Dong in Support of Opposition to Amended Petition to Enforce)(Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 10/11/2016) Modified on 10/12/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by United States of America of Service (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Re [7] Amended Document, filed by United States of America. Show Cause Response due 21 days prior to the order to show cause hearing. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/17/2016 at 9:30 A.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/10/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Amended document
                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED PETITION by United States of America. Amendment to [1] Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Proposed Order, # (10) Compared Petition, # (11) Compared Declaration)(Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 7/25/2016) Modified on 10/12/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc. and Subsidiaries.. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Scott H. Frewing re Consent to Proceed before Magistrate. (Frewing, Scott) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Weaver, James) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/13/2016 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/22/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/13/2016 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: 7/6/2016 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons . Filed byUNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet, # (3) Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 1, # (5) Exhibit 2, # (6) Exhibit 3, # (7) Exhibit 4, # (8) Exhibit 5, # (9) Exhibit 6)(Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 2,814 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?