William Ciganek, Jr. v. Portfolio Recovery Associates,, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-16120

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 12:05 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None
Filed (ECF) Appellant William Ciganek, Jr. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/01/2016. [10037602] [16-16120] (Schwinn, Fred) [Entered: 07/01/2016 06:06 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Appellees Janalie Ann Henriques, Hunt & Henriques, Michael Scott Hunt and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/01/2016. [10037368] [16-16120] (Topor, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/01/2016 04:09 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
      DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/01/2016. Transcript ordered by 07/25/2016. Transcript due 08/22/2016. Appellant William Ciganek Jr. opening brief due 10/03/2016. Appellees Janalie Ann Henriques, Michael Scott Hunt, Hunt & Henriques and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC answering brief due 11/03/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10028315] (RT) [Entered: 06/24/2016 10:32 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 135 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?