FedEx Ground Package System v. Miriam Barcellona Ingenito
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 15-15350

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 11:03 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026962999 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
Filed order MEDIATION (SL): A further dial-in telephonic conference will be held on May 8, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Dial-in information is available to counsel of record as a separate document attached to the electronic filing notification of this order. If any counsel of record is not able to access the dial-in information, please notify the Mediation Program immediately at virna_sanchez@ca9.uscourts.gov. [9495054] (OC) [Entered: 04/14/2015 01:32 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026951851 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None
    Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): A dial-in telephonic conference will be held on April 14, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Dial-in information is available to counsel of record as a separate document attached to the electronic filing notification of this order. If any counsel of record is not able to access the dial-in information, please notify the Mediation Program immediately at virna_sanchez@ca9.uscourts.gov. [9490309] (WL) [Entered: 04/09/2015 03:42 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
      Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SL) Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties (Docket Entry No.[27]), this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys’ fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [10016505] (OC) [Entered: 06/15/2016 03:58 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) Appellant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. Stipulated Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 06/14/2016. [10014819] [15-15350] (Yost, Geoffrey) [Entered: 06/14/2016 03:39 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
          MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 05/09/2016. See order for details. [9896296] (VS) [Entered: 03/09/2016 04:17 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
            MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 03/04/2016. See order for details. [9813626] (VS) [Entered: 01/04/2016 01:56 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
              MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 01/04/2016. See order for details. [9762681] (VS) [Entered: 11/19/2015 12:06 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) Appellant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. Correspondence: re Settlement as to DA Defendants. Date of service: 08/19/2015 [9653461] [15-15350] (Yost, Geoffrey) [Entered: 08/19/2015 06:35 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                  MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - Further Conference, 08/21/2015, 11:45 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled at 11:00 a.m.). [9644766] (VS) [Entered: 08/12/2015 02:31 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                    MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference, 08/21/2015, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. [9644575] (VS) [Entered: 08/12/2015 01:49 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                      MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference, 08/12/2015, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. [9632070] (VS) [Entered: 08/03/2015 11:48 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                        Filed order MEDIATION (SL): An in-person mediation will be held on July 29, 2015, at 10:00 a.m., at the U.S. Court of Appeals, 95 Seventh Street, Suite 109, San Francisco, California [telephone (415) 355-7900]. Unless excused by the Circuit Mediator prior to the scheduled conference, each party shall be represented by counsel of record and a client representative having full authority to negotiate and settle the case on any terms at the conference. Mediation statements of any length shall be submitted to the Circuit Mediator via e-mail [stephen_liacouras@ca9.uscourts.gov] or fax [(415) 355- 8566] on or before July 23, 2015 by 12:00 p.m. (Noon). Mediation statements shall contain brief statements of the following.... It is recommended that counsel review with their clients the information contained in the Mediation Program web site: www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation, with particular emphasis on section E “Preparing for Mediation.”[9577512] (WL) [Entered: 06/17/2015 09:52 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                          MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference, 06/08/2015, 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time. [9560010] (VS) [Entered: 06/03/2015 11:11 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                            Filed order MEDIATION (SL): The conference previously scheduled for June 5, 2015, is canceled. [9559651] (SML) [Entered: 06/03/2015 08:50 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                              MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference, 06/05/2015, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. [9559567] (VS) [Entered: 06/03/2015 08:01 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                Filed order MEDIATION (SL): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. On or before May 29, 2015, counsel shall provide a status report by email to the Circuit Mediator (Stephen_Liacouras@ca9.uscourts.gov). [9530933] (SML) [Entered: 05/08/2015 02:26 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                  Filed Appellant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. letter dated 03/31/2015 re: no transcripts has been ordered. Paper filing deficiency: None. [9482662] (RR) [Entered: 04/02/2015 04:49 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jason W Norris for Appellant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Date of service: 04/02/2015. [9481905] [15-15350] (Norris, Jason) [Entered: 04/02/2015 12:40 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                      MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - The court has scheduled a telephone Assessment Conference, 04/14/2015, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The Circuit Mediator will initiate the conference call by contacting each person on the attached list. Please be available for the call at least five minutes before the scheduled time. Counsel should review the attached list and inform the Mediation Assistant by email at least 72 hours in advance of the scheduled call of any corrections to the list....The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [9470068] (VS) [Entered: 03/24/2015 02:44 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/05/2015. [9447498] [15-15350] (Yost, Geoffrey) [Entered: 03/05/2015 05:16 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Geoffrey H. Yost for Appellant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Date of service: 03/05/2015. [9446801] [15-15350] (Yost, Geoffrey) [Entered: 03/05/2015 01:31 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Douglas Scott Whaley for Appellee Ann Marie Schubert. Date of service: 03/05/2015. [9446036] [15-15350] (Whaley, Douglas) [Entered: 03/05/2015 07:54 AM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Ann Marie Schubert Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/05/2015. [9446035] [15-15350] (Whaley, Douglas) [Entered: 03/05/2015 07:51 AM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/05/2015. Transcript ordered by 03/25/2015. Transcript due 04/24/2015. Appellant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. opening brief due 06/03/2015. Appellees Miriam Barcellona Ingenito, Bonnie M. Dumanis, Jackie Lacey, Michael Ramos and Ann Marie Schubert answering brief due 07/06/2015. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9436504] (RT) [Entered: 02/26/2015 11:55 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 296 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?