USA v. Span et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:16-cr-40009
Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 12:17 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Courtney Span, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Cara McNamara +1 907 646 3400 +1 907 646 3480 cara_mcnamara@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/10/2016, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Stacia Richardson-Span (Murphy, Brian) (Entered: 07/10/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None
    SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Courtney Span (McNamara, Cara) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION for Reconsideration COST OF COUNSEL CONTRIBUTION AND REQUEST TO APPLY TOWARDS RESTITUTION as to Courtney Span. (McNamara, Cara) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Stacia Richardson-Span. Sentencing reset for 7/12/2016 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Courtney Span. Sentencing reset for 7/12/2016 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 34 Motion to Continue as to Courtney Span (1), Stacia Richardson-Span (2). (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
              Assented to MOTION to Continue Sentencing to after July 11, 2016 as to Courtney Span, Stacia Richardson-Span by USA. (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michelle L. Dineen Jerrett appearing for USA. (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michelle L. Dineen Jerrett appearing for USA. (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Forfeiture of Property (Money Judgment) as to Stacia Richardson-Span by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Money Judgment))(Rachal, Doreen) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Forfeiture of Property (Money Judgment) as to Courtney Span by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Money Judgment))(Rachal, Doreen) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None
                        PLEA AGREEMENT as to Courtney Span (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None
                          PLEA AGREEMENT as to Stacia Richardson-Span (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                            District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Stacia Richardson-Span. Sentencing set for 6/20/2016 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Courtney Span. Sentencing set for 6/20/2016 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Rule 11 Hearing as to Stacia Richardson-Span held on 3/22/2016, Case called, Counsel and dft appear for Rule 11 Hearing, Dft waives indictment and enters a plea of GUILTY as to count 1 of an information, Plea entered by Stacia Richardson-Span (2) Guilty Count 1, ( Sentencing set for 6/20/2016 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman), Procedural order re sentencing to issue, Dft released on current conditions of release, (Attorneys present: Flashner/Murphy)Court Reporter Name and Contact information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Rule 11 Hearing as to Courtney Span held on 3/22/2016, Case called, Counsel and dft appear for Rule 11 Hearing, Dft waives indictment and enters a plea of GUILTY as to count 1 of an information, Plea entered by Courtney Span (1) Guilty Count 1, ( Sentencing set for 6/20/2016 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman), Procedural order re sentencing to issue, Dft released on prior conditions of release, (Attorneys present: Flashner/McNamara)Court Reporter Name and Contact information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None
                                    WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Stacia Richardson-Span (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None
                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Courtney Span (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Courtney Span, Stacia Richardson-Span Rule 11 Hearing set for 3/22/2016 at 11:00AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. Counsel is to contact U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services as soon as possible http://www.map.uscourts.gov/psi-interview-schedule to determine scheduling of the presentence interview. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Courtney Span, Stacia Richardson-Span; District Judge Timothy S Hillman assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                            INFORMATION (Felony) with Criminial Forfeiture as to Courtney Span (1) count(s) 1, Stacia Richardson-Span (2) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Courtney Span. Time excluded from 12/7/15 until 2/19/16. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(b) and 18 USC 3161(h)(7) Extension of time to return indictment. (Castles, Martin) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Stacia Richardson-Span. Time excluded from 12/7/15 until 2/19/16. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(b) and 18 USC 3161(h)(7) Extension of time to return indictment. (Castles, Martin) [4:15-mj-04402-DHH] (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Ex ParteHearing re: Counsel as to Courtney Span held on 11/23/2015. Case called, Defendant and Defense Counsel appear, The Defendant shall be required to contribute to the cost of representation, Order to issue. (Attorneys present: McNamara. )Court Reporter : Digital Recording, Ex Parte Hearing - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Ex Parte Hearing re: Counsel as to Stacia Richardson-Span held on 11/23/2015. Case called, Defendant and Defense Counsel appear, The Defendant shall be required to contribute to the cost of representation, Order to issue. (Attorneys present: Murphy. )Court Reporter : Digital Recording - Ex Parte Hearing-For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:15-mj-04402-DHH] (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Stacia Richardson-Span; Hearing re: Counsel set for 11/23/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:15-mj-04402-DHH] (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Stacia Richardson-Span. Time excluded from 10/23/15 until 12/7/15. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(b) and 18 USC 3161(h)(7) Extension of time to return indictment. (Castles, Martin) [4:15-mj-04402-DHH] (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Courtney Span. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                            WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Courtney Span. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER PROGRAM as to Courtney Span (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy:Initial Appearance as to Courtney Span held on 10/23/2015. Case called, Counsel, PO Roberts & Defendant appear, Defendant notified of rights, charges & maximum penalties, Financial Affidavit filed, The Court provisionally appoints FPD Cara McNamara, but, will require additional financial information to be filed with the court under seal, Government is not seeking detention, Defendant waives preliminary hearing and files waiver, The Court reviews proposed conditions, Defendant released on conditions.(Attorneys present: Dineen Jerrett, McNamara. )Court Reporter: Digital Recording - 2:30 For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion to Unseal Case as to Courtney Span (1). (Jones, Sherry) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Unseal Case as to Courtney Span by USA. (Jones, Sherry) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy as to Courtney Span. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        SEALED COMPLAINT as to Courtney Span (1). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kyle Zgraggen, # 2 JS45)(Belpedio, Lisa) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to Courtney Span (1) (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Seal Case as to Courtney Span by USA. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Courtney Span; Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) [4:15-mj-04401-DHH] (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 43 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?