Velez-Garriga v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-02840
District Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 2:15 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Johnny Velez-Garriga, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott G. Cerbin, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Cerbin, Esq +1 718 596 1829 +1 718 228 4612 mail@cerbinlaw.com
v.
No Logo Essence A. Jackson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Anthony Dougherty +1 212 788 8342 +1 212 788 9776 jdougher@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Undercover Police Officer C0072, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 1/22/2013. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order by Essence A. Jackson, The City of New York, Undercover Police Officer C0072, Johnny Velez-Garriga (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
      Letter by Essence A. Jackson, The City of New York, Undercover Police Officer C0072, Johnny Velez-Garriga (Beck, Curt) Modified on 1/10/2013 (Priftakis, Tina). (Entered: 01/10/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 2/1/2013 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. The Parties must consult about a proposed schedule for discovery in accordance with FRCP 26 and complete the attached questionnaire as far as possible before they come to the Initial Conference. If the Parties believe that a settlement conference may be productive, they should call Chambers at (718) 613-2300 to request that one be scheduled; when calling, the Parties should be able to propose at least three mutually available dates for a settlement conference. All requests for adjournments must be made no later than 48 hours before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/28/2012. (Priftakis, Tina) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
          ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Essence A. Jackson, The City of New York, Undercover Police Officer C0072. (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Curt Peter Beck on behalf of The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on September 6, 2012, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than September 4, 2012, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/28/2012. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by The City of New York. (Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Anthony Dougherty on behalf of The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                    In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action (including a jury or nonjury trial) and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences.Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against Essence A. Jackson, The City of New York, Undercover Police Officer C0072 Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Johnny Velez-Garriga. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 67 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?