Klayman v. Obama et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-02010
District Judge Sam A Lindsay, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 9, 2017 at 11:25 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Demetrick Pennie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrisburg Civil Law Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
No Logo Larry Klayman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrisburg Civil Law Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
Freedom Watch, Inc
2020 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W., Suite 345
Washington, DC 20006
(561) 558 5336 LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Alicia Garza, Defendant
No Logo Black Lives Matter, Defendant
McKesson, DeRay McKesson, DeRay, Defendant
Officially listed as "Deray McKesson"
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric H Holder, Jr"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Covington & Burling LLP
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001 Kenneth G Coffin-DOJ +1 214 659 8646 +1 214 659 8807 kenneth.coffin@usdoj.gov
No Logo George Soros, Defendant
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary Clinton"
No Logo Johnetta Elzie, Defendant
No Logo Louis Farrakhan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nation of Islam
7351 South Stony Island Avenue
Chicago, IL 60649 Abdul Arif Muhammad +1 215 313 0738 +1 800 803 1636 arifmuhammadgc@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Muhammad Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nation of Islam
7351 South Stony Island Avenue
Chicago, IL 60649 Michael K Muhammad +1 214 922 0212 + 214 922 0294 michael@muhammadlawfirm.com
No Logo Malik Zulu Shabazz, Defendant
No Logo Nation of Islam, Defendant
No Logo National Action Network, Defendant
No Logo New Black Panthers Party, Defendant
No Logo Opal Tometi, Defendant
No Logo Patrice Cullors, Defendant
No Logo President Barack Hussein Obama, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
The White House
1600 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washingont, DC 20500
(202) 456-1414 Kenneth G Coffin-DOJ +1 214 659 8646 +1 214 659 8807 kenneth.coffin@usdoj.gov
No Logo Rashad Turner, Defendant
Sharpton, Alfred Sharpton, Alfred, Defendant
Officially listed as "Rev. Al Sharpton"

Toggle Switch Represented by Deborah E. Lewis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
National Action Network
106 W. 145th Street
Harlem, NY 10039 H Ron White +1 214 665 4150 +1 214 665 4160 hrwhite@whitewiggins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Wiggins, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
National Action Network
106 W. 145th Street
Harlem, NY 10039 Camille L Stearns Miller +1 214 665 4158 +1 214 665 4160 cstearnsmiller@whitewiggins.com
National Action Network
106 W. 145th Street
Harlem, NY 10039 Kevin B Wiggins +1 214 665 4150 +1 214 665 4160 kbwiggins@whitewiggins.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (147) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-8466744. T.O. form to appellant electronically at Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT: It is therefore ordered, adjudged, and decreed that all federal and state law claims asserted by Plaintiffs Demetrick Pennie and Larry Klayman (Plaintiffs) against all Defendants are dismissed without prejudice; that this action is dismissed without prejudice; and that all allowable and reasonable costs are taxed against Plaintiffs. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/2/2017) (ykp) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 145 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court grants the Individual Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 21); denies the Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel by Defendant Deray McKesson (Doc. 74); denies Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Sanctions (Doc. 87); and denies as moot all remaining motions to dismiss (Docs. 23, 32, 40, 41, 80, 90, 103, 112, and 141). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/2/2017) (ykp) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 141 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 140 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David E. Kendall. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/8/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Hillary Clinton re 141 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (York, Lauren) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Hillary Clinton (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (York, Lauren) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David E. Kendall (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8395575) filed by Hillary Clinton (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (York, Lauren) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Elisabeth York on behalf of Hillary Clinton. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (York, Lauren) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 137 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa C. Colburn. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/28/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8371126) filed by Rashad Turner (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Lisa Colburn added to party Rashad Turner(pty:dft) (Colburn, Lisa) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER: The court issued an order in this action setting forth the deadline for Defendant former Secretary of State Hillary Clinton ("Secretary Clinton") to answer, or otherwise respond, to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Order (Doc. 135 ). The docket sheet reflects that Secretary Clinton has yet to formally appear in this case. The court directs the Clerk to mail a copy of the Order (Doc. 135 ) to David E. Kendall. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/19/2017) (aaa) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER: The deadline for Secretary Clinton to answer, or otherwise respond, to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is May 8, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/18/2017) (aaa) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 127 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, Add and Terminate Parties (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER: The record reflects Mr. Klayman's predilection for filing frivolous, nonsensical, and vituperative documents, in the form of notices, motions, briefs, etc., in response to unfavorable rulings. The court has grown weary of Mr. Klayman's tactics. If Mr. Klayman files any further frivolous or nonsensical documents in this matter, the court will personally sanction him monetarily. The court directs the Clerk to strike "Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's Order Denying Motion for Leave to File Notice of New Case Authority Re: Memorandum Opinion and Order in Nwanguma v. Trump"(Doc. 132 ). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/13/2017) (axm) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ***STRICKEN PER 133 ORDER*** RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 131 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Klayman, Larry) Modified on 4/14/2017 (axm). (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER denying 130 Motion Leave to File Notice of New Case Authority. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/11/2017) (epm) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION Leave to File Notice of New Case Authority filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER: The court directs the Clerk to strike Plaintiffs' 128 Notice of New Case Authority) filed by Demetrick Pennie, Larry Klayman. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/7/2017) (epm) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ***STRICKEN per 129 Order*** NOTICE of Case Authority filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie (Klayman, Larry) Modified on 4/7/2017 (epm). (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER: This action is dismissed without prejudice with respect to Defendants Johnetta Elzie and Alicia Garza. The court notes that the Clerk's docket sheet reflects that Defendants Hillary Clinton, Nation of Islam, Black Lives Matter, and the New Black Panther Party have not filed a responsive pleading. The court directs Plaintiffs to file a brief, on or before 4/14/2017, not to exceed ten pages, describing how the service purportedly effected on each of these Defendants complies with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/5/2017) (sss) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 125 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Camille L Stearns Miller is withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendants Reverend Al Sharpton and the National Action Network and she is relived of any further obligation to or representation of Defendants in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/31/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Camille Stearns Miller filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton Attorney Camille L Stearns Miller added to party National Action Network(pty:dft) (Stearns Miller, Camille) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed as to New Black Panthers Party ; served on 3/15/2017. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  REPLY filed by Opal Tometi re: 112 Motion to Dismiss. (Gillespie, Hal) Modified text and linkage on 3/15/2017 (axm). (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Process Server for Summons served on Black Lives Matter on 2/22/2017 . (Klayman, Larry) Modified text on 3/14/2017 (ykp). (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      RESPONSE filed by Demetrick Pennie re: 112 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REPLY filed by Rashad Turner re: 103 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Rashad Turner (Flaherty, Scott) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 119 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER: The court hereby grants Plaintiffs a third, and final, extensionof time to effect service on Defendants Black Lives Matter, Johnetta Elzie, Alicia Garza, and the New Black Panthers Party, and directs Plaintiffs to effect service on these four Defendants by Friday 3/17/2017, by 5:00 p.m. The court denies as moot Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants, filed 1/17/2017 (Doc. 99 ); and Plaintiffs' Request for Status Conference, filed 2/16/2016 (Doc. 118 ). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/17/2017) (sss) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 88 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer,, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,, (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 103 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Rashad Turner (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 97 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/9/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Patrice Cullors. (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Opal Tometi. (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Patrice Cullors, Opal Tometi re 112 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Declaration(s), # 2 Declaration(s)) (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss () filed by Patrice Cullors, Opal Tometi with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Joseph H Gillespie added to party Patrice Cullors(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph H Gillespie added to party Opal Tometi(pty:dft) (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Louis Farrakhan re: 99 Response/Objection (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit(s)) (Muhammad, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie for Hillary Clinton (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              REPLY filed by George Soros re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant George Soros, and Brief in Support (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 90 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Saldivar on behalf of Rashad Turner. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie Nation of Islam (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Rashad Turner re 104 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 103 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Rashad Turner (Flaherty, Scott) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Rashad Turner re 103 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Rashad Turner (Flaherty, Scott) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Rashad Turner filed by Rashad Turner (Flaherty, Scott) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 98 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. Flaherty. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/18/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 89 Motion for Leave to File, as no response in opposition to the motion was filed and the court determines that the requested leave should be granted. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the motion shall be calculated from the date of this order. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/18/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant George Soros, and Brief in Support (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 88 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases, (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8136735) filed by Rashad Turner (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Certiifcate of Good Standing)Attorney Scott Michael Flaherty added to party Rashad Turner(pty:dft) (Flaherty, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 90 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint, 91 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/16/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Motion of Defendant George Soros to Transfer Related Case filed by George Soros (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Deray McKesson re 94 Reply Memorandum (York, Lauren) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            REPLY filed by Deray McKesson re: 74 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel (York, Lauren) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 92 Motion to Extend Time to File Response. The Deadline for Plaintiffs to file a response to Defendant George Soros's Motion to Dismiss is 1/17/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/20/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 80 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant George Soros, and Brief in Support filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Malik Zulu Shabazz re 89 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT, 90 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint, 16 Amended Complaint,, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit(s) affadavit, # 2 Exhibit(s) wikipedia) (Shabazz, Malik) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint filed by Malik Zulu Shabazz with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit(s) affadavit, # 2 Exhibit(s) wikipedia) (Shabazz, Malik) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Malik Zulu Shabazz (Shabazz, Malik) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER denying without prejudice 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; denying as duplicative 84 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; denying 86 Motion to Consolidate Cases (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/16/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 74 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Brief re: 86 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wiggins, Kevin) Modified docket text and terminated motion event per DJ chambers on 12/16/2016 (bdb). (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Malik Zulu Shabazz. (aaa) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Malik Zulu Shabazz. (aaa) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 80 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant George Soros. (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by George Soros. (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant George Soros, and Brief in Support filed by George Soros with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Jonathan Ryan Childers added to party George Soros(pty:dft) (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton re: 60 Response/Objection (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 62 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant Reverend Al Sharpton and National Action Network's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Reverend Al Sharpton's and National Action Network's Motion to Dismiss is 12/5/2016. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/1/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint. The deadline for Defendant Rashad Turner to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is 12/13/2016. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/1/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 72 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. The deadline for George Soros to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is 12/5/2016. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/28/2016) (mem) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by Louis Farrakhan re: 59 Response/Objection (Muhammad, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 11/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Deray McKesson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix) (Weixler, Jacob) (Entered: 11/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by George Soros re 72 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Amended Complaint Declaration of Chisara Ezie-Boncoeur (Ezie-Boncoeur, Chisara) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Amended Complaint filed by George Soros with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Chisara Ezie-Boncoeur added to party George Soros(pty:dft) (Ezie-Boncoeur, Chisara) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 65 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Hanrahan. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/23/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 64 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph T. Baio. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/23/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 63 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin P. McCallen. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/23/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rashad Turner. (Cohn, Kali) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 16 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Rashad Turner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cohn, Kali) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael K Hurst on behalf of George Soros. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hurst, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Andrew Hanrahan (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8023532) filed by George Soros (Hurst, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Joseph T. Baio (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8023490) filed by George Soros Attorney Michael K Hurst added to party George Soros(pty:dft) (Hurst, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Benjamin P. McCallen (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8023284) filed by George Soros (Hurst, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 60 Response/Objection filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Rashad Turner Attorney Kali Alanna Cohn added to party Rashad Turner(pty:dft) (Cohn, Kali) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 11/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 11/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY filed by Eric H Holder, Jr, Barack Hussein Obama re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), 23 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) on behalf of the United States of America (Coffin-DOJ, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 32 MOTION to Dismiss (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), 23 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) on behalf of the United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 53 Motion Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file a response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss is 11/11/2016. No further motions to extend the response date will be granted. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/21/2016) (mem) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 51 Motion to Recuse/Disqualify Judge Sam Lindsay Under 28 U.S.C. § 144. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/20/2016) (mem) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 41 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 40 MOTION to Dismiss , 42 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 50 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/9/2016. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/19/2016) (epm) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Disqualification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 144 filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit(s), # 2 Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 32 MOTION to Dismiss , 33 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order: The court grants Plaintiffs leave retroactively to file their Amended Complaint which is deemed filed as of September 16, 2016. Further, The Honorable Minister Farrakhans Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 6) is denied as moot; Plaintiff Larry Klaymans Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Farrakhans Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 10) is denied as moot; Defendant Reverend Al Sharptons Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 14) is denied as moot; The Honorable Minister Farrakhans Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Reply, Motion to Extend Time, Reply, and to Preclude Plaintiff from Filing a Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 15) is denied as moot; the Motion to Strike Amended Complaint (Doc. 19) is denied; The Honorable Minister Farrakhans Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Doc. 25) is denied; Defendant Reverend Al Sharptons Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Doc. 29) is denied; and Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Obama, Holder, and United States of Americas Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 46) is granted and Plaintiffs deadline to respond to the federal Defendants motions to dismiss is extended to October 28, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/13/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 26 Emergency Motion for Hearing, denying 43 Motion Disqualification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 144, overruling 9 Objection, and terming 44 Motion Supplement. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/12/2016) (ran) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 16 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 21 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), 23 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) on behalf of the United States of America, 22 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 25 First MOTION to Strike 16 Amended Complaint,, , 29 MOTION to Strike 16 Amended Complaint,, , 19 MOTION to Strike 16 Amended Complaint,, (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 144 re 43 MOTION Disqualification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 144 filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Disqualification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 144 filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief in Support filed by Louis Farrakhan re 41 MOTION to Dismiss the 16 Amended Complaint (Muhammad, Michael) Modified text on 10/3/2016 (rekc). (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss the 16 Amended Complaint filed by Louis Farrakhan (Muhammad, Michael) Modified text on 10/3/2016 (rekc). (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Kevin B Wiggins added to party National Action Network(pty:dft) (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 36 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William P. Gibbens. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/30/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 35 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Teva F. Sempel. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/30/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 34 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacob K. Weixler. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/30/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney William P. Gibbens (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7902287) filed by Deray McKesson (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (York, Lauren) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Teva F. Sempel (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7902238) filed by Deray McKesson (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (York, Lauren) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jacob K. Weixler (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7902153) filed by Deray McKesson (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (York, Lauren) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Deray McKesson re 32 MOTION to Dismiss (York, Lauren) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deray McKesson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Lauren Elisabeth York added to party Deray McKesson(pty:dft) (York, Lauren) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 26 Emergency MOTION for Hearing (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Louis Farrakhan re: 26 Emergency MOTION for Hearing (Muhammad, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike 16 Amended Complaint,, filed by Al Sharpton (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY filed by Larry Klayman, Demetrick Pennie re: 26 Emergency MOTION for Hearing (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Al Sharpton re: 26 Emergency MOTION for Hearing (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION for Hearing filed by Larry Klayman with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION to Strike 16 Amended Complaint,, filed by Louis Farrakhan with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Muhammad, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Eric H Holder, Jr, Barack Hussein Obama re 23 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) on behalf of the United States of America (Coffin-DOJ, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) on behalf of the United States of America filed by Eric H Holder, Jr, Barack Hussein Obama (Coffin-DOJ, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Eric H Holder, Jr, Barack Hussein Obama re 21 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Coffin-DOJ, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Eric H Holder, Jr, Barack Hussein Obama (Coffin-DOJ, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Substitution filed by Eric H Holder, Jr, Barack Hussein Obama (Coffin-DOJ, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike 16 Amended Complaint,, filed by Eric H Holder, Jr, Barack Hussein Obama with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Kenneth G Coffin-DOJ added to party Eric H Holder, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth G Coffin-DOJ added to party Barack Hussein Obama(pty:dft) (Coffin-DOJ, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Black Lives Matter, Johnetta Elzie, Nation of Islam, National Action Network, New Black Panthers Party, Malik Zulu Shabazz, George Soros. (ndt) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons issued as to Hillary Clinton, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ndt) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Larry Klayman. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Strike 13 Reply, 12 Reply, 10 First MOTION to Extend Time To Oppose Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Preclude Plaintiff from Responding to Motion to Dismiss filed by Louis Farrakhan with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Muhammad, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Al Sharpton with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))Attorney Kevin B Wiggins added to party Al Sharpton(pty:dft) (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY filed by Larry Klayman re: 11 Response/Objection (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY filed by Larry Klayman re: 10 First MOTION to Extend Time To Oppose Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Klayman, Larry) Modified text and linkage on 8/31/2016 (sss). (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Louis Farrakhan re: 10 First MOTION to Extend Time To Oppose Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Muhammad, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to Extend Time To Oppose Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Larry Klayman with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION filed by Larry Klayman re: 8 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abdul Arif Muhammad. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 8/12/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7792371) filed by Louis Farrakhan Attorney Abdul Arif Muhammad added to party Louis Farrakhan(pty:dft) (Muhammad, Abdul Arif) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2016: # 1 Additional Page(s) Application) (bdb). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction No Subject Matter Jurisdiction 12(b)(1), 12(h)(3); No Personal Jurisdiction 12(b)(2);, First MOTION to Dismiss Improper Venue (12(b)(3); Insufficient Service of Process 12(b)(4)(5) () filed by Louis Farrakhan with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit(s) Appendix with Affidavits)Attorney Michael K Muhammad added to party Louis Farrakhan(pty:dft) (Muhammad, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Opal Tometi. (ykp) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Patrice Cullors, Louis Farrakhan, Alicia Garza, Deray McKesson, Al Sharpton, Rashad Turner. (mem) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons issued as to Eric H Holder, Jr, Barack Hussein Obama, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (mem) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mem) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Larry Klayman. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-7714384) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 07/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 1,363 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?