Huebner v. Midland Credit Management, Inc
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-2363

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 7, 2017 at 12:13 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Matthew Johnson for Appellee Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC. in 16-2363, 16-2367, FILED. Service date 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF. [2070218] [16-2363, 16-2367] [Entered: 06/30/2017 02:27 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 196 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC. in 16-2363, 16-2367, FILED. Service date 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF. [2070203] [16-2363, 16-2367] [Entered: 06/30/2017 02:22 PM]
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for , on behalf of Appellant Levi Huebner in 16-2363, FILED. Service date 04/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2012123] [16-2363, 16-2367] [Entered: 04/14/2017 07:28 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC. in 16-2363 Brief due date as 07/05/2017, FILED.[2006355] [16-2363, 16-2367] [Entered: 04/07/2017 08:59 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC. in 16-2363, 16-2367, informing Court of proposed due date 07/05/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 04/06/2017 by CM/ECF.[2006068] [16-2363, 16-2367] [Entered: 04/06/2017 03:36 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, scheduling notification, [2005946-2], on behalf of Appellee Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC. in 16-2367, FILED.[2006053] [16-2367, 16-2363] [Entered: 04/06/2017 03:33 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[2005146] [16-2367] [Entered: 04/05/2017 04:29 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION ORDER, granting motion to reinstate appeal [158] filed by Appellant Poltorak PC and Elie C. Poltorak, [160] filed by Appellant Poltorak PC and Elie C. Poltorak, by RKW, FILED. [2005055][172] [16-2367] [Entered: 04/05/2017 03:51 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[1931825] [16-2367, 16-2363] [Entered: 12/20/2016 12:45 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Poltorak PC and Elie C. Poltorak in 16-2367, FILED. Service date 12/19/2016 by CM/ECF.[1930839] [16-2367, 16-2363] [Entered: 12/19/2016 02:06 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [1929396-2], on behalf of Appellants Elie C. Poltorak and Poltorak PC, FILED.[1929428] [16-2367] [Entered: 12/16/2016 08:39 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/10/2016, RECEIVED.[1920760] [16-2363, 16-2367] [Entered: 12/06/2016 09:39 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/05/2016, RECEIVED.[1920546] [16-2363, 16-2367] [Entered: 12/05/2016 04:58 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1920463] [16-2363, 16-2367] [Entered: 12/05/2016 04:21 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/09/2016, RECEIVED.[1920457] [16-2363, 16-2367] [Entered: 12/05/2016 04:18 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Levi Huebner in 16-2363, FILED.[1920405] [16-2363, 16-2367] [Entered: 12/05/2016 03:48 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ORDER, dated 12/02/2016, dismissing appeal by 12/16/2016, unless Appellants Elie C. Poltorak and Poltorak PC, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[1919355] [16-2367] [Entered: 12/02/2016 03:36 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
                                    FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1811042] [16-2363] [Entered: 07/08/2016 01:33 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
                                      DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER, dated 06/03/2016, RECEIVED.[1810701] [16-2367] [Entered: 07/08/2016 10:00 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Elie C. Poltorak and Poltorak PC, FILED. [1810688] [16-2367] [Entered: 07/08/2016 09:54 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
                                        ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1810544] [16-2363] [Entered: 07/08/2016 08:31 AM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
                                          DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/06/2016, RECEIVED.[1810543] [16-2363] [Entered: 07/08/2016 08:30 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
                                            DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER, dated 06/03/2016, RECEIVED.[1810542] [16-2363] [Entered: 07/08/2016 08:30 AM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Levi Huebner, FILED. [1810540] [16-2363] [Entered: 07/08/2016 08:25 AM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 138 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?