Salamoni v. State of Louisiana, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-00705
District Judge Frank J. Polozola, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Frank J. Polozola
Last Updated February 2, 2017 at 7:55 AM EST (8.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Neil Salamoni, Plaintiff

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P. Bryan, III +1 225 326 6000 +1 225 326 6099 bryanb@ag.state.la.us
TERMINATED: 06/13/2002, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charlotte McDaniel McGehee +1 225 389 6711 +1 225 372 2607 charlotte@mcdanielmcgehee.com

Represented by Grodner and Associates, APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Unkel Grodner +1 225 769 1919 dgrodner@grodnerlaw.com

Represented by Neil Salamoni

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil Salamoni +1 225 293 5495 +1+1+ 1+1 1+1 +1+1

Represented by Suite 607

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2002, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James William Standley, IV +1 225 293 3900 +1 225 293 3300 jamess@ladb.org
v.
No Logo Baton Rouge Community College, Defendant

Represented by Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leo Charles Hamilton +1 225 387 4000 +1 225 381 8029 leo.hamilton@bswllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerry L. Stovall, Jr. +1 225 387 4000 +1 225 387 5397 jls@bswllp.com

Represented by Suite 502

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Todd Caruso +1 225 271 4941 +1 225 271 4961 Todd@carusolawllc.com
No Logo LA Board of Regents, Defendant
No Logo Mable Moore, Defendant

Represented by Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leo Charles Hamilton +1 225 387 4000 +1 225 381 8029 leo.hamilton@bswllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerry L. Stovall, Jr. +1 225 387 4000 +1 225 387 5397 jls@bswllp.com

Represented by Suite 502

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Todd Caruso +1 225 271 4941 +1 225 271 4961 Todd@carusolawllc.com
No Logo State of Louisiana through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Defendant
No Logo Walter Bumphus, Defendant

Represented by Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leo Charles Hamilton +1 225 387 4000 +1 225 381 8029 leo.hamilton@bswllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerry L. Stovall, Jr. +1 225 387 4000 +1 225 387 5397 jls@bswllp.com

Represented by Suite 502

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Todd Caruso +1 225 271 4941 +1 225 271 4961 Todd@carusolawllc.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Timeline
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [43-1] motion to Dismiss with prejudice by Neil Salamoni ( signed by Chief Judge Frank J. Polozola ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 06/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by Neil Salamoni (Attorney ) to Dismiss (kmk) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER...the status conference set for 6/14/02 is hereby CANCELLED and RESET to 6/28/02 at 10:30am in chambers... Reset Status Conference for 10:30 6/28/02 ( signed by Mag. Judge Christine Noland ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 06/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [40-1] motion for Donna Groder, Charlotte C. McDaniel, and James W. Standley to Withdraw as Attorney by Neil Salamoni (Terminated attorney James William Standley IV for Neil Salamoni, attorney Donna Unkel Grodner for Neil Salamoni, attorney Charlotte C. McDaniel for Neil Salamoni ( signed by Mag. Judge Christine Noland ), issued notices. (elp) (Entered: 06/13/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by Neil Salamoni (Attorney ) for Donna Groder, Charlotte C. McDaniel, and James W. Standley to Withdraw as Attorney (kmk) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [38-1] motion to Continue Status Conference by Neil Salamoni Reset Status Conference for 10:30 6/14/02 before CN in chambers ( signed by Mag. Judge Christine Noland ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 06/05/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by Neil Salamoni (Attorney ) to Continue Status Conference (kmk) (Entered: 06/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: None
FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Mable Moore : amends [29-1] complaint answer by Mable Moore, Baton Rouge Communit (kmk) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [35-1] motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer by Mable Moore ( signed by Mag. Judge Christine Noland ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by Mable Moore (Attorney ) for Leave to File First Amended Answer (kmk) (Entered: 05/10/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING denying without prejudice [30-1] motion Rule 12(b)(6) to Dismiss by Mable Moore ( signed by Chief Judge Frank J. Polozola ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 04/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Neil Salamoni in opposition to [30-1] motion Rule 12(b)(6) to Dismiss by Mable Moore (kmk) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 9:00 4/19/02 for [30-1] motion Rule 12(b)(6) to Dismiss , issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Mable Moore in support of [30-1] motion Rule 12(b)(6) to Dismiss by Mable Moore (kmk) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by Mable Moore (Attorney ) Rule 12(b)(6) to Dismiss ...atty to submit notice of hearing... (kmk) Modified on 02/22/2002 (Entered: 02/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None
ANSWER by Baton Rouge Communit, Mable Moore (Attorney Anthony Todd Caruso, Leo Charles Hamilton, Jerry L. Stovall Jr.) to Plaintiff's Complaints (kmk) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [27-1] motion to enroll additional counsel by Neil Salamoni enrolling additional attorney James William Standley IV ( signed by Mag. Judge Christine Noland ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by Neil Salamoni (Attorney ) to enroll additional counsel ( Motion Hearing set for 10:00 4/5/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Baton Rouge Communit (Attorney ), (kmk) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION denying [5-1] motion to Remand by Neil Salamoni ( signed by Chief Judge Frank J. Polozola ), issued notices. (nlt) (Entered: 01/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER...a scheduling conference was held 1/10/02... Set Amended Pleadings deadline to 2/28/02 , Set Discovery deadline to 7/31/02 , Set Status Conference for 9:30 6/7/02 before CN in chambers ( signed by Mag. Judge Christine Noland ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by Neil Salamoni (kmk) (Entered: 01/10/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mable Moore 1/3/02 Answer due on 1/23/02 for Mable Moore (kmk) (Entered: 01/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Mag. Judge Christine Noland Re: [5-1] motion to Remand...It is recommended that the pla's Motion to Remand (R.Doc.5) be denied...; Motion no longer referred Objections to R and R due by 12/17/01 (kmk) (Entered: 11/29/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: None
REPLY by Baton Rouge Communit to response to [3-1] motion to Dismiss by Walter Bumphus, Baton Rouge Communit (kmk) (Entered: 11/06/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to File Reply to Pla's Opposition to Dfts' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Baton Rouge Communit ( signed by Chief Judge Frank J. Polozola ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 11/06/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: None
MOTION by Baton Rouge Communit (Attorney ) for Leave to File Reply to Pla's Opposition to Dfts' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (kmk) (Entered: 11/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to Withdraw Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Baton Rouge Communit, vacating [13-1] order referring the motion to the magistrate judge, terminating [3-1] motion to Dismiss by Walter Bumphus, Baton Rouge Communit ( signed by Chief Judge Frank J. Polozola ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 11/01/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Baton Rouge Communit in support of [15-1] motion for Leave to Withdraw Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Baton Rouge Communit (kmk) (Entered: 10/30/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: None
MOTION by Baton Rouge Communit (Attorney ) for Leave to Withdraw Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss ( Motion Hearing set for 9:00 12/7/01 ) (kmk) (Entered: 10/30/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by LA Board of Regents, Baton Rouge Communit in opposition to [5-1] motion to Remand by Neil Salamoni (nlt) (Entered: 10/29/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER [3-1] motion to Dismiss by Walter Bumphus, Baton Rouge Communit referred to Mag. Judge Christine Noland ( signed by Chief Judge Frank J. Polozola ), issued notices. (nlt) (Entered: 10/25/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: None
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Answer due 10/29/01 for Mable Moore, for Walter Bumphus, for Baton Rouge Communit, for LA Board of Regents, for State of Louisiana ) by Neil Salamoni amending Petition for Damages (kmk) (Entered: 10/17/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER...an appropriate order will be issued after the court rules on the motion...( signed by Chief Judge Frank J. Polozola ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 10/17/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER [5-1] motion to Remand by Neil Salamoni referred to Mag. Judge Christine Noland for report and recommendation...( signed by Chief Judge Frank J. Polozola ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 10/17/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File second amended complaint by Neil Salamoni ( signed by Mag. Judge Christine Noland ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 10/17/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None
MOTION by Neil Salamoni (Attorney ) for Leave to File second amended complaint (nlt) (Entered: 10/15/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Neil Salamoni in opposition to [3-1] motion to Dismiss by Walter Bumphus, Baton Rouge Communit (nlt) (Entered: 10/15/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Neil Salamoni in support of [5-1] motion to Remand by Neil Salamoni (nlt) (Entered: 10/15/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None
MOTION by Neil Salamoni (Attorney ) to Remand ( Motion Hearing set for 9:00 11/16/01 ) (nlt) (Entered: 10/15/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Baton Rouge Communit, Walter Bumphus in support of [3-1] motion to Dismiss by Walter Bumphus, Baton Rouge Communit (kmk) (Entered: 09/24/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: None
MOTION by Baton Rouge Communit, Walter Bumphus (Attorney ) to Dismiss ( Motion Hearing set for 9:00 11/2/01 ) (kmk) (Entered: 09/24/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER set Scheduling Conference for 2:30 1/10/02 before CN , set Status Report deadline to 12/31/01 ( signed by Mag. Judge Christine Noland ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 08/22/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 73523 (kmk) (Entered: 08/22/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 32 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?