G. G. v. Gloucester County School Board
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1733

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 10:52 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3448 - Civil Rights
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00406388540 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RECORD (4CCA) transmitted to Supreme Court. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-273. [15-2056, 16-1733] (SJC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406388540 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    RECORD (4CCA) transmitted to Supreme Court. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-273. [15-2056, 16-1733] (SJC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00406388518 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RECORD requested by Supreme Court from court of appeals and district court/agency. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-273. [15-2056, 16-1733] (SJC)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406388518 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RECORD requested by Supreme Court from court of appeals and district court/agency. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-273. [15-2056, 16-1733] (SJC)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: Order. Decision: Vacated. Originating case number: 4:15-cv-00054-RGD-DEM. Entered on Docket Date: 04/07/2017. [1000058108] Copies to all parties and the district court. [16-1733] (JR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Published Court order filed [1000058082] granting Motion vacate decision on appeal [30]. Copies to all parties. [16-1733]--[Edited 04/07/2017 by PSC] (JR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SUPREME COURT REMARK--judgment remanding case received. REMANDED vacated, 04/07/2017. [16-1733] (SJC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 30 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION by Appellant Gloucester County School Board vacate decision on appeal. Date and method of service: 03/10/2017 ecf. [1000039837] [16-1733] Stuart Duncan
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SUPREME COURT REMARK--order remanding case received. 03/06/2017, REMANDED vacated. [16-1733] (PSC)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari granted. 10/31/2016 [15-2056, 16-1733] (SJC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari filed. 08/29/2016. 16-273. [15-2056, 16-1733] (SAC)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. ORDER granting [80] Motion to Stay. The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion to Stay and STAYS this matter pending the disposition of the School Board's petition for a writ of certiorari with the United States Supreme Court. ECF No. 80. Copy of Order provided to all Counsel of Record. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 8/31/2016. [16-1733] (AD)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None
                          BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Victoria Lill & Clare Wuerker. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/23/2016. Response Brief due 09/26/2016. [16-1733] (TW)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None
                            DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Gloucester County School Board. [16-1733] David Corrigan
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None
                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Gloucester County School Board. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999888541] [16-1733] David Corrigan
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by M. Scott Fisher, Jr. for Gloucester County School Board.[999888535] [16-1733] Maurice Fisher
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None
                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jeremy D. Capps for Gloucester County School Board.[999888531] [16-1733] Jeremy Capps
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None
                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by David P. Corrigan for Gloucester County School Board.[999888523] [16-1733] David Corrigan
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
                                      COURT ORDER filed [999886440] denying Motion for stay pending appeal [5] Copies to all parties. [16-1733] (PSC)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE/ANSWER by G. G. to notice requesting response [7], Motion for stay pending appeal [5]. Nature of response: in opposition. [16-1733] Gail Deady
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Rebecca K. Glenberg for G. G..[999881601] [16-1733] Gail Deady
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gail Deady for G. G..[999881597] [16-1733] Gail Deady
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?