Guilfoile v. Shields
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-10652
District Judge Denise J. Casper, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 23, 2021 at 2:26 PM EST (1.4 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Thomas Guilfoile, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Outten & Golden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Biegelsen +1 212 245 1000 abiegelsen@outtengolden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy Marzigliano +1 212 245 1000 +1 212 977 4005 tm@outtengolden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas H. Sikon +1 212 245 1000 nsikon@outtengolden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shilepsky Hartley Robb Casey Michon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J. Hannon +1 617 723 8000 phannon@shilepsky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shilepsky O'Connell Casey Hartley Michon Yelen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara A. Robb +1 617 447 2807 +1 617 447 2800 brobb@shoclaw.com
v.
No Logo John M Shields, Sr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 7th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Sullivan +1 617 573 9400 +1 617 933 7607 msullivan@ashcroftlawfirm.com
No Logo Shields Pharmacy Equity, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Shields Pharmacy Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Shields Pharmacy, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hayes, Messina, Gilman & Hayes, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph P Messina +1 978 809 3853 +1 978 809 3869 jmessina@hayesmessina.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Prince Lobel Tye LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter B. Prince +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 wbprince@plgt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A. Worth +1 617 456 8005 +1 617 456 8100 waworth@plgt.com
No Logo Shields Specialty Pharmacy Holdings, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Casey +1 617 378 6001 +1 617 737 0052 dcasey@littler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen T. Melnick, III +1 617 378 6000 +1 617 737 0052 smelnick@littler.com
No Logo UMass Memorial Shields Pharmacy, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Casey +1 617 378 6001 +1 617 737 0052 dcasey@littler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen T. Melnick, III +1 617 378 6000 +1 617 737 0052 smelnick@littler.com
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 375 - Other Statutes: False Claims Act
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/23/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/12/2021, Entered: None Pretrial Memorandum
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/12/2021, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/29/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/29/2021, Entered: None Judgment under Rule 54b
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/29/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/25/2021, Entered: None Joint statement of counsel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Continue
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Response - not related to a motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Strike
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Strike
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Court ALLOWS Defendant's motion to dismiss as to Count IV, D. 32; D. 34, and DISMISSES Guilfoile's state law claims without prejudice. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Renewed), 34 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Renewed) Responses due by 7/29/2016 (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to July 29, 2016 to File Response/Reply as to 34 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Renewed), 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Renewed) by Thomas Guilfoile.(Sikon, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 34 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Renewed) filed by John M Shields, Sr, Shields Pharmacy Equity, LLC, Shields Pharmacy, LLC. (Sullivan, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                            Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Renewed) by John M Shields, Sr, Shields Pharmacy Equity, LLC, Shields Pharmacy, LLC.(Sullivan, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Renewed) filed by Shields Specialty Pharmacy Holdings, LLC, UMass Memorial Shields Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Melnick, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Renewed) by Shields Specialty Pharmacy Holdings, LLC, UMass Memorial Shields Pharmacy, LLC.(Melnick, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 29 Amended Complaint extension of time for Defendants to respond by Shields Specialty Pharmacy Holdings, LLC, UMass Memorial Shields Pharmacy, LLC. (Melnick, Stephen) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot 17 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 24 Motion to Dismiss in light of the filing of the amended complaint, D. 29. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Guilfoile.(Marzigliano, Tammy) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 24 Joint MOTION to Dismiss , 17 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 6/27/2016 (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to June 27, 2016 to File Response/Reply as to 24 Joint MOTION to Dismiss , 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Thomas Guilfoile.(Sikon, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Messina on behalf of Shields Pharmacy, LLC (Messina, Joseph) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 24 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by John M Shields, Sr, Shields Pharmacy Equity, LLC, Shields Pharmacy, LLC. (Sullivan, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss by John M Shields, Sr, Shields Pharmacy Equity, LLC, Shields Pharmacy, LLC.(Sullivan, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Sullivan on behalf of John M Shields, Sr (Sullivan, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shields Pharmacy, LLC. (Prince, Walter) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Worth on behalf of Shields Pharmacy, LLC (Worth, William) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Walter B. Prince on behalf of Shields Pharmacy, LLC (Prince, Walter) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Walter B. Prince on behalf of Shields Pharmacy, LLC (Prince, Walter) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shields Specialty Pharmacy Holdings, LLC, UMass Memorial Shields Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Term Sheet, # 2 Exhibit B - Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit C - Contract)(Melnick, Stephen) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Shields Specialty Pharmacy Holdings, LLC, UMass Memorial Shields Pharmacy, LLC.(Melnick, Stephen) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re 1 Complaint Extension of Time to Respond by Shields Specialty Pharmacy Holdings, LLC, UMass Memorial Shields Pharmacy, LLC. (Melnick, Stephen) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UMass Memorial Shields Pharmacy, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Shields Pharmacy, LLC, Corporate Parent UMass Memorial Health Ventures, Inc. for UMass Memorial Shields Pharmacy, LLC.. (Melnick, Stephen) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shields Specialty Pharmacy Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Shields Pharmacy Equity, LLC, Corporate Parent UMass Memorial Health Ventures, Inc. for Shields Specialty Pharmacy Holdings, LLC.. (Melnick, Stephen) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Melnick, III on behalf of Shields Specialty Pharmacy Holdings, LLC, UMass Memorial Shields Pharmacy, LLC (Melnick, Stephen) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Casey on behalf of Shields Specialty Pharmacy Holdings, LLC, UMass Memorial Shields Pharmacy, LLC (Casey, David) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Amy Biegelsen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tammy T. Marzigliano. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nicholas H. Sikon. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara A. Robb on behalf of Thomas Guilfoile (Robb, Barbara) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Thomas Guilfoile re 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nicholas H. Sikon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6079838 to Strike (Hannon, Patrick) Modified on 4/25/2016 - DOCUMENT DELETED AS IT WAS FILED IN ERROR (Maynard, Timothy). (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Amy Biegelsen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6079927 by Thomas Guilfoile. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tammy T. Marzigliano Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6079858 by Thomas Guilfoile. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nicholas H. Sikon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6079838 by Thomas Guilfoile. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hannon, Patrick) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/25/2016) (Maynard, Timothy). (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6051215 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Thomas Guilfoile. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 639 times.

                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?