Federal Trade Commission v. Herbalife International of America Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-05217-BRO-GJS
District Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, presiding

Tags

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated June 14, 2019 at 11:05 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Federal Trade Commission Federal Trade Commission, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Trade Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel O. Hanks dhanks@ftc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet C Hudson +1 213 894 2434 jammerman1@ftc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara Y K Chun +1 310 824 4312 bchun@ftc.gov
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Marie Solis +1 206 220 4544 lsolis@ftc.gov
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine M. Todaro +1 202 326 3711 +1 202 326 3395 ctodaro@ftc.gov
v.
Herbalife International Of America, Inc. Herbalife International Of America, Inc., Defendant
Herbalife International, Inc. Herbalife International, Inc., Defendant
Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. Herbalife Nutrition Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Herbalife Ltd"
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 0045
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
    LREF
    Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE Joint Notice of Selection of Independent Compliance Auditor filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Ammerman, Janet) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
      LREF
      Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Permanent InjunctionCourt Filing
      STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT filed by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell against Defendants. This Court retains jurisdiction of this matter for purposes of construction, modification, and enforcement of this Order. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (ah)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016 OrderCourt Filing
        STANDING ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (cw)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: 7/21/2016 Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case (CV 34)Court Filing
          ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:13-cv-02488 BRO. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-05217 BRO(GJSx). Signed by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell (rn)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: 7/19/2016 Response
            RESPONSE filed by Defendants Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife International, Inc., Herbalife Ltdto Notice of Related Case(s)[11] /filed in Support of Notice of Related Cases (Axel, Douglas)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: 7/19/2016 Summons Request
              Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Ammerman, Janet)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 Response
                RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissionto Notice of Related Case(s)[11] (Ammerman, Janet)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 Notice of Related Case(s)
                  NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife International, Inc., Herbalife Ltd. (Local Rule 83-1.3.1) Related Case(s): 13-cv-02488-BRO (SHx) (Axel, Douglas)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 Notice of Appearance
                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nitin Reddy on behalf of Defendants Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife International, Inc., Herbalife Ltd (Attorney Nitin Reddy added to party Herbalife International of America Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Nitin Reddy added to party Herbalife International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nitin Reddy added to party Herbalife Ltd(pty:dft))(Reddy, Nitin)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 Notice of Appearance
                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Douglas A Axel on behalf of Defendants Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife International, Inc., Herbalife Ltd (Attorney Douglas A Axel added to party Herbalife International of America Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A Axel added to party Herbalife International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A Axel added to party Herbalife Ltd(pty:dft))(Axel, Douglas)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                        NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Laura Solis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                          NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel O. Hanks. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                            NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christine M. Todaro. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                              NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Stipulation for Settlement
                                  STIPULATION for Settlement Stipulation to Entry of Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Hudson, Janet)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Hudson, Janet)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                      COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attorney Janet C Hudson added to party Federal Trade Commission(pty:pla))(Hudson, Janet)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 374 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?