District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

Kriss v. Bayrock Group, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-4077

Tags
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 12:42 AM DT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bayrock Camelback, Llc, Plaintiff
No Logo Bayrock Group, LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo BayRock Whitestone LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo J. Kriss, Plaintiff
No Logo J. Kriss, For Bayrock Merrimac Llc, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Ejekam, Alone, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Ejekam, For Bayrock Merrimac Llc, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Cim Group, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ivanka Trump"
No Logo John Does 1-100, Trump, Defendant
No Logo Todd Kaminsky, Defendant
No Logo Adam B. Gilbert, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Akerman LLP, Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "Akerman Senterfitt, Llp"
No Logo Alex Salomon, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Alex Sapir, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Bayrock Camelback, Llc, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Bayrock Group Inc., Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Bayrock Group, LLC, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Bayrock Merrimac, Llc, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo BayRock Spring Street LLC, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo BayRock Whitestone LLC, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Beys, Stein & Mobargha LLP, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Brian Halberg, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Bruce Stachenfeld, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Craig H. Brown, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo David Granin, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Duval & Stachenfeld LLP, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Elliot Pisem, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Sater, Felix H., Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "Felix Sater"

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert S. Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Wolf
No Logo Jerry Weinrich, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo John Does 1-100, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Julius Schwarz, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Kelly Anne Moore, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Lender Investor John Does 1-100, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Martin Domb, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Mel Dogan, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Michael Petros Beys, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Michael Samuels, Defendant - Appellee
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Nader Mobargha, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Nixon Peabody LLP, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Roberts & Holland, LLP, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Salomon & Company, P.c., Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Salvatore Lauria, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Sapir Does 1 Through 100, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Tamir Sapir, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Tevfik Arif, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Walter Saurack, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Ervin Tausky, Plaintiff - Appellant
No Logo Estate Of Ernest Gottdiener, Plaintiff - Appellant
No Logo Estate Of Judit Gottdiener, Plaintiff - Appellant
No Logo Suan Investments, Plaintiff - Appellant
No Logo Frederick Martin Oberlander, Movant - Appellant
No Logo Richard E Lerner, Appellant
Nature of Suit 2360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=13-cv-3905
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=13-cv-3905
  Entries (117) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, RECEIVED. Service date 04/21/2017 by CM/ECF.[2016633] [15-4077] [Entered: 04/21/2017 11:39 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[2002817] [15-4077] [Entered: 04/03/2017 12:31 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[1984117] [15-4077] [Entered: 03/07/2017 04:05 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[1980112] [15-4077] [Entered: 03/01/2017 04:49 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[1980098] [15-4077] [Entered: 03/01/2017 04:44 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1977587] [15-4077] [Entered: 02/27/2017 03:55 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[1957268] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/30/2017 09:55 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, the district court judgment is affirmed, by RR, DC, RJL, FILED.[1957263] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/30/2017 09:52 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 11/30/2016 by CM/ECF. [1917367] [15-4077] [Entered: 11/30/2016 11:50 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 11/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1911786] [15-4077] [Entered: 11/21/2016 05:20 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1907237] [15-4077] [Entered: 11/15/2016 03:23 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 10/03/2016 by CM/ECF. [1876372] [15-4077] [Entered: 10/03/2016 11:51 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Reply Brief, [89], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1873752] [15-4077] [Entered: 09/29/2016 10:22 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Robert S. Wolf, Esq. for Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 09/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1867425] [15-4077] [Entered: 09/21/2016 09:54 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205153978 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 11/30/2016 by CM/ECF. [1917367] [15-4077]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205139174 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 11/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1911786] [15-4077]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205127051 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1907237] [15-4077]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 01/10/2017, A Panel, SET.[1903650] [15-4077]
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 01/09/2017, A, PROPOSED.[1888424] [15-4077]
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        CURED DEFECTIVE REPLY BRIEF, [92], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1879474] [15-4077]
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205045499 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 10/03/2016 by CM/ECF. [1876372] [15-4077]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205038495 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Reply Brief, [89], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1873752] [15-4077]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205021932 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Robert S. Wolf, Esq. for Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 09/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1867425] [15-4077]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments, Ervin Tausky and Frederick Martin Oberlander, FILED. Service date 09/20/2016 by CM/ECF. [1867229] [15-4077]
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205021406 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Frederick M. Oberlander, Esq. for Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/20/2016 by CM/ECF. [1867224] [15-4077]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204994054 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 09/06/2016 by CM/ECF. [1856962] [15-4077]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204993985 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 09/06/2016 by CM/ECF. [1856930] [15-4077]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204885780 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Felix Sater Brief due date as 09/06/2016, FILED.[1815912] [15-4077]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204882729 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, informing Court of proposed due date 09/05/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 07/13/2016 by CM/ECF.[1814779] [15-4077]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF & APPENDIX, [71], [72], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1800923] [15-4077]
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204834884 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-176), on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 06/17/2016 by CM/ECF.[1796774] [15-4077]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204834881 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 06/17/2016 by CM/ECF.[1796773] [15-4077]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204826812 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief & Appendix, [54], [55], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1793692] [15-4077]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204826757 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NEW CASE MANAGER, Amit Singh, ASSIGNED.[1793682] [15-4077]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204808203 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION ORDER, granting motion to recall mandate [46] filed by Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Ervin Tausky, Suan Investments and Judit Gottdiener; granting motion to reinstate appeal [49] filed by Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Ervin Tausky, Suan Investments and Judit Gottdiener, by RKW, FILED. [1786549][66] [15-4077]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204808175 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/06/2016, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1786538] [15-4077]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204780862 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          REPLY TO OPPOSITION [58], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 05/19/2016 by CM/ECF.[1776218][60] [15-4077]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Felix Sater Brief due date as 09/06/2016, FILED.[1815912] [15-4077] [Entered: 07/14/2016 03:28 PM]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204767869 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to reinstate appeal [49], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 05/12/2016 by CM/ECF. [1771312] [15-4077]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, informing Court of proposed due date 09/05/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 07/13/2016 by CM/ECF.[1814779] [15-4077] [Entered: 07/13/2016 03:40 PM]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to reinstate appeal, BRIEF, APPENDIX, [45], [54], [55], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1761417] [15-4077]
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 72 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-176), on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 06/17/2016 by CM/ECF.[1796774] [15-4077] [Entered: 06/17/2016 10:10 PM]
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-176), on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 04/28/2016 by CM/ECF.[1760992] [15-4077]
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 71 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 06/17/2016 by CM/ECF.[1796773] [15-4077] [Entered: 06/17/2016 10:06 PM]
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 04/28/2016 by CM/ECF.[1760991] [15-4077]
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief & Appendix, [54], [55], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1793692] [15-4077] [Entered: 06/15/2016 09:39 AM]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204732467 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, APPENDIX, [50], [51], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1758042] [15-4077]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                NEW CASE MANAGER, Amit Singh, ASSIGNED.[1793682] [15-4077] [Entered: 06/15/2016 09:35 AM]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-174), on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 04/25/2016 by CM/ECF.[1757996] [15-4077]
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION ORDER, granting motion to recall mandate [46] filed by Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Ervin Tausky, Suan Investments and Judit Gottdiener; granting motion to reinstate appeal [49] filed by Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Ervin Tausky, Suan Investments and Judit Gottdiener, by RKW, FILED. [1786549][66] [15-4077] [Entered: 06/06/2016 10:46 AM]
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 04/25/2016 by CM/ECF.[1757995] [15-4077]
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/06/2016, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1786538] [15-4077] [Entered: 06/06/2016 10:42 AM]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204732307 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION, to reinstate appeal, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 04/25/2016 by CM/ECF. [1757990] [15-4077]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY TO OPPOSITION [58], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 05/19/2016 by CM/ECF.[1776218][60] [15-4077] [Entered: 05/19/2016 11:54 PM]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204726810 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to reinstate appeal, [45], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1755921] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 58 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to reinstate appeal [49], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 05/12/2016 by CM/ECF. [1771312] [15-4077] [Entered: 05/12/2016 10:28 PM]
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204724122 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION, to recall mandate, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 04/20/2016 by CM/ECF. [1754964] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, APPENDIX, [50], [51], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1758042] [15-4077] [Entered: 04/26/2016 09:01 AM]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION, to reinstate appeal, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 04/20/2016 by CM/ECF. [1754963] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION, to reinstate appeal, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 04/25/2016 by CM/ECF. [1757990] [15-4077] [Entered: 04/25/2016 09:43 PM]
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204723342 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 04/20/2016, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1754695] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to reinstate appeal, [45], on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1755921] [15-4077] [Entered: 04/21/2016 05:01 PM]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              ORDER, [33] appeal dismissed for Appellant Richard E. Lerner failure to file brief and appendix, EFFECTIVE.[1744683] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION, to recall mandate, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 04/20/2016 by CM/ECF. [1754964] [15-4077] [Entered: 04/21/2016 12:00 AM]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204696692 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MOTION ORDER, denying as moot the motion to extend time [34] filed by Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Ervin Tausky, Suan Investments, Judit Gottdiener and Richard E. Lerner, by RKW, FILED. [1744507][40] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 04/20/2016, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1754695] [15-4077] [Entered: 04/20/2016 02:52 PM]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204678933 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to extend time [34], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 03/28/2016 by CM/ECF. [1737752] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION ORDER, denying as moot the motion to extend time [34] filed by Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Ervin Tausky, Suan Investments, Judit Gottdiener and Richard E. Lerner, by RKW, FILED. [1744507][40] [15-4077] [Entered: 04/06/2016 02:22 PM]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204677959 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Richard E. Lerner, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 03/28/2016 by CM/ECF. [1737383] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to extend time [34], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 03/28/2016 by CM/ECF. [1737752] [15-4077] [Entered: 03/28/2016 06:23 PM]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204581710 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Richard E. Lerner Brief due date as 03/29/2016. Joint Appendix due date as 03/29/2016, FILED.[1700883] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Richard E. Lerner, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 03/28/2016 by CM/ECF. [1737383] [15-4077] [Entered: 03/28/2016 02:31 PM]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204576259 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Richard E. Lerner, informing Court of proposed due date 03/29/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 02/04/2016 by CM/ECF.[1698831] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Richard E. Lerner Brief due date as 03/29/2016. Joint Appendix due date as 03/29/2016, FILED.[1700883] [15-4077] [Entered: 02/08/2016 03:35 PM]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204573614 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: VACATED, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/08/2016, endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[1697841] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Richard E. Lerner, informing Court of proposed due date 03/29/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 02/04/2016 by CM/ECF.[1698831] [15-4077] [Entered: 02/04/2016 02:47 PM]
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204565394 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NEW CASE MANAGER, Amit Singh, ASSIGNED.[1694720] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: VACATED, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/08/2016, endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[1697841] [15-4077] [Entered: 02/03/2016 01:55 PM]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204553000 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 01/22/2016 by CM/ECF.[1690039] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NEW CASE MANAGER, Amit Singh, ASSIGNED.[1694720] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/29/2016 02:45 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204552551 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Richard E. Lerner, FILED. Service date 01/22/2016 by CM/ECF.[1689874] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 01/22/2016 by CM/ECF.[1690039] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/22/2016 03:16 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY, Jessica Jean Hu for Todd Kaminsky, in case 15-4077 , [19], ADDED.[1689278] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Richard E. Lerner, FILED. Service date 01/22/2016 by CM/ECF.[1689874] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/22/2016 01:21 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204550997 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          CAPTION, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Movant - Appellant, AMENDED.[1689270] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            CAPTION, Frederick Martin Oberlander, Movant - Appellant, AMENDED.[1689270] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/22/2016 08:51 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204550843 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Todd Kaminsky, FILED. Service date 01/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1689206] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Todd Kaminsky, FILED. Service date 01/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1689206] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/21/2016 09:00 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204544749 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments, Frederick Martin Oberlander, and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 01/19/2016 by CM/ECF.[1686845] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments, Frederick Martin Oberlander, and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 01/19/2016 by CM/ECF.[1686845] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/19/2016 04:51 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204528232 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/08/2016, Start Time: 10:30 AM, endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[1680598] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/08/2016, Start Time: 10:30 AM, endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[1680598] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/11/2016 10:52 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204518204 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Todd Kaminsky, FILED. Service date 01/05/2016 by CM/ECF.[1676842] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Todd Kaminsky, FILED. Service date 01/05/2016 by CM/ECF.[1676842] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/05/2016 05:07 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204517655 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, to Appellee Akerman Senterfitt, LLP, Tevfik Arif, Bayrock Camelback, LLC, Bayrock Group, Inc., Bayrock Group, LLC, Bayrock Merrimac, LLC, Bayrock Spring Street, LLC, Bayrock Whitestone, LLC, Michael Petros Beys, Beys Stein & Mobargha, LLP, Craig H. Brown, Does 1 through 100, John Does 1-100, John Does 1-100, Mel Dogan, Martin Domb, Duval & Stachenfeld, LLP, Adam B. Gilbert, David Granin, Brian Halberg, Salvatore Lauria, Nader Mobargha, Kelly Anne Moore, Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Nixon Peabody, LLP, Elliot Pisem, Roberts & Holland, LLP, Alex Salomon, Salomon & Co. PC, Michael Samuels, Alex Sapir, Tamir Sapir, Felix Sater, Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke, LLP, Walter Saurack, Julius Schwarz, Bruce Stachenfeld and Jerry Weinrich , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1676636] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, to Appellee Akerman Senterfitt, LLP, Tevfik Arif, Bayrock Camelback, LLC, Bayrock Group, Inc., Bayrock Group, LLC, Bayrock Merrimac, LLC, Bayrock Spring Street, LLC, Bayrock Whitestone, LLC, Michael Petros Beys, Beys Stein & Mobargha, LLP, Craig H. Brown, Does 1 through 100, John Does 1-100, John Does 1-100, Mel Dogan, Martin Domb, Duval & Stachenfeld, LLP, Adam B. Gilbert, David Granin, Brian Halberg, Salvatore Lauria, Nader Mobargha, Kelly Anne Moore, Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Nixon Peabody, LLP, Elliot Pisem, Roberts & Holland, LLP, Alex Salomon, Salomon & Co. PC, Michael Samuels, Alex Sapir, Tamir Sapir, Felix Sater, Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke, LLP, Walter Saurack, Julius Schwarz, Bruce Stachenfeld and Jerry Weinrich , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1676636] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/05/2016 03:31 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204517645 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, dated 01/05/2016, dismissng the appeal by 1/19/2016, unless appellants submit Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, FILED.[1676629] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, dated 01/05/2016, dismissng the appeal by 1/19/2016, unless appellants submit Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, FILED.[1676629] [15-4077] [Entered: 01/05/2016 03:28 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, district court receipt # 0208-11789746., FILED.[1675156] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments, Frederick Martin Oberlander, and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 12/30/2015 by CM/ECF.[1674405] [15-4077] [Entered: 12/30/2015 11:17 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204511748 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments, Frederick Martin Oberlander, and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 12/30/2015 by CM/ECF.[1674405] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments, Frederick Martin Oberlander, and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 12/30/2015 by CM/ECF.[1674404] [15-4077] [Entered: 12/30/2015 11:01 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204511745 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments, Frederick Martin Oberlander, and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 12/30/2015 by CM/ECF.[1674404] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1669198] [15-4077] [Entered: 12/21/2015 04:18 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204497888 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1669198] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/16/2015, RECEIVED.[1669196] [15-4077] [Entered: 12/21/2015 04:17 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204497882 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/16/2015, RECEIVED.[1669196] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/23/2015, RECEIVED.[1669193] [15-4077] [Entered: 12/21/2015 04:16 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204497874 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/23/2015, RECEIVED.[1669193] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/08/2014, RECEIVED.[1669189] [15-4077] [Entered: 12/21/2015 04:15 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204497860 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/08/2014, RECEIVED.[1669189] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/17/2014, RECEIVED.[1669188] [15-4077] [Entered: 12/21/2015 04:14 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204497857 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/17/2014, RECEIVED.[1669188] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 02/25/2014, RECEIVED.[1669186] [15-4077] [Entered: 12/21/2015 04:14 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204497850 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 02/25/2014, RECEIVED.[1669186] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments, Frederick Martin Oberlander, and Ervin Tausky, FILED. [1669171] [15-4077] [Entered: 12/21/2015 04:09 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204497813 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ernest Gottdiener, Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments, Frederick Martin Oberlander, and Ervin Tausky, FILED. [1669171] [15-4077]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 309 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?