HAROON GUL v. TRUMP
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-01462
District Judge Amit P. Mehta, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2021 at 4:49 PM DT (3.3 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ASADULLAH HAROON GUL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by LEWIS BAACH PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Leslie Lewis +1 202 833 8900 +1 202 466 5738 eric.lewis@lewisbaach.com
Tara Jordan Plochocki +1 202 833 8900 tara.plochocki@lewisbaach.com

Toggle Switch Represented by REPRIEVE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shelby Sullivan-Bennis +1 401 835 4214 shelby.sullivan-bennis@reprieve.org
v.
No Logo ASHTON B. CARTER, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
SECRETARY OF DEFENSE Julia A. Berman +1 202 616 8480 +1 202 307 0442 julia.berman@usdoj.gov
SECRETARY OF DEFENSE Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
SECRETARY OF DEFENSE Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES Julia A. Berman +1 202 616 8480 +1 202 307 0442 julia.berman@usdoj.gov
PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
No Logo PETER J. CLARKE, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
REAR ADMIRAL, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE GUANTANAMO Julia A. Berman +1 202 616 8480 +1 202 307 0442 julia.berman@usdoj.gov
REAR ADMIRAL, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE GUANTANAMO Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
REAR ADMIRAL, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE GUANTANAMO Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 463 - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
  Entries (180) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/14/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/14/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/14/2021, Entered: None NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/9/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/9/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/1/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/22/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/22/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None Hearing
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/5/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/17/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Proposed Briefing Schedule
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Proposed Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Final Public Factual Returns by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4a, # 5 Exhibit 4b, # 6 Exhibit 4c)(Davis, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Respondents' 78 Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Final Public Factual Returns. The information identified by Respondents is deemed protected. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/19/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 78 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4a, # 5 Exhibit 4b, # 6 Exhibit 5a, # 7 Exhibit 5b, # 8 Exhibit 5c, # 9 Exhibit 5d, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on 10-22-2018; Page Numbers: 1 - 24. Date of Issuance: 10-25-2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter reference d above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2019.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Terry Marcus Henry (Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 75 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Reliance on Certain Exhibits in the Factual Return and on Certain Legal Justification for Detention by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Tara Jordan Plochocki (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERNCE before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on 8-3-18; Page Numbers: 1-29; Date of Issuance: 8-15-18; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. Afte r 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018.(Miller, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL re 70 Order, (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER. The court notifies the parties about the D.C. Circuit's decision in Al-Alwi v. Trump, No. 17-5067, issued on August 7, 2018, which pertains to the question of continued detention and the end of hostilities. A copy of the decision is attached. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/7/2018. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 65 Response to Document (BRIEF OF PETITIONER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT PROPOSAL) filed by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Response to the Government's Response to Petitioner's Request for a Hearing on Case Management by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 62 Status Report Respondents' Response to Petitioner's Status Report and Request for Hearing filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 62 Status Report Respondents' Interim Response to Petitioner's Status Report and Request for Hearing filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Regarding Briefing Schedule by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Sullivan-Bennis, Shelby)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Regarding Camp II, Building 8 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment)(Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Joint Motion to Relieve Respondents of Their Obligation to File Public Factual Returns and Petitioner's Motion to Seal Factual Returns Filed to Date, # 2 Declaration of Shelby Sullivan-Bennis, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Regarding Camp Four by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Rear Admiral Cashman)(Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Adjourn Status Conference by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (See Docket Entry 54 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Plochocki, Tara) Modified on 12/26/2017 to correct docket event/text (jf).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Petitioners' Status Report on Discovery by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Regarding Camp Five Echo Block by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD J. TRUMP, ROBERT GATES, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, JAY HOOD, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Cashman Declaration)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Proposed Public Factual Return by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part 1, # 2 Appendix Part 2)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Proposed Public Factual Return by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Davis, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Regarding Camp Iguana by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Cashman Declaration)(Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT ON PETITIONERS MOTION FOR DISCOVERY by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Proposed Public Factual Return by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Davis, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 MOTION for Discovery by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Classified Filing by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 41 MOTION for Discovery filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting the schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Respondents shall serve Petitioner's counsel on or before June 23, 2017, with both a For Official Use Only ("FOUO") version and Respondents' proposed publicly releasable version of the Supplemental Factual Return, which was filed with the Court Information Security Officer ("CISO") on November 21, 2016; Respondents shall serve Petitioner's counsel on or before July 21, 2017, with both a FOUO version and Respondents' proposed publicly releasable version of the Supplemental Factual Return, which was filed with the CISO on January 23, 2017; Respondents shall serve Petitioner's counsel on or before September 22, 2017, with both a FOUO version and Respondents' proposed publicly releasable version of the Supplemental Factual Return, which was filed with the CISO on March 3, 2017. Furthermore, Respondents shall also file their proposed publicly releasable versions of the Supplemental Factual Returns on the court's docket on the dates set forth above. See the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/31/2017. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on 4-12-2017; Page Numbers: 1 - 28. Date of Issuance: 05-15-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth Saint-Loth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter ref erenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2017.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Discovery by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Discovery Requests, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY re 38 Response to Document filed by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Classified Filing by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Sullivan-Bennis, Shelby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 36 Response to Document filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Davis, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Response to Petitioner's Response to Respondents' Status Report by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 35 Status Report filed by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court's Order of April 12, 2017 by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Davis, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents Pursuant to the Courts Order of January 30, 2017 filed by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents Pursuant to the Courts Order of January 30, 2017 by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 29 Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Documents and setting the following deadlines for further proceedings in this matter: Respondents shall produce the outstanding document at issue in Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. 29, on or before April 14, 2017; Respondents shall file a status report on or before April 19, 2017; Petitioner's motion for discovery shall be filed on or before May 12, 2017; Respondents' response shall be filed on or before June 9, 2017; Petitioner's reply shall be filed on or before June 23, 2017; and parties shall meet and confer regarding declassification of exculpatory material. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/12/2017. (lcapm3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order of January 30, 2017 filed by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE FROM LEWIS BAACH PLLC TO LEWIS BAACH KAUFMANN MIDDLEMISS PLLC by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order of January 30, 2017 by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Davis on behalf of ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Davis, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Classified Filing by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Public Version of Legal Justification for Detention by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 20 Respondents' Motion for Leave to File Third Supplemental Factual Return. Respondents shall file their Third Supplemental Factual Return and their legal justification for Petitioners continued detention on or before March 2, 2017. Further, Respondents shall complete their production of exculpatory material to Petitioner no later than April 7, 2017. The parties are directed to appear for a status conference on April 12, 2017, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 10. See the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/30/2017. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Regarding Exculpatory Production by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Classified Filing by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Leave to File Third Supplemental Factual Return filed by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Plochocki, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Third Supplemental Factual Return by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Supplemental Factual Return by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue Motion to Adjourn Status Conference by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Sullivan-Bennis, Shelby) Modified event title on 12/7/2016 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Classified Filing by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Berman, Julia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: 10/26/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on September 22, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-19. Date of Issuance:October 26, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court r eporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2017.(pk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 13 Order by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Berman, Julia) Modified event title on 10/24/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA to Notice to the Court by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II 12 Notice (Other),,,,,,,, filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, RICHARD B. CHENEY, DAVID HEATH, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, PETER J. CLARKE, JEFFREY HABERSON, TOM COPERMAN, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JOHN DOE, ROBERT GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DONNIE THOMAS, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, KYLE J. COZAD, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., BRUCE E. VARGO, DAVID E. HEATH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID THOMAS, JR., COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TOM COPEMAN, STEVEN BLAISDELL, WADE F. DAVIS, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., MARK H. BUZBY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GORDON R. ENGLAND. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Notice to the Court, # 2 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings: Respondents shall file an Initial Unclassified Factual Return no later than October 21, 2016, and shall file a Supplemental Factual Return, including both unclassified and classified information, no later than November 21, 2016. Further, Respondents shall file their Final Supplemental Factual Return, including both unclassified and classified information, no later than January 20, 2017. See the attached Order for further details. Additionally, so as to monitor the parties' progress, the parties shall appear for a status hearing on December 7, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/26/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to the Court by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, JAY HOOD, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Proposed Order by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Plochocki, Tara) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Julia A. Berman on behalf of ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 09/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of MOU and Acknowledgment Pursuant to Protective Order Dated September 11, 2008 by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Sullivan-Bennis, Shelby) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/01/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Protective Order and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the US Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba)(Plochocki, Tara) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Jordan Plochocki on behalf of ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Plochocki, Tara) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . (Plochocki, Tara) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Counsel Verification by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Sullivan-Bennis, Shelby) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Shelby Sullivan-Bennis on behalf of ASADULLAH HAROON GUL (Sullivan-Bennis, Shelby) Modified on 7/20/2016 (zrdj). (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616079431.) filed by ASADULLAH HAROON GUL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 12/21/2018. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER. The Government's motion to supplement the record is due on April 15, 2019. By the same date, the government shall complete its declassification and production of "inculpatory/exculpatory materials" to Petitioner, as discussed in the Status Conference held on this date. Petitioner shall file his traverse no later than June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/21/18. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's Motion to Supplement Record and Declassification and Production of Materials due by 4/15/2019. (zjd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 10/22/2018; a further Status Conference is scheduled for 12/21/2018, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Saint-Loth.) (tg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the discussion at the Status Conference held on this date, Respondent shall file a Status Report that updates the court on the "active hostilities" issue and the production of documents on or before October 4, 2018. Additionally, the parties shall appear for a Status Conference on October 22, 2018, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/4/2018. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 9/4/2018. Respondents' Status Report due by 10/4/2018. Status Conference set for 10/22/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 8/3/2018. Status Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: Tim Miller) (zjd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a Status Conference on August 3, 2018, at 11:30 a.m., in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/31/2018. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/3/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting Petitioner's 66 Motion for Leave to File a Response to the Government's Response to Petitioner's Request for a Hearing on Case Management. Petitioner shall file its responsive brief on or before July 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/6/2018. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioner's Responsive Brief due by 7/6/2018. (zjd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file, on or before July 18, 2018, an additional Joint Status Report concerning the parties' efforts to resolve any outstanding discovery disputes. Additionally, the court defers ruling on Petitioner's request for a phased briefing schedule until the government formally responds. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/19/2018. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/18/2018. (zjd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Stayed. (zcdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report that updates the court on efforts to narrow the pending discovery motion no later than 30 days following Petitioner's counsel's visit to Guantanamo Bay. Petitioner's counsel shall notify the court when they are scheduled to meet with Petitioner. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/5/2018. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 54 Joint Status Report dated December 21, 2017, the court vacates the Status Conference previously scheduled for January 5, 2018. Furthermore, the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before February 1, 2018, in which they inform the court about their efforts to resolve the procedural and classification issues detailed in the recently filed 54 Joint Status Report. To the extent the parties by that date have progressed towards resolving the outstanding discovery motion, they shall provide such information as well. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/22/2017. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2018. (zcdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. In light of the additional time requested by Petitioner to review the factual returns, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than December 21, 2017, concerning Discovery Request Numbers 7 and 8, and, if necessary, propose a timeline for resolving those requests. If no litigation will be required to resolve those Requests, then the parties shall appear for a Status Hearing on January 5, 2018, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 10. The purpose of the Status Hearing will be to discuss a schedule for future proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/23/2017. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2017. Status Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' agreement concerning Petitioner's discovery Request Numbers 1 through 6, Petitioner's Motion for Discovery as to those requests is now moot. With respect to Request Numbers 7 and 8, per the parties' agreement, the court will stay the Motion for Discovery as to those requests until such time as Petitioner has had an opportunity to review the Third Supplemental Factual Return. No later than October 20, 2017, Petitioner shall file a status report concerning Request Numbers 7 and 8 and, if necessary, an anticipated timeline for resolving those two requests. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/10/2017. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Petitioner's Status Report due by 10/20/2017. (cdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's Reply shall be filed on or before June 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/26/2017. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Petitioner's reply due by 6/30/2017. (cdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: Petitioner may, if he wishes, file a response to 35 Respondents' Status Report no later than April 25, 2017. Upon receipt of Petitioner's response, the court will enter a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/20/2017. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Respondents' Second Motion for Partial Extension of Time to Produce Documents. Respondents shall produce all outstanding documents on or before April 21, 2017. No further extensions shall be granted. If Respondents fail to meet the April 21, 2017, deadline, the court will consider a motion for sanctions from Petitioner. In addition, should Petitioner require additional time to file its motion for discovery, it shall be freely granted. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/19/2017. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c), all ECF filings in this matter have been automatically restricted to prevent remote access by the general public. However, the parties agree that all non-sealed ECF filings in this matter should be unrestricted and remotely available to the public. Accordingly, the court orders that all current and future non-sealed ECF filings be made remotely accessible to members of the public. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/13/2017. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 4/12/2017. (Court Reporter ELZABETH SAINT-LOTH.) (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Respondents' status report due by 4/19/2017. Motion for discovery due by 5/12/2017. Response due by 6/9/2017. Reply due by 6/23/2017. (cdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Respondents' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents' Public Version of Legal Justification for Detention shall be filed on or before March 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/03/2017. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondents' Public Version of Legal Justification For Detention due by 3/6/2017. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/12/2017 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 1/25/2017. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (nbn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 4:00 PM on 1/25/2017 in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Please make note of the change in start time. (cdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting Respondents' 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents shall file their Final Supplemental Factual Return on or before January 23, 2017. The court's September 26, 2016, Order setting the schedule in this case is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/18/2017. (lcapm3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: In light of 18 Petitioner's Motion to Adjourn Status Conference, the parties are directed to appear for a status conference on January 25, 2017, at 10:45 a.m., in Courtroom 10. The status conference previously set for December 7, 2016, is hereby vacated. In the event counsel or a party is unable to appear on the scheduled date and time due to an unresolvable scheduling conflict, counsel shall meet and confer and provide, via email, two alternative dates and times to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Ms. Chashawn White (Chashawn_White@dcd.uscourts.gov), who shall reset the status hearing and provide notice to the parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/06/2016. (lcapm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 1/25/2017 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR...........MINUTE ORDER: Per the Status Conference held on September 22, 2016, Defendant shall file an Initial Unclassified Factual Return no later than October 24, 2016, and shall file a Supplemental Factual Return, including classified information if possible, no later than November 23, 2016. Further, Defendant shall file its Final Classified Factual Return no later than January 20, 2017. Finally, so as to monitor the parties' progress, the parties shall appear for a status hearing on December 7, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/26/2016. (lcapm2) Modified on 9/26/2016 (zcdw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 9/22/2016. (Court Reporter PATRICIA KANESHIRO-MILLER.) (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/22/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 244 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?