HALL v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-01471
District Judge James E. Boasberg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 29, 2020 at 10:20 AM DT (7.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo STEVEN H. HALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn H. Stephens +1 202 258 6521 drghs3@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by STEVEN H. HALL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVEN H. HALL +1 301 801 6506
v.
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Coleman +1 202 435 7254 +1 202 435 7080 john.coleman@cfpb.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cara Elizabeth Alsterberg +1 202 532 4667 cara.e.alsterberg@usdoj.gov
Space Kate Bailey +1 202 514 9239 kate.bailey@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Marshall Bernie +1 202 616 8488 +1 202 616 8470 andrew.m.bernie@usdoj.gov
Space Matthew J. Berns +1 202 616 8016 +1 202 616 8470 matthew.j.berns@usdoj.gov
Space Marian L. Borum +1 202 514 6531 +1 202 307 6059 Marian.L.Borum@usdoj.gov
Space Marina Utgoff Braswell +1 202 514 7226 +1 202 514 8780 Marina.Braswell@usdoj.gov
Space Bradley Heath Cohen +1 202 305 9855 +1 202 616 8470 bradley.cohen@usdoj.gov
Space Megan Anne Crowley +1 202 305 0754 megan.a.crowley@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen McCoy Elliott +1 202 305 8177 stephen.elliott@usdoj.gov
Space Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
Space Julie Straus Harris +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 julie.strausharris@usdoj.gov
Space Melanie Dyani Hendry +1 202 252 2510 +1 202 252 2599 melanie.hendry2@usdoj.gov
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Space Adam Kirschner +1 202 249 0920 adam.kirschner@usdoj.gov
Space Colin A. Kisor , +1 202 532 4331 colin.kisor@usdoj.gov
Space Robert E. Leidenheimer, Jr. +1 202 514 7238 robert.leidenheimer2@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Douglas Levin +1 202 616 9193 +1 202 305 2685 Scott.Levin@usdoj.gov
Space Peter Rolf Maier +1 202 514 7185 +1 202 514 8780 peter.maier2@usdoj.gov
Space Robert Charles Merritt, III +1 202 616 8098 +1 202 616 8460 robert.c.merritt@usdoj.gov
Space Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
Space Theo Nickerson +1 202 616 8906 +1 202 305 7000 theo.nickerson@usdoj.gov
Space Serena M. Orloff +1 202 616 3619 +1 202 514 9163 serena.m.orloff@usdoj.gov
Space Christina B. Parascandola +1 202 514 3097 +1 202 514 8865 christina.parascandola@usdoj.gov
Space Ryan B Parker +1 202 514 4336 +1 202 616 8470 ryan.parker@usdoj.gov
Space Nicholas J. Patterson +1 202 514 4523 +1 202 616 8470 nicholas.patterson@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen Michael Pezzi +1 202 305 8576 +1 202 616 8470 stephen.pezzi@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Risner +1 202 514 2395 +1 202 616 8470 scott.risner@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua L. Rogers +1 202 252 2578 joshua.rogers3@usdoj.gov
Space Carl Ezekiel Ross +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 carl.ross@usdoj.gov
Space Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
Space April Denise Seabrook +1 202 252 2525 +1 202 252 2599 april.seabrook@usdoj.gov
Space Alexander Daniel Shoaibi +1 202 514 7236 alexander.d.shoaibi@usdoj.gov
Space Dionne S. Shy +1 202 252 2633 +1 202 252 2599 dionne.shy@usdoj.gov
Space Jeremy S. Simon +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 jeremy.simon@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel M. Singer +1 202 616 8014 +1 202 616 8470 samuel.m.singer@usdoj.gov
Space Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
Space Nikhel Sus +1 202 514 2071 +1 202 616 8470 nikhel.s.sus@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen Carl Tosini +1 202 616 5196 +1 202 514 7965 stephen.tosini@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Tulis +1 212 637 2725 +1 212 637 2702 elizabeth.tulis@usdoj.gov
Space Darrell C. Valdez +1 202 307 2843 darrell.valdez@usdoj.gov
Space Sheetul Sheth Wall +1 202 598 2668 +1 706 649 7667 Sheetul.S.Wall2@usdoj.gov
Space Rachael Lynn Westmoreland +1 202 514 1280 +1 202 616 8460 rachael.westmoreland@usdoj.gov
Space Claire M. Whitaker +1 202 514 7137 +1 202 514 8780 claire.whitaker@usdoj.gov
No Logo FEDERAL EMPLOYEES LEGAL SERVICE CENTER, Defendant
No Logo JOANNE DEKKER, Defendant
No Logo LETITIA BYERS, Defendant
No Logo ROSEMARY DETTLING, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Reopen Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Transfer Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/17/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Sanctions
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Sanctions
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Writ of Mandamus
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/26/2016, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 43 Order on Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/1/2016. (lcjeb1)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/6/2016, Entered: None Administrative Record
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/6/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/30/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/16/2016, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/8/2016, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None CM/ECF Password
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Show Cause
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 9 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/25/16. (lcjeb3)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL EMPLOYEES LEGAL SERVICE CENTER, LETITIA BYERS, ROSEMARY DETTLING, JOANNE DEKKER ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616079483) with Jury Demand filed by STEVEN H. HALL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) . (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 249 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?