Wendy Lugo v. Firstsource Advantage LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 16-3016

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 5:57 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012356995 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None
ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Firstsource Advantage LLC, filed. (CHG)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012356942 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None
    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christian H. Gannon on behalf of Appellee(s) Firstsource Advantage, LLC. (CHG)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012351682 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
      ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Wendy Lugo advising this court that no transcripts are available. (BJW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012351636 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
        ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Wendy Lugo, received. (BJW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012344543 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None
          ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Benjamin J. Wolf on behalf of Appellant(s) Plaintiff. (BJW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012343351 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None
            CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Wendy Lugo in District Court No. 2-15-cv-06405. (PDB)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 72 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?