Common Cause et al v. Kemp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00452
District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 3:23 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Common Cause, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emmet J. Bondurant +1 404 881 4100 bondurant@bmelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason James Carter +1 404 881 4100 +1 404 881 4111 carter@bmelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Lennon +1 404 881 4168 lennon@bmelaw.com
No Logo Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emmet J. Bondurant +1 404 881 4100 bondurant@bmelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason James Carter +1 404 881 4100 +1 404 881 4111 carter@bmelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Lennon +1 404 881 4168 lennon@bmelaw.com
v.
Kemp, Brian P. Kemp, Brian P., Defendant
Officially listed as "Brian Kemp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Department of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RONALD J STAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Josiah Benjamin Heidt +1 404 656 3389 jheidt@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Georgia Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia B. Anderson +1 404 463 3630 janderson@law.ga.gov
Citation Section 52 U.S.C. § 20501
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE by United States of America re 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Related Filing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief)(Mendel, Gabriel) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 25 Joint Motion to Permit Briefing Related to Defendant's Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority. Plaintiff's may file a response that shall be 5 pages, less signature page and shall be filed on or before 7/21/16. Defendant may file reply, also of 5 pages, less signature page on or before 8/11/16. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 7/12/16. (jlm) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION for Leave to File Briefing Related to Defendant's Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority by Common Cause, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Lennon, Chad) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE Of Filing by Brian Kemp re 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Heidt, Josiah) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
        Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 30, July 1, by Cristina Correia. (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
          REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Reply to Brief of United States filed by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement City of Philadelphia, # 2 Exhibit 25 P.S. 961.1901 (2001), # 3 Exhibit Consent Order Pulaski County, AK, # 4 Exhibit Stipulation and Order State of New Jersey)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 20 Dft's Motion for Leave to File reply to brief filed by USA. Dft shall have through 5/23/16 to file reply. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 5/11/16. (rsh) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
              MOTION for Leave to File Reply to brief of United States by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None
                NOTICE by United States of America Statement of Interest (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Wilson v. U.S., # 2 Exhibit 2 - Notice to South Dakota, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Notice to Alaska)(Mendel, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                  REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brian Kemp. (Heidt, Josiah) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Common Cause, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Bondurant, Emmet) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Julia B. Anderson on behalf of Brian Kemp (Anderson, Julia) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                        Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 3 - April 8, 2016, June 13 - June 24, 2016, by Cristina Correia. (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 13 Motion to Stay pending resolution of defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 3/15/16. (jlm) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
                            Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Related Activities with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              INSTRUCTIONS to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 3/8/16. (jlm) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Josiah Benjamin Heidt on behalf of Brian Kemp (Heidt, Josiah) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                                  MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1997 Preclearance Letter)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Correia on behalf of Brian Kemp (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: None
                                      Return of Service Executed by Common Cause, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. Brian Kemp served on 2/15/2016, answer due 3/7/2016. (Bondurant, Emmet) (Entered: 02/15/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: None
                                        Return of Service Executed by Common Cause, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. Brian Kemp served on 2/12/2016, answer due 3/4/2016. (Bondurant, Emmet) (Entered: 02/15/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                                          Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113E-6283520. (Bondurant, Emmet) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                                            Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (tcc) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                                              PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Common Cause, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP to Brian Kemp, Individually (Bondurant, Emmet) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (tcc) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                  Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Common Cause, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (tcc) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                    COMPLAINT filed by Common Cause, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6283804.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Space Space

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 278 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?