Unknown

Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Middle District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00845
District Judge THOMAS D. SCHROEDER, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge THOMAS D. SCHROEDER
Last Updated February 24, 2017 at 12:29 AM EST (8.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY, Plaintiff

Represented by ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Campbell +1 480 444 0020 +1 480 444 0028 jcampbell@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Cortman +1 770 339 0774 +1 770 339 6744 dcortman@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Caleb Dalton +1 480 444 0028 +1 480 444 0028 cdalton@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph E. La Rue +1 480 444 0020 jlarue@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Matthew Sharp +1 770 339 0774 msharp@ADFlegal.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy D. Tedesco +1 480 388 8051 jtedesco@telladf.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen K. Waggoner +1 480 444 0020 +1 480 444 0028 kwaggoner@adflegal.org

Represented by Suite B

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J. Dewart +1 910 326 4554 +1 877 326 4585 debcpalaw@earthlink.net
v.
No Logo JOHN B. KING, JR., Defendant

Represented by SUITE 800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James +1 919 856 4530 Mike.James@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Bickford +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8470 james.bickford@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
No Logo LORETTA E. LYNCH, Defendant

Represented by SUITE 800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James +1 919 856 4530 Mike.James@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Bickford +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8470 james.bickford@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Education United States Department of Education, Defendant

Represented by SUITE 800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James +1 919 856 4530 Mike.James@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Bickford +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8470 james.bickford@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant

Represented by SUITE 800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James +1 919 856 4530 Mike.James@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Bickford +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8470 james.bickford@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
Other Parties
No Logo Frank Perry, Interested Party

Represented by BOWERS LAW OFFICE LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KARL S. BOWERS +1 803 260 4124 butch@butchbowers.com
No Logo PATRICK MCCRORY, Interested Party

Represented by BOWERS LAW OFFICE LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KARL S. BOWERS +1 803 260 4124 butch@butchbowers.com

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank J. Gordon +1 919 836 0090 +1 919 836 8027 fgordon@mgsattorneys.com

Represented by Millberg, Gordon & Stewart, P.L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brennan Tyler Brooks +1 919 836 0090 +1 919 836 8027 tbrooks@mgsattorneys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William W. Stewart, Jr. +1 919 836 0090 +1 919 836 8027 bstewart@mgsattorneys.com

Represented by Office of the General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT C. STEPHENS +1 919 814 2026 bob.stephens@nc.gov
No Logo PHILIP BERGER, Interested Party

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART K. DUNCAN +1 202 714 9492 +1 571 730 4429 KDuncan@Schaerr-Duncan.com

Represented by Law Office of Susan E Hamm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT D. POTTER, JR. +1 704 552 7742 +1 704 552 9287 rdpotter@bellsouth.net

Represented by Schaerr Duncan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gene C. Schaerr +1 202 787 1060 GSchaerr@Schaerr-Duncan.com
No Logo TIM MOORE, Interested Party

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART K. DUNCAN +1 202 714 9492 +1 571 730 4429 KDuncan@Schaerr-Duncan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gene C. Schaerr +1 202 787 1060 GSchaerr@Schaerr-Duncan.com

Represented by Law Office of Susan E Hamm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT D. POTTER, JR. +1 704 552 7742 +1 704 552 9287 rdpotter@bellsouth.net
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Timeline
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Adopt (204 in 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 204 in 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Quash and Modify Defendants Subpoenas Duces Tecum MOTION for Protective Order by Stephanie Paige Dula. Responses due by 11/17/2016 Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(SUSSMAN, JACOB) Modified on 12/16/2016 to reflect filed in error and terminated motion per 12/16/2016 TEXT Order. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SONYA PFEIFFER on behalf of Witnesses A. N., A. T., Alaina Kupep. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(PFEIFFER, SONYA) Modified on 12/16/2016 to reflect filed in error - see 12/16/2016 TEXT Order. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of Status Conference held on 09/30/2016, before Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of Status Conference held on 09/16/2016, before Magistrate Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/02/2016, before Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 63 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP(CAMPBELL, JAMES) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
LREF
Legal Document 62 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID A. NIMOCKS on behalf of Amicus Parties Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U, Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U, Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U, Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(NIMOCKS, DAVID) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY re 51 Partially Unopposed MOTION to Proceed Using Initials . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of S.B., # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of E.S., # 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of D.H.)(CAMPBELL, JAMES) Modified document title on 8/8/2016. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Partially Unopposed MOTION by NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY to Proceed Using Intitials. Responses due by 8/29/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, JAMES) Modified document title on 8/8/2016. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY. Responses due by 8/29/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, JAMES) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 11/14/2016 at 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Exhibit and witness lists and deposition designations shall be filed no later than October 24, 2016. Any objections thereto, as well as any counter-designations, shall be filed no later than November 2, 2016. Pre-trial briefs shall be submitted no later than November 7, 2016. No opposition briefs shall be allowed. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv845(Engle, Anita) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of Preliminary Injunction held on 8/1/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number (336) 734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 7/22/2016, before Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number (336) 734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/28/2016, that the Court adopts the briefing schedule set out in the Joint Notice (Doc. # 112 ) in 1:16CV425, but any issues that the parties wish to raise in these cases should still be addressed in the dispositive motions and trial briefs on the schedule set out in the July 25, 2016 Scheduling Order, so that all of the relevant issues can be addressed in November after the period of expedited discovery. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Daniel, J) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KENNETH J. CONNELLY on behalf of Plaintiff NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY (CONNELLY, KENNETH) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 07/25/2016; that the Court adopts the Joint Rule 26(f) Report and the discovery schedule set forth above. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is set for telephonic conferences at 10:00 am on August 19, 2016, September 2, 2016, September 16, 2016, and September 30, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
STATEMENT Joint Statement Regarding Overlapping Claims by Plaintiff NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY. (CAMPBELL, JAMES) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None
Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). by JOHN B. KING, JR, LORETTA E. LYNCH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(BERWICK, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None
Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). by NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY.(CAMPBELL, JAMES) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSHUA E. GARDNER on behalf of Defendants JOHN B. KING, JR, LORETTA E. LYNCH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (GARDNER, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Telephonic status conference held on 7/13/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana Nesbit, Telephone number (336)734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 07/15/2016; that this matter is set for an Initial Pretrial Conference on July 22, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 of the United States Courthouse in Winston-Salem, North Carolina. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file their Rule 26(f) Report(s), whether jointly or individually, by July 20, 2016, as noted herein. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 07/14/2016; Parties in case 1:16CV236 shall appear on Monday, August 1, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 of the Hiram H. Ward Federal Building, Winston-Salem, North Carolina, for a hearing on the Carcano Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 21 in 1:16CV236) and UNC defendants' motion to stay proceedings (Doc. 38 in 1:16CV236). Counsel for United States may participate in the hearing as set out. Trial on merits, etc. in United States' action to be consolidated with hearing on United States' motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 73 in 1:16cv425). Trial in all four HB2 cases will take place in late October or early November, 2016 depending on pretrial schedule to be determined by the Magistrate Judge as set out. Parties shall file a short joint notice identifying any agreements reached and explaining their respective positions no later than 5:00 p.m. on July 22, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah) Docket entry modified on 7/19/2016. (Powell, Gloria). (Entered: 07/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BENJAMIN L. BERWICK on behalf of Defendants JOHN B. KING, JR, LORETTA E. LYNCH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (BERWICK, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:16-cv-00245. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 12 Motion to Consolidate Cases - On its own initiative, having heard from the parties further at hearing and conference June 21, 2016, the court TRANSFERS case number 5:16-CV-240-FL and case number 5:16-CV-245-FL to the Middle District. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/29/2016. (Baker, C.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by North Carolinians for Privacy served on Defendants on 06/21/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - US Dept of Justice, # 3 Exhibit B - Loretta Lynch, # 4 Exhibit C - US Dept of Education, # 5 Exhibit D - John B King Jr, # 6 Exhibit E - US Attorney Civil Process Clerk, # 7 Exhibit F - US Attorney General, # 8 Exhibit G - James Bickford) (Campbell, James) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
*DOCUMENT CORRECTED AND REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY 33 * - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by North Carolinians for Privacy served on Defendants on 06/21/2016. (Campbell, James) Modified on 6/29/2016 to insert refiling information. (Baker, C.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan in New Bern: Telephonic Rule 16 Status Conference and Motion Hearing as to 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases held on 6/21/2016. Counsel present for all parties. Court hears oral argument as to motion and procedural posture of the case. Matters taken under advisement. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by Robert C. Stephens on behalf of Patrick McCrory. (Stephens, Robert) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None
Certificate of Service filed by Philip Berger, Tim Moore regarding 28 Notice of Appearance . (Schaerr, Gene) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by Gene C. Schaerr on behalf of Philip Berger, Tim Moore. (Schaerr, Gene) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support regarding 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Philip Berger, Tim Moore. (Duncan, Stuart) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by Robert D. Potter, Jr. on behalf of Philip Berger, Tim Moore. (Potter, Robert) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by Stuart K. Duncan on behalf of Philip Berger, Tim Moore. (Duncan, Stuart) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by North Carolinians for Privacy. (Campbell, James) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
Financial Disclosure Statement by Frank Perry. (Bowers, Karl) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
Financial Disclosure Statement by Patrick McCrory. (Stewart, William) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion regarding 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Patrick McCrory, Frank Perry. (Stewart, William) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance for non-district by Karl S. Bowers, Jr. on behalf of Patrick McCrory, Frank Perry. (Bowers, Karl) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by Frank J. Gordon on behalf of Patrick McCrory. (Gordon, Frank) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by William W. Stewart, Jr. on behalf of Patrick McCrory. (Stewart, William) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by Brennan Tyler Brooks on behalf of Patrick McCrory. (Brooks, Brennan) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by Michael James on behalf of All Defendants. (James, Michael) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition regarding 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by John B. King, Jr, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Education, United States Department of Justice. (Bickford, James) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by James O. Bickford on behalf of All Defendants. (Bickford, James) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 06/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support regarding 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by North Carolinians for Privacy. (Dewart, Deborah) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by North Carolinians for Privacy. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dewart, Deborah) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance for non-district by Jonathan Caleb Dalton on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Dalton, Jonathan) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance for non-district by John Matthew Sharp on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Sharp, John) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance for non-district counsel by Kristen K. Waggoner on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Waggoner, Kristen) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance for non-district counsel by James A. Campbell on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Campbell, James) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance for non-district counsel by Jeremy D. Tedesco on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Tedesco, Jeremy) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance for non-district counsel by Joseph E. La Rue on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (La Rue, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance for non-district counsel by David A. Cortman on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Cortman, David) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by Deborah J. Dewart on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Dewart, Deborah) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Baker, C.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
Financial Disclosure Statement by North Carolinians for Privacy. (Dewart, Deborah) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0417-3678475) filed by North Carolinians for Privacy. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons, # 4 Proposed Summons, # 5 Proposed Summons, # 6 Proposed Summons) (Dewart, Deborah) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/29/2016.] (Entered: 05/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 244 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?