Hylton v. Everalbum, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:16-cv-01346
District Judge G. Kendall Sharp, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 10, 2016 at 1:14 AM ST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Racquel Hylton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Normand Law, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob Lawrence Phillips +1 407 603 6031

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 209

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund Alonso Normand +1 407 625 9043 Ed@ednormand.com
v.
No Logo Everalbum, Inc., Defendant
Citation Restrictions on Use of Telephone Equipment
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Request for Oral Argument
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Extend Time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Order to comply with electronic filing
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting 24 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Mazda K. Antia and Darcie A. Tilly terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/26/2016. (RDO) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Compliance notice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting 15 motion for Mazda K. Antia to appear pro hac vice; granting 16 motion for Darcie A. Tilly to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/7/16. (RDO) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Interested persons order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of compliance re 7 Order to comply with electronic filing by Racquel Hylton (Attachments: # 1 Email Confirming Compliance)(Phillips, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER for attorney Jacob Lawrence Phillips to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/29/2016. (NBL) copies mailed/e-mailed (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/29/2016. (NBL) copies mailed/e-mailed (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/29/2016. (NBL) copies mailed/e-mailed (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER reassigning this case to another District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 7/28/2016. (SC) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Case reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:16-cv-1346-Orl-40-KRS. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (SWT) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        SUMMONS issued as to Everalbum, Inc. (SWT) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          COMPLAINT for damages and injunctive relief against Everalbum, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL-55454) filed by Racquel Hylton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SWT) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,512 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?