IYM Technologies LLC v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00649

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 25, 2021 at 9:18 AM DT (3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Iym Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Farnan +1 302 777 0338 +1 302 421 5870 mfarnan@farnanlaw.com
v.
Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Spansion Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd Investments, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd (u.s.) Holdings, Inc.
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CLAIM Construction Chart by IYM Technologies LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit opening claim construction briefs to through and including June 22, 2017 - filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          REDACTED VERSION of 61 Letter by IYM Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 by IYM Technologies LLC (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER - IYM's motion to compel (D.I. 50 ) is GRANTED; AMD shall produce documents and information responsive to IYM's discovery requests: Request for Productions Nos. 14, 30, 31, 65-70 and Interrogatory No. 5; AMD's Motion for Sanctions (D.I. 37 ) is DENIED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/23/2017. (mdb) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                [SEALED] MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 - filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2017 (mdb). (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  REDACTED VERSION of 56 Letter by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to AMD's May 10, 2017 Letter - re 56 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      [SEALED] DECLARATION of Barry K. Shelton re 59 Reply Brief by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 5/16/2017 (mdb). (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 37 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          REDACTED VERSION of 54 Declaration of Robert A. Whitman by IYM Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-17)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 5/15/2017 (mdb). (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            REDACTED VERSION of 53 Answering Brief in Opposition by IYM Technologies LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding response to IYM's letter dated May 3, 2017 - re 50 Letter, Telephone Conference,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                REDACTED VERSION of 50 Letter by IYM Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  [SEALED] DECLARATION of Robert A. Whitman re 53 Answering Brief in Opposition by IYM Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 5/9/2017 (mdb). (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 37 MOTION for Sanctions filed by IYM Technologies LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/15/2017. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.'s Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Proposed Claim Constructions filed by IYM Technologies LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            STIPULATION Regarding Letter Briefing Schedule by IYM Technologies LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              REDACTED VERSION of 40 Declaration by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                REDACTED VERSION of 39 Declaration by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 38 Opening Brief in Support by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.'s Disclosure of Terms to be Construed filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Terms to be Construed filed by IYM Technologies LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.'s First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff IYM Technologies LLC's Interrogatory No. 2 filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file its Response to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 to 5/8/2017 - filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Michael J. Farnan regarding Agenda for April 24, 2017 Discovery Teleconference. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION of Barry K. Shelton re 38 Opening Brief in Support, 37 MOTION for Sanctions by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 4/17/2017 (mdb). (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION of James Pattison re 38 Opening Brief in Support, 37 MOTION for Sanctions by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 4/17/2017 (mdb). (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 37 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/27/2017. (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for Sanctions - filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Micro Devices, Inc.'s Invalidity Contentions filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Initial Infringement Claim Charts filed by IYM Technologies LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Firm and Address for Barry K. Shelton by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff IYM Technologies LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production [Nos. 1-29] and (ii) Plaintiff IYM Technologies LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories [Nos. 1-5] filed by IYM Technologies LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff IYM Technologies LLC's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-11) and (2) Plaintiff IYM Technologies LLC's First Set of Request for Production (Nos. 1-75) filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard For Discovery filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff IYM Technologies LLC's Disclosure of Accused Products filed by IYM Technologies LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff IYM Technologies LLC's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by IYM Technologies LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff IYM Technologies LLC's Initial Disclosure Statement filed by IYM Technologies LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: A teleconference has been scheduled for 10/24/17 at 9:30 AM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge to be initiated by defense counsel. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/12/16. (cak) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Advanced Micro Devices Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to IYM Technologies LLC (1-5) and Advanced Micro Devices Inc.'s First Set of Document Requests to IYM Technologies LLC (1-29) filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Protective Order by IYM Technologies LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian E. Farnan (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff IYM Technologies LLC's First Set of Interrogatories [Nos. 1-11] and (ii) Plaintiff IYM Technologies LLC's First Set of Requests for Production [Nos. 1-75] filed by IYM Technologies LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/12/2016 at 9:30 AM Eastern Time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/1/16. (cak) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order by IYM Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF re 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 11/22/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For AMD to submit its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss to November 21, 2016 - filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by IYM Technologies LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/7/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrea Pacelli - filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by IYM Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Motion to Dismiss to October 26, 2016 - filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      OPENING BRIEF in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/11/2016. (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Chibib, Barry K. Shelton and Brian C. Nash - filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/13/2016. (asw) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Cottrell, III on behalf of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                First STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 22, 2016 - filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Raskin, Robert Whitman, and Charles Wizenfeld - filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by IYM Technologies LLC. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. served on 8/1/2016, answer due 8/22/2016. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,448,012 B1;. (sar) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate General Patent Corporation for IYM Technologies LLC filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1971897.) - filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?