Coon-Retelle v. Verizon New England Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-11530
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 8:38 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shari L. Coon-Retelle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Regnante, Sterio & Osborne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth H. Hochbaum +1 617 246 2525 +1 781 246 0202 shochbaum@regnante.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura M. Kahl +1 781 246 2525 lkahl@regnante.com
v.
No Logo Alexander W. Moore, Defendant
No Logo Donna C. Cupelo, Defendant
No Logo Matthew D. Ellis, Defendant
No Logo Paul L. Mattiola, Defendant
Verizon New England, Inc. Verizon New England, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Molly A. Clayton +1 617 946 4833 mmooney@seyfarth.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Fisher +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 rfisher@seyfarth.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur G. Telegen +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 atelegen@seyfarth.com
No Logo W. Robert Mudge, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura M. Kahl on behalf of Shari L. Coon-Retelle (Kahl, Laura) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Seth H. Hochbaum on behalf of Shari L. Coon-Retelle (Hochbaum, Seth) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due by cob 8/15/16. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None
        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 15, 2016 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Verizon New England Inc..(Fisher, Robert) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Verizon New England Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Verizon New England Inc... (Fisher, Robert) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Telegen on behalf of Verizon New England Inc. (Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Molly A. Clayton on behalf of Verizon New England Inc. (Clayton, Molly) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Fisher on behalf of Verizon New England Inc. (Fisher, Robert) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
                  Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Verizon New England Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6217942 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form, # 3 Exhibit A - Complaint, # 4 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit C - Summons, CA Cover Sheet, Process)(Fisher, Robert) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 121 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?