District Agency Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Central District Court USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board
  1. Case No. CBM2014-00008
    Filed 10/11/2013
  2. Case No. CBM2014-00176
    Filed 8/15/2014
Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  1. Case No. 16-1272
    Filed 12/1/2015
  2. Case No. 16-2001
    Filed 5/5/2016
United States Supreme Court

Westlake Services, LLC d/b/a/ Westlake Financial Services v. Credit Acceptance Corporation
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. CBM2014-00008

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Westlake Services, Llc. Dba Westlake Financial Services, Petitioner
v.
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Patent Owner
Technology Center 3600
Institution Decision Date 3/31/2014
Related Patent Application Number 10037055
Related Patent Number 6950807
Status Final Written Decision
  Entries (90) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 66 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Final Decision
Final Written Decision
    LREF
    Legal Document 65 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Order
    Record of Oral Hearing
      LREF
      Legal Document 1011 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
      Petitioner's Demonstrative for Oral Hearing - corrected
        LREF
        Legal Document 2021 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
        Oral Hearing Demonstratives
          LREF
          Legal Document 2020 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
          Patent Owner's Demonstrative for the Trial Hearing
            LREF
            Legal Document 1011 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
            Petitioner's Oral Hearing Demonstrative
              LREF
              Legal Document 64 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Notice
              Patent Owner's Notice of Filing Demonstrative Exhibit
                LREF
                Legal Document 63 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Motion
                Objection to CAC demonstratives
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Reply
                  Petitioner's Reply to Patent Owner's Opposition to Motion to Exclude Evidence
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Reply
                    Patent Owner Reply In Support of Its Motion to Exclude
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Opposition
                      Patent Owner's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Exclude
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Motion
                        Opposition to Motion to Exclude Evidence 011
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Notice
                          Order - Trial Hearing
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2019 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Preliminary Examination Instructions (June 25, 2014)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2018 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Excerpt from Decl. of John van Loben Sels (C.D. Cal.)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                Patent Owner's Motion to Exclude Evidence
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                  Patent Owner's Request For Oral Argument
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                    Motion to Exclude Evidence
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                      Request for Oral Hearing
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Order
                                        Decision on Motion to Withdraw
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                          Petitioner's Counsel Request for Withdrawal as Counsel
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                            Updated Mandatory Notices for Petition for Post-Grant Review Under Section 18 of the Leahy-Smith America Invents Act
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                              Notice of Refund
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                Westlake Services, LLC's Request for Refund of Excess Claim Fees
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1010 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Deposition Transcript of Nerenberg
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1009 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Deposition Transcript of Jeff Parmet
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                      ORDER Conduct of the Proceeding
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Reply
                                                        Petitioner's Reply to Patent Owner's Response Under 37
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                          Expunge
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 45 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                            Expunge
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                              ORDER Conduct of the Proceeding
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                Second Updated Mandatory Notices
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                  Notice of Deposition of John Nerenberg
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                    Updated Mandatory Notices
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                      Order - Conduct of the Proceeding 37 C.F.R. 42.5
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2017 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        Supervisory Insights, FDIC
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 2016 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                          CRS Advanced Tech. v. Frontline Tech. (CBM2012-00005)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2015 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            Excerpt from Webster's Dictionary of Computer Terms (8th)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 2014 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                              Excerpt from Webster's Dictionary of Computer Terms (3d)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 2013 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Excerpt from Microsoft Computer Dictionary
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 2012 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Excerpt from Barron's Dictionary of Finance
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 2011 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    Excerpt from Black's Law Dictionary
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 2010 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Excerpt from Dictionary of Banking and Financial Services
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 2009 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Excerpt from Merriam-Webster's Collegiate Dictionary
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 2008 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                          Declaration of John Nerenberg
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 2007 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                            Deposition Transcript of Jeff Parmet
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                                              Patent Owner Response
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                Patent Owner's Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                  Order - Conduct of the Proceeding
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                    DECISION Petitioner's Request for Rehearing
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                      Patent Owner's List of Proposed Motions
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                        Westlake List of Proposed Motions
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                          Joint Stipulation Regarding Due Date 1
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Rehearing Request - in re Institution Decision Granted
                                                                                                            Westlake Request for Rehearing
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                              Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                                                                                Decision - Institution of Covered Business Method Patent review
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2006 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                  Credit Acceptance Corp. v. Westlake Services, LLC, Plaintiff's Preliminary Infringement Contentions dated June 28, 2013
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2005 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                    Excerpt from Modern Dictionary of Electronics (7th ed. 1999)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2004 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                      '807 Patent File Wrapper
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2003 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                        Credit Acceptance Corporation 10-Q (filed Oct. 30, 2013)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2002 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                          Credit Acceptance Corporation 10-K (filed Feb. 20, 2013)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2001 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                            Fortune Magazine "100 Best Companies to Work For" (Jan. 2014)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                                                                                              Preliminary Response by Patent Owner Credit Acceptance Corporation Under 37 CFR 42.207
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                Decision PO motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Paramjeet Singh Sammi ISO Motion For Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                    Credit Acceptance Corp. Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                      Notice Accepting Corrected Petition
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                        Related Matters
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                          Related Matters
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                            Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                              Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                  Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Corrected CBM Petition including Mandatory Notices
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Date Accorded
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1008 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Trial Practice Guide
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1007 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          Changes to Federal Register Final Rules for CBM Patents
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1006 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                            J. Parmet Expert Declaration and CV
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1005 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                              Complaint for Infringement
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1004 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                Guide to AIA
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1003 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                  Classification Definitions Section 705
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1002 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                    Federal Register Final Rules for CBM Patents
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1001 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                      US6950807
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                        Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service for Mandatory Notices
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                                                                                                            Mandatory Notices
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service for POA
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service for Petition and Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                    Petition for Covered Business Method Review of US6950807
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 297 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?