District Agency Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Central District Court USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board
  1. Case No. CBM2014-00008
    Filed 10/11/2013
  2. Case No. CBM2014-00176
    Filed 8/15/2014
Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  1. Case No. 16-1272
    Filed 12/1/2015
  2. Case No. 16-2001
    Filed 5/5/2016
United States Supreme Court

Westlake Services, LLC d/b/a Westlake Financial Services of Los Angeles, CA v. Credit Acceptance Corporation
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. CBM2014-00176

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Westlake Services, LLC d/b/a Westlake Financial Services of Los Angeles, CA, Petitioner
v.
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Patent Owner
Technology Center 3600
Institution Decision Date 2/9/2015
Related Patent Application Number 10037055
Related Patent Number 6950807
Status Final Written Decision
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 47 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
Patent Owner Credit Acceptance Corporation's Notice of Appeal
    LREF
    Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Final Decision
    Final Written Decision
      LREF
      Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Notice
      Patent Owner Updated Mandatory Notices
        LREF
        Legal Document 44 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Notice
        Record of Oral Hearing
          LREF
          Legal Document 2006 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
          Patent Owner Demonstrative
            LREF
            Legal Document 1015 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
            Ex 1015 Westlake v CAC Oral Hearing
              LREF
              Legal Document 43 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Notice
              Petitioner's Submission of Demonstrative Exhibit for Oral Argument
                LREF
                Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Notice
                Patent Owner's Notice of Filing Demonstrative Exhibit
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Order
                  Conference Call Summary and Order - Conduct of the Proceeding
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Notice
                    Petitioner's Notice of Supplemental Authority
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2005 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Civil Docket for Credit Acceptance Corp. v. Westlake Services, LLC, et al. (C.D. Cal.)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2004 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Minute Order Granting Motion (C.D. Cal.)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Notice
                          Patent Owner's Current Exhibit List
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Notice
                            Patent Owner's Updated Mandatory Notices
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Notice
                              ORDER Trial Hearing
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Motion
                                Request for Oral Hearing
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1014 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Discovery Letters A-E
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1013 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    U.S. Patent Publication No. US 2001/0049653
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1012 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      U.S. Patent No. 5,774,883
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Reply
                                        Petitioner's Reply
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                          Notice of Refund
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                            Patent Owner Updated Mandatory Notices
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                              Conference Call Summary and Order - Conduct of the Proceeding 37 C.F.R. 42.5
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Refund Request
                                                Request for Refund
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Refund Request
                                                  Request for Refund
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                    Denying Petitioner's Request for Authorizing to File Motion to Compel Inventor Deposition
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                      Order - Patent Owner's Motion to Terminate
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Opposition
                                                        Patent Owner Response
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Motion
                                                          Response to Patent Owner Motion to Terminate
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Motion
                                                            Patent Owner's Motion to Terminate
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                              Order Authorizing Motion to Terminate - Conduct of the Proceeding - 37 CFR 42.5 and 42.20(b)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                                Patent Owner Updated Mandatory Notices
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                                  Patent Owner Updated Power of Attorney
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Motion
                                                                    Petitioner's List of Proposed Motions
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Motion
                                                                      Updated Mandatory Notice
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                                        Initial Conference Summary and Order
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                                          Patent Owner's List of Proposed Motions
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                                            Joint Stipulation Regarding Due Dates
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Scheduling Order
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                                                Decision Institution of Covered Business Method Patent Review
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 2003 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Minute Order Continuing Stay (C.D. Cal.)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 2002 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause (C.D. Cal.)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                                                      Preliminary Response by Patent Owner Credit Acceptance Corporation
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        Order Conduct of the Proceedings
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Decision Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Decision on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                              Petitioner's Counsel Request for Withdrawal as Counsel
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 2001 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                Affidavit of P. Sammi ISO Motion For Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                  Credit Acceptance Corp. Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                    Patent Owner Mandatory Notices
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                      Power of Attorney
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                        Notice of Accepting Corrected Petition
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 1011 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                          Exhibit 1011 - Joint Claim Construction Chart and Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 1011 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                            Exhibit 1011 - Joint Claim Construction Chart and Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1010 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                              Exhibit 1010 - U.S. Patent No. 6,182,052
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1010 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                Exhibit 1010 - U.S. Patent No. 6,182,052
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1009 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                  Exhibit 1009 - In Re TR Labs Patent Litigation Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1009 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                    Exhibit 1009 - In Re TR Labs Patent Litigation Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1008 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                      Exhibit 1008 - Office Patent Trial Practice Guide, 77 Fed. Reg. 157 (August 14, 2012)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1007 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                        Exhibit 1007 - Changes to Implement Inter Partes Review Proceedings, Post-Grant Review Proceedings, and Transitional Program for Covered Business Method Patents, 77 Fed. 157 (August 14, 2012)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1006 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                          Exhibit 1006 - Declaration and Curriculum Vitae of Steven R. Kursh, Ph.D., CSDP, CLP
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1005 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                            Exhibit 1005 - Credit Acceptance Corp. Complaint for Patent Infringement against Westlake Financial Services, LLC, filed March 4, 2013, Credit Acceptance Corp. v Westlake Financial Services, LLC Litigation, Case No. 2-13-cv- 01523-SJO-MRW
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1004 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                              Exhibit 1004 - A Guide to the Legislative History of the America Invents Act, Part II of II, 21 Fed. Cir. Bar J. No. 4
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1003 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                Exhibit 1003 - United States Patent and Trademark Office - Classification Definitions Class 705
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1002 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  Exhibit 1002 - Transitional Program for Covered Business Method Patents - Definitions of Covered Business Method Patent and Technological Invention, 77 Fed. Reg. 157 (August 14, 2012)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1001 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 1001 - U.S. Patent No. 6,950,807 (the 807 Patent)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                      Amended Petition for Post-Grant Review Under 35 USC Sections 321 and 18 of the Leahy-Smith America Invents Act
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition and Defective Petition
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1011 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                          Joint Claim Construction Chart and Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1010 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                            U.S. Patent No. 6,182,052
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1009 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                              In Re TR Labs Patent Litigation Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1008 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                Office Patent Trial Practice Guide, 77 Fed. Reg. 157 (August 14, 2012)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1007 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                  Changes to Implement Inter Partes Review Proceedings, Post-Grant Review Proceedings, and Transitional Program for Covered Business Method Patents, 77 Fed. 157 (August 14, 2012)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1006 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                    Declaration and Curriculum Vitae of Steven R. Kursh, Ph.D., CSDP, CLP
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1005 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                      Credit Acceptance Corp. Complaint for Patent Infringement against Westlake Financial Services, LLC, filed March 4, 2013, Credit Acceptance Corp. v Westlake Financial Services, LLC Litigation, Case No. 2 13-cv- 01523-SJO-MRW
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1004 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        A Guide to the Legislative History of the America Invents Act, Part II of II, 21 Fed. Cir. Bar J. No. 4
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1003 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          United States Patent and Trademark Office - Classification Definitions, Class 705
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1002 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                            Transitional Program for Covered Business Method Patents - Definitions of Covered Business Method Patent and Technological Invention, 77 Fed. Reg. 157 (August 14, 2012)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1001 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                              U.S. Patent No. 6,950,807 (the 807 Patent)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                                                                                                  Power of Attorney Under 37 CFR Section 42.10(b)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                                                                                                    Petition for Post-Grant Review Under 35 USC Section 321 and Section 18 of the Leahy-Smith America Invents Act
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 217 times.

                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?