District Agency Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board
  1. Case No. CBM2014-00159
    Filed 7/21/2014
  2. Case No. CBM2015-00067
    Filed 1/29/2015
Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit United States Supreme Court

Square, Inc. v. Think Computer Corporation
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. CBM2015-00067

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Square, Inc. Square, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Patent Owner
Technology Center 3600
Institution Decision Date 7/2/2015
Related Patent Application Number 12641071
Related Patent Number 8396808
Status Terminated
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: None Notice
Decision on Request for Rehearing - 37 C.F.R. 42.5, 42.71(d)
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Notice
    Order Mortion to Withdraw as Counsel
      LREF
      Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/15/2015, Entered: None Motion
      Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Patent Owner
        LREF
        Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Order
        Order - Conduct of Proceeding
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Motion
          Expunged
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Rehearing Request - in re Institution Decision Granted
            PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR REHEARING
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Decision Denying Institution
              Decision Denying Covered Business Method Patent Review
                LREF
                Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Order
                Order Conduct of Proceeding
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Opposition
                  Patent Owner's Preliminary Response - Sur-Reply
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1028 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Exhibit 1028 - 4.2.2015 Email
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1027 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Exhibit 1027 - 4.1.2015 Email
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1026 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Exhibit 1026 - 3.31.2015 Email
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Reply
                          Reply to Preliminary Response
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Notice
                            Order - Conduct of Proceeding 37 C.F.R. 42.5
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                              Think Computer Corp. Preliminary Response
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                Power of Attorney
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                  Related Matters
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                    Power of Attorney
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                      Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1025 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Exhibit 1025 - Wong
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1024 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Exhibit 1024 - Pousttchi
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1023 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Exhibit 1023 - Zmijewska
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1022 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Exhibit 1022 - Dahlberg
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1021 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Exhibit 1021 - Ondrus
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1020 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Exhibit 1020 - Dahlberg
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1019 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Exhibit 1019 - Hsu
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1018 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Exhibit 1018 - International ISBN Agency Website
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1017 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Exhibit 1017 - IADIS Conference Materials
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1016 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Exhibit 1016 - Ondrus II
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1015 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Exhibit 1015 - Expert Declaration
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1014 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Exhibit 1014 - Think Computer v. Square Complaint
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1013 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                Exhibit 1013 - U.S. Patent Pub. No. 20020143655 to Elston et al
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1012 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  Exhibit 1012 - WO 2006000021 to Ogilvy
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1011 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    Exhibit 1011 - U.S. Patent Pub. No. 20070255652 to Tumminaro et al
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1010 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      Exhibit 1010 - WO 2007008686 to Deschryver
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1009 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        Exhibit 1009 - U.S. Patent Pub. No. 20060143087 to Tripp et al
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1008 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                          Exhibit 1008 - U.S. Patent Pub. No. 20070185785 to Carlson et al
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1007 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            Exhibit 1007 - Ondrus and Pigneur
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1006 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                              Exhibit 1006 - U.S. Patent Pub. No. 20030204447 to Dalzell et al
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1005 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Exhibit 1005 - U.S. Patent Pub. No. 20080046366 to Bemmel et al
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1004 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Exhibit 1004 - File History of U.S. Patent No. 8,396,808 - Part 1 of 2
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1004 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    Exhibit 1004 - File History of U.S. Patent No. 8,396,808 - Part 2 of 2
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1003 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Exhibit 1003 - Norman M. Sadeh-Koniecpol, Ph.D., curriculum vitae
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1001 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Exhibit 1001 - U.S. Patent No. 8,396,808 to Greenspan
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                          Motion for Joinder
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                            Petition for Covered Business Method Patent Review
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                              Related Matters
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                Power of Attorney
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 340 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?