SAP America Inc. v. Clouding IP, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2014-00299

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

SAP America, Inc. SAP America, Inc., Petitioner
v.
No Logo Clouding IP, LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 7/9/2014
Related Patent Application Number 09848394
Related Patent Number 6925481
Status Terminated
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 7/9/2014
Related Patent Application Number 09848394
Related Patent Number 6925481
Status Terminated
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Notice
Expunged
    LREF
    Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Final Decision
    Judgment - Termination of the Proceeding
      LREF
      Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Notice
      Patent Owner's Updated Exhibit List
        LREF
        Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Notice
        Parties' Joint Request for Confidential Treatment
          LREF
          Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Motion
          Parties' Joint Motion to Terminate Proceeding
            LREF
            Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Notice
            Notice of Deposition of Mohapatra
              LREF
              Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Notice
              Patent Owner's Updated Mandatory Notices
                LREF
                Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                Power of Attorney
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2001 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Ex. 2001 Declaration of Prasant Mohapatra
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Opposition
                    Patent Owner Response to Petition
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Notice
                      Notice of deposition of Dr. Bederson
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Notice
                        District Court Decision on Patent Ownership
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Order
                          Order - Conduct of the Proceedings - 37 CFR 42.5
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Order
                            Decision - Request for Rehearing
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                              Order - re Correction of Statement in Institution Decision
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Rehearing Request - in re Institution Decision Granted
                                Request For Rehearing
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Order
                                  Order Conduct of the Proceeding
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Order
                                    Scheduling Order
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                      Decision Institution of Inter Partes Review
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                        Patent Owner's Preliminary Response
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Order
                                          Notice of Accepting Corrected Petition
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                            Corrected Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                              Related Matters
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1009 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Exhibit 1009 - Bederson Dec
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1008 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Exhibit 1008 - Barrett et al (April 1998)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1007 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Exhibit 1007 - Flynn et al (Dec 2000)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1006 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Exhibit 1006 - US7269664
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1005 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Exhibit 1005 - US6670968
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1004 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Exhibit 1004 - Excerpts of Prosecution History 09848,394
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1003 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Exhibit 1003 - Decision in IPR2013-00075
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1002 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                Exhibit 1002 - Petition in IPR2013-00075
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1001 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  Exhibit 1001 - US6925481
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                    Power of Attorney
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                                                      Petition For Inter Partes Review of US Patent 6,925,481
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?