Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. v. Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2014-00514

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2019 at 11:28 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Petitioner
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd."
v.
No Logo Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 9/9/2014
Related Patent Application Number 12543910
Related Patent Number 8023580
Status Terminated
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 9/9/2014
Related Patent Application Number 12543910
Related Patent Number 8023580
Status Terminated
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Refund Approval
Notice of Refund
    LREF
    Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Notice
    Petitioners Request for Refund
      LREF
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Rehearing Decision - in re Institution Decision Granted
      Decision - Request for Rehearing
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Rehearing Request - in re Institution Decision Granted
        Petitioners Request For Rehearing
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Institution Decision
          Decision - Denying Institution of Inter Partes Review
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Notice
            District Court Claim Construction
              LREF
              Legal Document 1020 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
              Transcript of 2014.07.21 Telephonic Conference Call
                LREF
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Notice
                Samsung Supplemental Exhibit List
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Order
                  Order - Conduct of the Proceedings - 37 CFR 42.5
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2013 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Exhibit 2013
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2012 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Exhibit 2012
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2011 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Exhibit 2011
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2010 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Exhibit 2010
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2009 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Exhibit 2009
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2008 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Exhibit 2008
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2007 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Exhibit 2007
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2006 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Exhibit 2006
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2005 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Exhibit 2005
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2004 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Exhibit 2004
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 2003 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Exhibit 2003
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 2002 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Exhibit 2002
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 2001 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Exhibit 2001
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                              Preliminary Response
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                PO Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                  Order - Conduct of the Proceedings - 37 CFR 42.5
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                    Motion_For_Withdrawal
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                      Related Matters
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                        Power of Attorney
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                          Order - Authorizing Counsel for Patent Owner to file Motion to Withdraw
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                            Related Matters
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                              Power of Attorney
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                Notice of Accepting Corrected Petition
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                  Amended Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                    Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1019 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      Goodman Declaration
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1018 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        Commuications dictionary master slave
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1017 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                          Draft Joint Claim Construction Statement
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1016 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            Boer US5706428
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1015 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                              Amendment After Allowance
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1014 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Notice of Allowances and Fees Due
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1013 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  5.11.2011 Supplemental Amendment
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1012 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    3.10.2011 Response
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1011 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      3.1.2011 Reply
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1010 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        OA
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1009 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                          App. as filed
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 1008 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                            IEEE Dictionary
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 1007 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                              Infringement Contentions
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 1006 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                802.11 Std.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1005 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                  Draft 802.11 Std.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1004 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                    O'Hara Declaration
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 1003 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                      Proof of Service
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1002 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                        Complaint
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 1001 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                          Patent No. US 8,023,580
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                            Power of Attorney
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                              Petition for Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 8,023,580
                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?