Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. v. Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2014-00515

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Petitioner
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd."
v.
No Logo Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 9/9/2014
Related Patent Application Number 12543910
Related Patent Number 8023580
Status Terminated
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 9/9/2014
Related Patent Application Number 12543910
Related Patent Number 8023580
Status Terminated
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Refund Approval
Notice of Refund
    LREF
    Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Refund Request
    Petitioners Request for Refund
      LREF
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Rehearing Decision - in re Institution Decision Granted
      Decision on Request for Rehearing
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Rehearing Request - in re Institution Decision Granted
        Petitioners Request For Rehearing
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Institution Decision
          Decision - Denying Institution of Inter Partes Review
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Notice
            District Court Claim Construction
              LREF
              Legal Document 1117 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
              Transcript of 2014.07.21 Telephonic Conference Call
                LREF
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Notice
                Samsung Supplemental Exhibit List
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Order
                  Order - Conduct of the Proceedings - 37 CFR 42.5
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2108 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Exhibit 2108
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2107 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Exhibit 2107
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2106 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Exhibit 2106
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2105 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Exhibit 2105
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2104 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Exhibit 2104
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2103 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Exhibit 2103
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2102 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Exhibit 2102
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2101 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Exhibit 2101
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                    Preliminary Response
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                      PO Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                        Order - Conduct of the Proceedings - 37 CFR 42.5
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                          Motion_for_Withdrawal
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                            Related Matters
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                              Power of Attorney
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                Order - Authorizing Counsel for Patent Owner to file Motion to Withdraw
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                  Related Matters
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                    Power of Attorney
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                      Notice of Accepting Corrected Petition
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                        Amended Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                          Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1116 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Goodman Declaration
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1115 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Amendment after Allowance
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1114 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                Notice of Allowance and Fees Due
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1113 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  Supplemental Amendment
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1112 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    3.10.2011 Response
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1111 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      3.1.2011 Reply
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1110 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        OA
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1109 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                          App as filed
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1108 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            IEEE Dictionary
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1107 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                              Infringement Contentions
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1106 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                802.11 Std.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1105 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Draft 802.11 Std.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1104 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    O'Hara Declaration
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1103 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Proof of Service
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1102 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Complaint
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1101 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                          U.S. Patent No. 8,023,580
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                            Power of Attorney
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                              Petition for Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 8,023,580
                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?