Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. v. Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2014-00518

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2019 at 11:28 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Petitioner
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd."
v.
No Logo Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 9/23/2014
Related Patent Application Number 12543910
Related Patent Number 8023580
Status Final Written Decision
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 9/23/2014
Related Patent Application Number 12543910
Related Patent Number 8023580
Status Final Written Decision
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 47 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Final Decision
Final Written Decision - 35 U.S.C. 318(a) and 37 C.F.R. 42.73
    LREF
    Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Notice
    Record of Oral Hearing
      LREF
      Legal Document 2218 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
      Exhibit 2218 - Patent Owner's Demonstratives
        LREF
        Legal Document 1239 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
        Petitioners' Demonstratives
          LREF
          Legal Document 45 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Notice
          Patent Owner's Demonstratives and Updated Exhibit List
            LREF
            Legal Document 44 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Notice
            Petitioners' Updated Exhibit List - 4-22-2015
              LREF
              Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Notice
              ORDER Trial Hearing Notice
                LREF
                Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice
                Petitioners' Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Notice
                  DECISION Petitioner's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Mr. Biddinger
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Order
                    Order Conduct of Proceedings
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Motion
                      Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brian P. Biddinger
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Motion
                        Petitioners_ Motion to Change Designation of Lead Counsel (IPR2014-00518)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Motion
                          Petitioners_ Motion to Withdraw As Counsel (IPR2014-00518)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                            Power of Attorney
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Notice
                              Patent Owner's Request for Oral Argument
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                Petitioners Request for Oral Hearing
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                  Power of Attorney
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1238 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Koopman Deposition Transcript
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1237 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Order, Innovative Biometric Tech., LLC v Lenovo (U.S.), Inc.
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1236 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Order, Innovative Biometric Tech., LLC v Toshiba Am. Info. Sys.
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1235 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          U.S. Patent No. 5,535,212
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1234 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            U.S. Patent No. 5,436,901
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1233 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              U.S. Patent No. 5,450,404
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1232 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Data Network Evaluation Criteria
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1231 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Illustration Drawn by Dr. Jones
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1230 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Illustration Drawn by Dr. Jones
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1229 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Illustration Drawn by Dr. Jones
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1228 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Illustration Drawn by Dr. Jones
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1227 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Illustration Drawn by Dr. Jones
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1226 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Illustration Drawn by Dr. Jones
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1225 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Illustration Drawn by Dr. Jones
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1224 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                Illustration Drawn by Dr. Jones
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1223 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  U.S. Patent No. 8,457,228
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1222 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    Notice of Deposition
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1221 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      Jones Deposition Transcript
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None reply
                                                                        Petitioner Reply
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                                          PO Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                                            Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                                              Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                Notice of Deposition of Dr. Philip Koopman
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                  Notice of Deposition of Dr. Christopher Jones
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                    Patent Owner's Supplemental Mandatory Notice Information Under 37 C.F.R. 42.8
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 2217 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Exhibit 2217
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 2216 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Exhibit 2216
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 2215 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                          Exhibit 2215
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 2214 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                            Exhibit 2214
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 2213 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                              Exhibit 2213
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 2212 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                Exhibit 2212
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 2211 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                  Exhibit 2211
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 2210 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                    Exhibit 2210
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 2209 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                      Exhibit 2209
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 2208 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                        Exhibit 2208
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                                                          Patent Owner's Response Pursuant to 37 C.F.R. 42.120
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                            Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                              Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                  Notice of Goodman Deposition
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                    ORDER Conduct of the Proceeding
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                      Petitioner Proposed Motions
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                        PO Proposed Motions
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                          Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                                                                                            Decision - Institution of Inter Partes Review
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                              District Court Claim Construction
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2207 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                Exhibit 2207
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2206 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  Exhibit 2206
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2205 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 2205
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2204 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                      Exhibit 2204
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2203 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                        Exhibit 2203
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2202 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                          Exhibit 2202
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2201 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                            Exhibit 2201
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                                                                                                              Preliminary Response
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                PO Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                  Order - Conduct of the Proceedings - 37 CFR 42.5
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Motion_For_Withdrawal
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                      Related Matters
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                        Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                          Order - Authorizing Counsel for Patent Owner to file Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                            Related Matters
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                              Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Accepting Corrected Petition
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1220 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                      Goodman Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1219 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                        Communications Dictionary Master Slave
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1218 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                          Mears Declaration and Upender
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1217 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Constructions
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1216 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                              Octobet 1, 2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1215 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                838 June 28 2001 OA
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1214 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                  U.S. Patent 6,614,838
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1213 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment after Allowance
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1212 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Allowance and Fees Due
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1211 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                        5.11.2011 Supplemental Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1210 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                          3.10.2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1209 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                            3.1.2011 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1208 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                              OA
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1207 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                App as filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1206 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                  IEEE Dictionary
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1205 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Infringement Contentions
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1204 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Boer US5706428
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1203 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1202 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1201 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                            U.S. Patent No. 8,023,580
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Petition for Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 8,023,580
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?