Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. v. Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2014-00519

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2019 at 11:28 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Petitioner
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd."
v.
No Logo Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 9/23/2014
Related Patent Application Number 12543910
Related Patent Number 8023580
Status Final Written Decision
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 9/23/2014
Related Patent Application Number 12543910
Related Patent Number 8023580
Status Final Written Decision
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Final Decision
Final Written Decision - 35 USC 318(a) and 37 CFR 42.73
    LREF
    Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Notice
    Record of Oral Hearing
      LREF
      Legal Document 2311 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
      Exhibit 21311 - Patent Owner's Demonstratives
        LREF
        Legal Document 1326 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
        Petitioners' Demonstratives
          LREF
          Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Notice
          Patent Owner's Demonstratives and Updated Exhibit List
            LREF
            Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Notice
            Petitioners' Updated Exhibit List - 4-22-2015
              LREF
              Legal Document 45 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Notice
              ORDER Trial Hearing Notice
                LREF
                Legal Document 44 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice
                Petitioners' Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Notice
                  DECISION - Petitioner's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Mr. Biddinger
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Order
                    Order Conduct of Proceedings
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Motion
                      Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brian P. Biddinger
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                        Power of Attorney
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Motion
                          Petitioners_ Motion to Change Designation of Lead Counsel (IPR2014-00519)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Motion
                            Petitioners_ Motion to Withdraw As Counsel (IPR2014-00519)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Notice
                              Patent Owner's Request for Oral Argument
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                Petitioners Request for Oral Hearing
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                  Power of Attorney
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1325 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Order, Innovative Biometric Tech., LLC v Lenovo (U.S.), Inc.
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1324 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Order, Innovative Biometric Tech., LLC v Toshiba Am. Info. Sys.
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1323 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        U.S. Patent No. 5,535,212
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1322 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          U.S. Patent No. 5,436,901
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1321 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            U.S. Patent No. 5,450,404
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1320 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Data Network Evaluation Criteria
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1319 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Koopman Deposition Transcript
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None reply
                                                  Petitioner Reply
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                    PO Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                      Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                        Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Deposition of Dr. Christopher Jones
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                            Notice of Deposition of Dr. Philip Koopman
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                              Notice of Deposition of Dr. Christopher Jones
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                Patent Owner's Supplemental Mandatory Notice Information Under 37 C.F.R. 42.8
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                  Patent Owner's Notice of Filing of Disclaimer Under 37 C.F.R. 1.321(a)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 2310 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    Exhibit 2310
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 2309 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      Exhibit 2309
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2308 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        Exhibit 2308
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 2307 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                          Exhibit 2307
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2306 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            Exhibit 2306
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 2305 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                              Exhibit 2305
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 2304 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Exhibit 2304
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 2303 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Exhibit 2303
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 2302 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    Exhibit 2302
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                                      Patent Owner's Response Pursuant to 37 C.F.R. 42.120
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                        Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                          Power of Attorney
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                            Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                              Notice of Goodman Declaration
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                ORDER Conduct of the Proceeding
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                  Petitioner Notice of Proposed Motions
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                    PO Proposed Motions
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                      Scheduling Order
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                                                                        Decision - Institution of Inter Partes Review 37 C.F.R. 42.108
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                          District Court Claim Construction
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 2301 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                            Exhibit 2301
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                                                                              Preliminary Response
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                PO Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                  Order - Conduct of the Proceedings - 37 CFR 42.5
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                    Motion_For_Withdrawal
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                      Related Matters
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                        Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                          Order - Authorizing Counsel for Patent Owner to file Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                            Related Matters
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                              Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                Notice of Accepting Corrected Petition
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                  Amended Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1318 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                      Goodman Declaration
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1317 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                        Mears Declaration and Upender
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1316 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                          October 2, 2001 Response
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1315 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                            June 28, 2001 OA
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1314 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                              U.S. Patent No. 6,614,838
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1313 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                Amendment after Allowance
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1312 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Allowance and Fees Due
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1311 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                    5.11.2011 Supplemental Amendment
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1310 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                      3.10.2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1309 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        3.1.2011 Reply
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1308 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          OA
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1307 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                            App as filed
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1306 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                              IEEE Dictionary
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1305 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                Infringement Contentions
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1304 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                  Boer US5706428
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1303 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                    Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1302 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                      Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1301 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                        U.S. Patent No. 8,023,580
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                          Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                                                                                            Petition for Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 8,023,580
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?