Chrysler Group LLC v. Norman IP Holdings, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2014-00563

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2019 at 9:24 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chrysler Group LLC, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 9/23/2014
Related Patent Application Number 08201077
Related Patent Number 5502689
Status Final Written Decision
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 9/23/2014
Related Patent Application Number 08201077
Related Patent Number 5502689
Status Final Written Decision
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Final Decision
Final Written Decision - Inter Partes Review - 35 U.S.C. 318(a) and 37 C.F.R. 42.73
    LREF
    Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Notice
    Petitioner's Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument
      LREF
      Legal Document 1022 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
      Ex 1022 - Notice of Intent to Issue Reexam Certificate
        LREF
        Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Notice
        Petitioner's Exhibit List as of 4-6-15
          LREF
          Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None reply
          Petitioner's Reply
            LREF
            Legal Document 3001 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
            Reexamination Control No. 90/012,784
              LREF
              Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Order
              Decision - Denying Petitioner's Motion to Stay Inter Partes Reexamination Control No. 90/012,784
                LREF
                Legal Document 2005 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                Exhibit 2005
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2004 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Exhibit 2004
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Opposition
                    PO Exhibit List
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Opposition
                      Patent Owner's Response
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None Notice
                        Notice of Deposition
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1021 Filed: 12/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Reexam Examiner Answer to Appeal Brief
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1020 Filed: 12/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Reexam Appeal Brief
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1019 Filed: 12/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Reexam Final Rejection
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1018 Filed: 12/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Mercer CV
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1017 Filed: 12/20/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Declaration of Dr. Mercer
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                    Joint Stip to Extend Due Dates
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1016 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Ex. 1016 - District Court Motion
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Opposition
                                        Opposition to Patent Owner's Motion to Stay Ex Parte Reexam
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                          Order - Conduct of the Proceeding
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                                            Decision - Patterson Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                              Patent Owner's Motion to Stay Co-Pending Reexamination
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                Scheduling Order
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                  Decision Institution of Inter Partes Review
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1015 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                      Updated Mandatory Notice
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                        Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Jeffrey S. Patterson
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                          Updated Power of Attorney
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                            Order - Denying Authorization for Motion to Stay 37 C.F.R. 42.5
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                              PO Preliminary Response
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                Order - Motion to withdraw as counsel 37 C.F.R. 42.10
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Order Motion to Terminate as to Chrysler Group LLC
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                                    Motion to Withdraw Counsel
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                                      Joint Request to File Confidential Information
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                                        Joint Motion to Terminate Proceedings
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                          Order - Conduct of the Proceedings
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2003 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            Ex. 2003
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 2002 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                              Ex. 2002
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 2001 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Ex 2001
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                                                  Patent Owner's Exhibit List
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                                                    Patent Owner's Preliminary Response
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                      Related Matters
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                        Power of Attorney
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                          Power of Attorney
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                            Notice of Accepting Corrected Petition
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                              Corrected Petition For Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 5,502,689
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1014 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                  Ex 1014 - Saxon v Apple CC Order (DI 304)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1013 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                    Ex 1013 - Saxon v Nokia CC Order (DI 311)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 1012 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                      Ex 1012 - CV_JCM_2014 03
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1011 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                        Ex 1011 - McAlexander_Declaration
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 1010 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                          Ex 1010 - Saxon's Response to Indefiniteness Motion
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 1009 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                            Ex 1009 - Response to NF OA
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1008 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                              Ex 1008 - OA Rejection
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1007 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                Ex 1007 - Ex Parte Request with Charts
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1006 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                  Ex 1006 - Intel Programmers
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1005 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                    Ex 1005 - Intel System Design Guide
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1004 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                      Ex 1004 - US4669059
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1003 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                        Ex 1003 - US4615005
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1002 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                          Ex 1002 - AMD
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1001 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                            Ex 1001 - US5502689
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                              Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                                                  Petition For Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 5,502,689
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?