Chrysler Group LLC v. Norman IP Holdings, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2014-00564

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2019 at 9:24 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chrysler Group LLC, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 9/23/2014
Related Patent Application Number 08346834
Related Patent Number 5530597
Status Final Written Decision
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 9/23/2014
Related Patent Application Number 08346834
Related Patent Number 5530597
Status Final Written Decision
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Final Decision
Final Written Decision
    LREF
    Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Notice
    Record of Oral Hearing
      LREF
      Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None reply
      PO Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to PO's Motion to Exclude Evidence
        LREF
        Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Opposition
        Opposition to Motion to Exclude
          LREF
          Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Notice
          Order - Request for Oral Argument 37 C.F.R. 42.70
            LREF
            Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Notice
            Petitioner's Request for Oral Argument
              LREF
              Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Notice
              PO's Request for Oral Hearing
                LREF
                Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Motion
                PO's Motion to Exclude Evidence
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1013 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Ex 1013 - Notice of Intent to Issue Reexam Certificate
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1012 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Ex 1012 - Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Notice
                      Petitioner's Exhibit List as of 4-6-15
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None reply
                        Petitioner's Reply
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Motion
                          Expunged
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2003 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Exhibit 2003
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2002 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Exhibit 2002
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2001 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Exhibit 2001
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Opposition
                                  PO Exhibit List as of 1/19/15
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Opposition
                                    Patent Owner Response
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                      Joint Stip to Extend Due Dates
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                        Order - Conduct of the Proceeding
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                                          Decision - Patterson Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                            Expunged
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 3002 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Ex 3002
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 3001 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Ex 3001
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                  Scheduling Order
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                    Decision Institution of Inter Partes Review
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1011 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                        Updated Mandatory Notice
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                          Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Jeffrey S. Patterson
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                            Updated Power of Attorney
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                              Order - Motion to withdraw as counsel 37 C.F.R. 42.10
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                Order Motion to Terminate as to Chrysler Group LLC
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                                  Motion to Withdraw Counsel
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                                    Joint Request to File Confidential Information
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Motion
                                                                      Joint Motion to Terminate Proceeding
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                        Order - Conduct of the Proceedings
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/4/2014, Entered: None reply
                                                                          Waiver of Preliminary Response
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                            Related Matters
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                              Power of Attorney
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                Power of Attorney
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                  Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1010 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    Order Denying Ex Parte Reexam 90/012,901
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1009 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Claim Construction Order 6-08-cv-265
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1008 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Final Office Action 90/012,781
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1007 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                          Transaction History of 90/012,781
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 1004 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                            Smith 4,748,559
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 1003 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                              Katayose 4,930,068
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 1002 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                Tokiwa JP-S61-39135
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1001 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                  Bowles 5,530,597
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                    Power of Attorney
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                      PETITION FOR INTER PARTES REVIEW OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,530,597
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?