Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. v. Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2015-00555

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Petitioner
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd."
v.
No Logo Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 6/19/2015
Related Patent Application Number 13198568
Related Patent Number 8457228
Status Terminated
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Notice
Notice of Refund
    LREF
    Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Notice
    Petitioners' Request for Refund of Post-Institution Fees
      LREF
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Institution Decision
      Decision Denial of Institution of Inter Partes Revew Denial of Motion for Joinder
        LREF
        Legal Document 2008 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
        Ex. 2008 - Gast
          LREF
          Legal Document 2007 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
          Ex. 2007 - Proakis II
            LREF
            Legal Document 2006 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
            Ex. 2006 - Proakis I
              LREF
              Legal Document 2005 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
              Ex. 2005 - Mod. Dict. of Elec.
                LREF
                Legal Document 2004 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                Ex. 2004 - Comp. Dict. of E.E.
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2003 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Ex. 2003 - D. Ct. Claim Construction
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                    Patent Owner's Preliminary Response
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice
                      Petitioners' Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Notice
                        DECISION - Petitioner's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Mr. Biddinger
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Order
                          Order - re Petitioner's Motion to Withdraw Counsel
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Motion
                            Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brian P. Biddinger
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                              Power of Attorney
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Motion
                                Petitioners_ Motion to Change Designation of Lead Counsel (IPR2015-00555)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Motion
                                  Petitioners_ Motion to Withdraw As Counsel (IPR2015-00555)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                    Power of Attorney
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Reply
                                      Petitioner's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Joinder
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 2002 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Ex. 2002 - Trial Transcript
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 2001 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Ex. 2001 - Defs' Invalidity Contentions
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None Opposition
                                            PO Opposition to Joinder
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                              Order - Conduct of the Proceeding - 37 CFR 42.5
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                Related Matters
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                  Power of Attorney
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                    Notice of Filing Date Accorded
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                      Supplemental Mandatory Notice
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1325 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Goodman Supplemental Declaration
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1324 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          U.S. Patent No. 5,537,398 (Siwiak)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1323 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Goodman Declaration (Case IPR2014-00892)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1322 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Mears Declaration and Upender
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1321 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                Communications Dictionary
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1320 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  IEEE Dictionary
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1319 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    Rembrandt Tutorial Reference
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1318 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      '580 March 1, 2011 Reply
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1317 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        '580 Office Action Summary
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1316 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                          '580 Application (as filed)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1315 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            Rembrandt's Markman Brief
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1314 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                              Infringement Contentions
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1313 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                '228 Second Notice of Allowance and Fees
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1312 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  '228 Request for Continued Examination
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1311 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    '228 Notice of Allowance and Fees
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1310 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      October 19, 2012 Response to Office Action
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1309 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        '228 April 30, 2012 Office Action Summary
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1308 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                          '228 Application (as filed)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 1307 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                            Oct. 1, 2001 Response
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 1306 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                              '838 June 28, 2001 Office Action Summary
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 1305 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                U.S. Patent No. 6,614,838
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1304 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                  U.S. Patent No. 5,706,428 (Boer)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1303 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                    Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 1302 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                      Complaint
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1301 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                        U.S. Patent No. 8,457,228
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                          Motion for Joinder to IPR2014-00892
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                            Power of Attorney
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Petition
                                                                                                              Petition for Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 8,457,228
                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?