Oracle v. Clouding IP, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2013-00090

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Oracle, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Clouding IP, LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 6/7/2013
Related Patent Application Number 08153011
Related Patent Number 5495607
Status Terminated
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Final Decision
Judgment - Termination of Proceeding - 37 CFR 42.73
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Motion
    Joint request for confidential treatment
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Motion
      Joint motion to terminate
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Notice
        Order - Conduct of the Proceeding - 37 CFR 42.5
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Notice
          Stipulation re Due Date 1
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Notice
            Revised Scheduling Order
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Notice
              Order - Summary of Initial Conference
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Notice
                Scheduling Order
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Institution Decision
                  Decision - Institution of Inter Partes Review - 37 CFR 42.108
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2001 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Feibel Encyclopedia
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                      Patent Owner's Preliminary Response
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None Notice
                        Order - Denying Certain Grounds
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Notice
                          Mandatory Notices
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                            Notice of Filing Date Accorded
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1012 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Petition EX 1012
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1011 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Petition EX 1011
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1010 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Petition EX 1010
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1009 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Petition EX 1009
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1008 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Petition EX 1008
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1007 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Petition EX 1007
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1006 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Petition EX 1006
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1005 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Petition EX 1005
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1004 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Petition EX 1004
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1003 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Petiton EX 1003
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1002 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Petition EX 1002
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1001 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Petition EX 1001
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                      Power of Attorney
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Petition
                                                        Petition
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?