Crestron Electronics, Inc. v. Norman IP Holdings, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2013-00278

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Crestron Electronics, Inc., Petitioner
v.
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 11/15/2013
Related Patent Application Number 08226717
Related Patent Number 5592555
Status Final Written Decision
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Final Decision
Judgment and Final Written Decision
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Motion
    PATENT OWNER'S REQUEST FOR ADVERSE JUDGMENT UNDER 37 C.F.R. 43.73(b)
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Notice
      Order - Conduct of the Proceedings
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Notice
        Scheduling Order
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Institution Decision
          Decision - Institution of Inter Partes Review - 37 C.F.R. 42.108
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Notice
            MANDATORY NOTICES UNDER 37 C.F.R. §42.8
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Notice
              Related Matters
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                Power of Attorney
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1008 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                  U.S. Patent No. 5,091,941 ("Needle")
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1007 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                    U.S. Patent No. 5,091,938 ("Thompson")
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1006 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Winsezhier et al., “KISS-16V2: A One-Chip ASIC DSP Solution for GSM”
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1005 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Walker, “Security in Mobile and Cordless Telecommunications”
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1004 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Excerpts of the prosecution history of European patent application no. 95300812.5
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1003 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                            European Search Report EP0677939A3
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1002 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                              U.S. Patent No. 4,914,697 ("Dabbish")
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1001 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                U.S. Patent No. 5,592,555 ("the '555 patent")
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                  Notice of Accepting Corrected Petition
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                    Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                      Power of Attorney
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                        Related Matters
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                          Power of Attorney
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                            Petition for Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 5,592,555
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1008 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Expunged
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1007 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Expunged
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1006 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Expunged
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1005 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Expunged
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1004 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Expunged
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1003 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Expunged
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1002 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Expunged
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1001 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Expunged
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?