Oracle Corporation v. Clouding IP, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2013-00273

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Oracle Corporation Oracle Corporation, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Clouding IP, LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 7/22/2013
Related Patent Application Number 09662990
Related Patent Number 7065637
Status Trial Denied
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Final DecisionCourt Filing
Judgement Termination of Proceeding
    LREF
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Motion
    Joint request for confidential treatment
      LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Motion
      Joint motion to terminate
        LREF
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Notice
        Order - Conduct of the Proceeding - 37 CFR 42.5
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Notice
          Related Matters
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
            Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
              LREF
              Legal Document 1013 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
              Exhibit
                LREF
                Legal Document 1012 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                Exhibit
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1011 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Exhibit
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1010 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Exhibit
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1009 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Exhibit
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1008 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Exhibit
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1007 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Exhibit
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1006 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Exhibit
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1005 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Exhibit
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1004 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Exhibit
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1003 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Exhibit
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1002 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Exhibit
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1001 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Exhibit
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                        Power of Attorney
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Petition
                                          Second Petition for IPR
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?